EP1885919 - GENE METHYLATION AND EXPRESSION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.12.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dana-Farber Cancer Institute, Inc. 450 Brookline Avenue Boston, MA 02215 / US | [2011/46] |
Former [2008/07] | For all designated states DANA-FARBER CANCER INSTITUTE, INC. 44 Binney Street Boston, MA 02115 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
POLYAK, Kornelia 1856 Beacon Street, 6f Brookline, MA 02445-1946 / US | 02 /
HU, Min 10 Soden Street, Apt. 28 Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | 03 /
QIMRON, Noga 47 Englewood Ave. Apt. 4 Brighton, MA 02135 / US | 04 /
YAO, Jun 34 Gerry Road Chestnut Hill, MA 02467 / US | [2008/27] |
Former [2008/07] | 01 /
POLYAK, Kornelia 1856 Beacon Street, 6f Brookline, MA 02445-1946 / US | ||
02 /
HU, Min 11A Parker Hill Avenue, 6A Boston, MA 02120 / US | |||
03 /
QIMRON, Noga 47 Englewood Ave. Apt. 4 Brighton, MA 02135 / US | |||
04 /
YAO, Jun 34 Gerry Road Chestnut Hill, MA 02467 / US | Representative(s) | White, Martin Paul Whites IP Ltd 24A Carnatic Road Liverpool L18 8BZ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/07] | White, Martin Paul Whites IP Ltd 7 Berwick Road Bournemouth BH3 7BB / GB | ||
Former [2008/07] | White, Martin Paul Patents Designs & Brands Ltd. Suite 46, Oriel Chambers 14 Water Street Liverpool L2 8TD / GB | Application number, filing date | 06771539.1 | 30.05.2006 | [2008/07] | WO2006US20843 | Priority number, date | US20050685104P | 27.05.2005 Original published format: US 685104 P | [2008/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006128140 | Date: | 30.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/48] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1885919 | Date: | 13.02.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.11.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1885919 | Date: | 13.02.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 27.03.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.09.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C07H21/02, C07H21/04, C12N9/99, C12Q1/68 | [2008/20] | CPC: |
C12N15/1093 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6855 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6881 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/154 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/158 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C12Q1/6855, C12Q2521/331 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/07] | C40B30/06, C40B40/08 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/07] | Title | German: | METHYLIERUNG UND EXPRESSION VON GENEN | [2008/07] | English: | GENE METHYLATION AND EXPRESSION | [2008/07] | French: | METHYLATION ET EXPRESSION DE GENES | [2008/07] | Entry into regional phase | 20.11.2007 | National basic fee paid | 20.11.2007 | Search fee paid | 20.11.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.11.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.11.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.11.2007 | Examination requested [2008/07] | 10.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.05.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.05.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.09.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 21.09.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.09.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 15.10.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.11.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.12.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 18.12.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.11.2009 | Opposition(s) | 14.11.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.05.2006 | AT | 13.02.2013 | BE | 13.02.2013 | CY | 13.02.2013 | CZ | 13.02.2013 | DK | 13.02.2013 | EE | 13.02.2013 | FI | 13.02.2013 | LT | 13.02.2013 | LV | 13.02.2013 | MC | 13.02.2013 | NL | 13.02.2013 | PL | 13.02.2013 | RO | 13.02.2013 | SE | 13.02.2013 | SI | 13.02.2013 | SK | 13.02.2013 | TR | 13.02.2013 | BG | 13.05.2013 | GR | 14.05.2013 | IE | 30.05.2013 | LU | 30.05.2013 | IS | 13.06.2013 | PT | 13.06.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 13.02.2013 | |
