EP1894091 - MICROPROCESSOR WITH AUTOMATIC SELECTION OF SIMD PARALLELISM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.02.2012 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM INCORPORATED 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [2011/13] |
Former [2008/10] | For all designated states QUALCOMM INCORPORATED 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DOCKSER, Kenneth, Alan QUALCOMM Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | [2009/05] |
Former [2008/10] | 01 /
DOCKSER, Kenneth, Alan 1108 Walcott Way Cary, North Carolina 27519 / US | Representative(s) | Catesby, Olivia Joanne, et al Tomkins & Co. 5 Dartmouth Road Dublin 6 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/10] | Catesby, Olivia Joanne, et al Tomkins & Co 5 Dartmouth Road Dublin 6 / IE | Application number, filing date | 06771403.0 | 25.05.2006 | [2008/10] | WO2006US20614 | Priority number, date | US20050150729 | 09.06.2005 Original published format: US 150729 | [2008/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006135554 | Date: | 21.12.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/51] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1894091 | Date: | 05.03.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1894091 | Date: | 30.03.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 13.12.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.07.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/38 | [2010/46] | CPC: |
G06F1/206 (EP,US);
G06F9/38 (EP,KR,US);
G06F1/3203 (EP,US);
G06F1/3287 (EP,US);
G06F9/00 (KR);
G06F9/3017 (EP,US);
G06F9/30181 (EP,US);
G06F9/30189 (EP,US);
G06F9/3836 (EP,US);
G06F9/3869 (EP,US);
G06F9/3885 (EP,US);
G06F9/3887 (EP,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2008/10] | G06F9/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/10] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MIKROPROZESSOR MIT AUTOMATISCHER AUSWAHL EINES SMID-PARALLELISMUS | [2008/10] | English: | MICROPROCESSOR WITH AUTOMATIC SELECTION OF SIMD PARALLELISM | [2008/10] | French: | MICROPROCESSEUR A SELECTION AUTOMATIQUE DE PARALLELISME SIMD | [2008/10] | Entry into regional phase | 06.12.2007 | National basic fee paid | 06.12.2007 | Search fee paid | 06.12.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.12.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.12.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.12.2007 | Examination requested [2008/10] | 12.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.05.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 09.12.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.05.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 14.05.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.11.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.02.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 15.02.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP10192125.2 / EP2290527 | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 30.03.2011 | BE | 30.03.2011 | CY | 30.03.2011 | CZ | 30.03.2011 | DK | 30.03.2011 | EE | 30.03.2011 | HU | 30.03.2011 | LT | 30.03.2011 | LV | 30.03.2011 | PL | 30.03.2011 | RO | 30.03.2011 | SI | 30.03.2011 | SK | 30.03.2011 | TR | 30.03.2011 | IE | 25.05.2011 | LU | 25.05.2011 | CH | 31.05.2011 | LI | 31.05.2011 | MC | 31.05.2011 | BG | 30.06.2011 | GR | 01.07.2011 | IS | 30.07.2011 | PT | 01.08.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 30.03.2011 | |
BE | 30.03.2011 | ||
CY | 30.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2011 | ||
DK | 30.03.2011 | ||
EE | 30.03.2011 | ||
LT | 30.03.2011 | ||
LV | 30.03.2011 | ||
PL | 30.03.2011 | ||
RO | 30.03.2011 | ||
SI | 30.03.2011 | ||
SK | 30.03.2011 | ||
TR | 30.03.2011 | ||
IE | 25.05.2011 | ||
LU | 25.05.2011 | ||
CH | 31.05.2011 | ||
LI | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
BG | 30.06.2011 | ||
GR | 01.07.2011 | ||
IS | 30.07.2011 | ||
PT | 01.08.2011 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 30.03.2011 | |
BE | 30.03.2011 | ||
CY | 30.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2011 | ||
DK | 30.03.2011 | ||
EE | 30.03.2011 | ||
LT | 30.03.2011 | ||
LV | 30.03.2011 | ||
PL | 30.03.2011 | ||
RO | 30.03.2011 | ||
SI | 30.03.2011 | ||
SK | 30.03.2011 | ||
IE | 25.05.2011 | ||
LU | 25.05.2011 | ||
CH | 31.05.2011 | ||
LI | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
BG | 30.06.2011 | ||
GR | 01.07.2011 | ||
IS | 30.07.2011 | ||
PT | 01.08.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 30.03.2011 | |
BE | 30.03.2011 | ||
CY | 30.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2011 | ||
DK | 30.03.2011 | ||
EE | 30.03.2011 | ||
LT | 30.03.2011 | ||
LV | 30.03.2011 | ||
PL | 30.03.2011 | ||
RO | 30.03.2011 | ||
SI | 30.03.2011 | ||
SK | 30.03.2011 | ||
IE | 25.05.2011 | ||
LU | 25.05.2011 | ||
CH | 31.05.2011 | ||
LI | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
GR | 01.07.2011 | ||
IS | 30.07.2011 | ||
PT | 01.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | AT | 30.03.2011 | |
BE | 30.03.2011 | ||
CY | 30.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2011 | ||
DK | 30.03.2011 | ||
EE | 30.03.2011 | ||
LT | 30.03.2011 | ||
LV | 30.03.2011 | ||
PL | 30.03.2011 | ||
RO | 30.03.2011 | ||
SI | 30.03.2011 | ||
SK | 30.03.2011 | ||
IE | 25.05.2011 | ||
CH | 31.05.2011 | ||
LI | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
GR | 01.07.2011 | ||
IS | 30.07.2011 | ||
PT | 01.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | AT | 30.03.2011 | |
BE | 30.03.2011 | ||
CY | 30.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2011 | ||
DK | 30.03.2011 | ||
EE | 30.03.2011 | ||
LT | 30.03.2011 | ||
LV | 30.03.2011 | ||
PL | 30.03.2011 | ||
RO | 30.03.2011 | ||
SI | 30.03.2011 | ||
SK | 30.03.2011 | ||
CH | 31.05.2011 | ||
LI | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
GR | 01.07.2011 | ||
IS | 30.07.2011 | ||
PT | 01.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | AT | 30.03.2011 | |
BE | 30.03.2011 | ||
CY | 30.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2011 | ||
DK | 30.03.2011 | ||
EE | 30.03.2011 | ||
LT | 30.03.2011 | ||
LV | 30.03.2011 | ||
RO | 30.03.2011 | ||
SI | 30.03.2011 | ||
SK | 30.03.2011 | ||
CH | 31.05.2011 | ||
LI | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
GR | 01.07.2011 | ||
IS | 30.07.2011 | ||
PT | 01.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/07] | AT | 30.03.2011 | |
BE | 30.03.2011 | ||
CY | 30.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2011 | ||
EE | 30.03.2011 | ||
LT | 30.03.2011 | ||
LV | 30.03.2011 | ||
RO | 30.03.2011 | ||
SI | 30.03.2011 | ||
SK | 30.03.2011 | ||
CH | 31.05.2011 | ||
LI | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
GR | 01.07.2011 | ||
IS | 30.07.2011 | ||
PT | 01.08.2011 | ||
PL | 22.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | AT | 30.03.2011 | |
BE | 30.03.2011 | ||
CY | 30.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2011 | ||
EE | 30.03.2011 | ||
LT | 30.03.2011 | ||
LV | 30.03.2011 | ||
RO | 30.03.2011 | ||
SI | 30.03.2011 | ||
SK | 30.03.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
GR | 01.07.2011 | ||
IS | 30.07.2011 | ||
PT | 01.08.2011 | ||
PL | 22.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | AT | 30.03.2011 | |
BE | 30.03.2011 | ||
CY | 30.03.2011 | ||
CZ | 30.03.2011 | ||
EE | 30.03.2011 | ||
LT | 30.03.2011 | ||
LV | 30.03.2011 | ||
RO | 30.03.2011 | ||
SI | 30.03.2011 | ||
SK | 30.03.2011 | ||
GR | 01.07.2011 | ||
IS | 30.07.2011 | ||
PT | 01.08.2011 | ||
PL | 22.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | AT | 30.03.2011 | |
BE | 30.03.2011 | ||
CY | 30.03.2011 | ||
EE | 30.03.2011 | ||
LT | 30.03.2011 | ||
LV | 30.03.2011 | ||
SI | 30.03.2011 | ||
GR | 01.07.2011 | ||
PT | 01.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/41] | AT | 30.03.2011 | |
BE | 30.03.2011 | ||
CY | 30.03.2011 | ||
LT | 30.03.2011 | ||
LV | 30.03.2011 | ||
SI | 30.03.2011 | ||
GR | 01.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | AT | 30.03.2011 | |
CY | 30.03.2011 | ||
LT | 30.03.2011 | ||
LV | 30.03.2011 | ||
SI | 30.03.2011 | ||
GR | 01.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | LT | 30.03.2011 | |
LV | 30.03.2011 | ||
GR | 01.07.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2003088799 (BODAS DEVADATTA V [US]); | [X]US2004254965 (GIERNALCZYK ERIC [CA], et al) | International search | [Y]US2003037221 (GSCHWIND MICHAEL KARL [US], et al); | [Y]US2004034760 (PAVER NIGEL C [US], et al); | [Y]US2004059956 (CHAKRAVARTHY AVINASH P [US], et al); | [Y]US2004143410 (CLABES JOACHIM GERHARD [US], et al); | [Y]US2004215720 (ALEXANDER GREGORY WILLIAM [US], et al); | [X]US2004254965 (GIERNALCZYK ERIC [CA], et al); | by applicant | US2003088799 | US2004254965 |