BE | 13.02.2013 | ||
CY | 13.02.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.02.2013 | ||
DK | 13.02.2013 | ||
EE | 13.02.2013 | ||
FI | 13.02.2013 | ||
LT | 13.02.2013 | ||
LV | 13.02.2013 | ||
MC | 13.02.2013 | ||
NL | 13.02.2013 | ||
PL | 13.02.2013 | ||
RO | 13.02.2013 | ||
SE | 13.02.2013 | ||
SI | 13.02.2013 | ||
SK | 13.02.2013 | ||
TR | 13.02.2013 | ||
BG | 13.05.2013 | ||
GR | 14.05.2013 | ||
IE | 30.05.2013 | ||
IS | 13.06.2013 | ||
PT | 13.06.2013 | ||
Former [2015/30] | AT | 13.02.2013 | |
BE | 13.02.2013 | ||
CY | 13.02.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.02.2013 | ||
DK | 13.02.2013 | ||
EE | 13.02.2013 | ||
FI | 13.02.2013 | ||
LT | 13.02.2013 | ||
LV | 13.02.2013 | ||
MC | 13.02.2013 | ||
NL | 13.02.2013 | ||
PL | 13.02.2013 | ||
RO | 13.02.2013 | ||
SE | 13.02.2013 | ||
SI | 13.02.2013 | ||
SK | 13.02.2013 | ||
BG | 13.05.2013 | ||
GR | 14.05.2013 | ||
IE | 30.05.2013 | ||
IS | 13.06.2013 | ||
PT | 13.06.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | AT | 13.02.2013 | |
BE | 13.02.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.02.2013 | ||
DK | 13.02.2013 | ||
EE | 13.02.2013 | ||
FI | 13.02.2013 | ||
LT | 13.02.2013 | ||
LV | 13.02.2013 | ||
MC | 13.02.2013 | ||
NL | 13.02.2013 | ||
PL | 13.02.2013 | ||
RO | 13.02.2013 | ||
SE | 13.02.2013 | ||
SI | 13.02.2013 | ||
SK | 13.02.2013 | ||
BG | 13.05.2013 | ||
GR | 14.05.2013 | ||
IE | 30.05.2013 | ||
IS | 13.06.2013 | ||
PT | 13.06.2013 | ||
Former [2014/03] | AT | 13.02.2013 | |
BE | 13.02.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.02.2013 | ||
DK | 13.02.2013 | ||
EE | 13.02.2013 | ||
FI | 13.02.2013 | ||
LT | 13.02.2013 | ||
LV | 13.02.2013 | ||
MC | 13.02.2013 | ||
NL | 13.02.2013 | ||
PL | 13.02.2013 | ||
RO | 13.02.2013 | ||
SE | 13.02.2013 | ||
SI | 13.02.2013 | ||
SK | 13.02.2013 | ||
BG | 13.05.2013 | ||
GR | 14.05.2013 | ||
IS | 13.06.2013 | ||
PT | 13.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 13.02.2013 | |
BE | 13.02.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.02.2013 | ||
DK | 13.02.2013 | ||
EE | 13.02.2013 | ||
FI | 13.02.2013 | ||
LT | 13.02.2013 | ||
LV | 13.02.2013 | ||
NL | 13.02.2013 | ||
PL | 13.02.2013 | ||
RO | 13.02.2013 | ||
SE | 13.02.2013 | ||
SI | 13.02.2013 | ||
SK | 13.02.2013 | ||
BG | 13.05.2013 | ||
GR | 14.05.2013 | ||
IS | 13.06.2013 | ||
PT | 13.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 13.02.2013 | |
BE | 13.02.2013 | ||
DK | 13.02.2013 | ||
EE | 13.02.2013 | ||
FI | 13.02.2013 | ||
LT | 13.02.2013 | ||
LV | 13.02.2013 | ||
NL | 13.02.2013 | ||
PL | 13.02.2013 | ||
SE | 13.02.2013 | ||
SI | 13.02.2013 | ||
BG | 13.05.2013 | ||
GR | 14.05.2013 | ||
IS | 13.06.2013 | ||
PT | 13.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/40] | AT | 13.02.2013 | |
BE | 13.02.2013 | ||
FI | 13.02.2013 | ||
LT | 13.02.2013 | ||
LV | 13.02.2013 | ||
PL | 13.02.2013 | ||
SE | 13.02.2013 | ||
SI | 13.02.2013 | ||
BG | 13.05.2013 | ||
GR | 14.05.2013 | ||
IS | 13.06.2013 | ||
PT | 13.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/38] | AT | 13.02.2013 | |
BE | 13.02.2013 | ||
FI | 13.02.2013 | ||
LT | 13.02.2013 | ||
LV | 13.02.2013 | ||
PL | 13.02.2013 | ||
SE | 13.02.2013 | ||
SI | 13.02.2013 | ||
BG | 13.05.2013 | ||
GR | 14.05.2013 | ||
IS | 13.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 13.02.2013 | |
FI | 13.02.2013 | ||
LT | 13.02.2013 | ||
PL | 13.02.2013 | ||
SE | 13.02.2013 | ||
SI | 13.02.2013 | ||
BG | 13.05.2013 | ||
GR | 14.05.2013 | ||
IS | 13.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/36] | AT | 13.02.2013 | |
LT | 13.02.2013 | ||
PL | 13.02.2013 | ||
SE | 13.02.2013 | ||
BG | 13.05.2013 | ||
IS | 13.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | LT | 13.02.2013 | |
SE | 13.02.2013 | ||
BG | 13.05.2013 | ||
IS | 13.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | LT | 13.02.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2004096892 (WANG TIAN-LI [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2004085621 (DANA FARBER CANCER INST INC [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * claims 1-77 *; | [X] - WANG TIAN-LI ET AL, "Digital karyotyping.", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA 10 DEC 2002, (20021210), vol. 99, no. 25, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 16156 - 16161, XP002545371 [X] 1-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/PNAS.202610899 | [X] - DUNN JOHN J ET AL, "Genomic signature tags (GSTs): A system for profiling genomic DNA", GENOME RESEARCH, COLD SPRING HARBOR LABORATORY PRESS, WOODBURY, NY, US, (20021101), vol. 12, no. 11, ISSN 1088-9051, pages 1756 - 1765, XP002304617 [X] 1-10 * page 1762, column 1, paragraph 1; figure 1 * | [A] - SIDRANSKY D, "EMERGING MOLECULAR MARKERS OF CANCER", NATURE REVIEWS. CANCER, NATUR PUBLISHING GROUP, LONDON, GB, (20020301), vol. 2, no. 3, ISSN 1474-175X, pages 210 - 219, XP008042781 [A] 1-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nrc755 | [A] - SAHA S ET AL, "USING THE TRANSCRIPTOME TO ANNOTATE THE GENOME", NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, NATURE PUBLISHING GROUP, NEW YORK, NY, US, (20020501), vol. 20, no. 5, ISSN 1087-0156, pages 508 - 512, XP001157218 [A] 1-10 * page 511, column 1, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt0502-508 | International search | [Y] - WANG ET AL., "Digital Karyotyping", PNAS, (2002), vol. 99, no. 25, pages 16156 - 16161, XP002545371 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/PNAS.202610899 | [Y] - DAI ET AL., "An Ascl Boundary library for the studies of genetic and epigenetic alterations in CpG Islands", GENOME RESEARCH, (2002), vol. 12, pages 1591 - 1598, XP008124588 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1101/GR.197402 | [A] - HU ET AL., "Distinct epigenetic changes in the stromal cells of breast cancers", NATURE GENETICS, (200507), vol. 37, no. 8, pages 899 - 905, XP008124589 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/NG1596 | [Y] - KOMINSKY ET AL., "Loss of the tight junction protein claudin-7 correlates with histological grade in both ductal carcinoma in situ and invasive ductal carcinoma of the breast", ONCOGENE, (2003), vol. 22, pages 2021 - 2033, XP008124590 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/SJ.ONC.1206199 | [X] - SHI ET AL., "Expressed CpG Island sequence tag microarray for dual screening of DNA hypermethylation and gene silencing in cancer cells", CANCER RESEARCH, (200206), vol. 62, pages 3214 - 3220, XP002430002 | [Y] - PAZ ET AL., "Genetic unmasking of epigenetically silenced tumor suppressor genes in colon cancer cells deficient in DNA methyltransferase", HUMAN MOLECULAR GENETICS, (2003), vol. 12, no. 17, pages 2209 - 2219, XP002543571 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/hmg/ddg226 | [Y] - EVRON ET AL., "Loss of cyclin D2 expression in the majority of breast cancers is associated with promoter hypermethylation", CANCER RESEARCH, (2001), vol. 61, pages 2782 - 2787, XP008124596 | [Y] - CANTILE ET AL., "In vivo expression of the whole HOX gene network in human breast cancer", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF CANCER, (2003), vol. 39, pages 257 - 264, XP004400273 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0959-8049(02)00599-3 | [Y] - UMBRICHT ET AL., "Hypermethylation of 14-3-3 (stratifin) is an early event in breast cancer", ONCOGENE, (2001), vol. 20, pages 3348 - 3353, XP008124600 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/sj.onc.1204438 | [Y] - HUANG ET AL., "Methylation profiling of CpG islands in human breast cancer cells", HUMAN MOLECULAR GENETICS, (1999), vol. 8, no. 3, pages 459 - 470, XP002175857 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/hmg/8.3.459 | Examination | - Jost J P, Saluz H P, DNA Methylation Molecular Biology and BIological Significance, Basel, Switzerland, Birkhäuser Verlag, (1992), ISBN 3-7643-2778-2 |