EP1996098 - SPINAL CROSS-CONNECTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.12.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Custom Spine, Inc. 1140 Parsippany Blvd., Suite 201 Parsippany, NJ 07054 / US | [2010/48] |
Former [2008/49] | For all designated states Custom Spine, Inc. 322 Route 46 West, Suite 270E Parsippany, NJ 07054 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARKWORTH, Aaron, D. 275 Saddle River Road Saddle Brook, NJ 07663 / US | 02 /
ABDELGANY, Mahmoud, F. 40 Fleetwood Drive Rockaway, NJ 07866 / US | [2008/49] | Representative(s) | Fox-Male, Nicholas Vincent Humbert Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | [2008/49] | Application number, filing date | 06771661.3 | 31.05.2006 | [2008/49] | WO2006US21015 | Priority number, date | US20060373386 | 10.03.2006 Original published format: US 373386 | [2008/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007106104 | Date: | 20.09.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1996098 | Date: | 03.12.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.09.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1996098 | Date: | 23.02.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 20.09.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.12.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/70 | [2008/49] | CPC: |
A61B17/7052 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/49] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WIRBELSÄULEN-QUERVERBINDER | [2008/49] | English: | SPINAL CROSS-CONNECTOR | [2008/49] | French: | CONNECTEUR SPINAL EN CROIX | [2008/49] | Entry into regional phase | 08.10.2008 | National basic fee paid | 08.10.2008 | Search fee paid | 08.10.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.10.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.10.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.10.2008 | Examination requested [2008/49] | 16.12.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.04.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.08.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.12.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 23.12.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.11.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 23.02.2011 | BE | 23.02.2011 | CY | 23.02.2011 | CZ | 23.02.2011 | DK | 23.02.2011 | EE | 23.02.2011 | FI | 23.02.2011 | HU | 23.02.2011 | IS | 23.02.2011 | IT | 23.02.2011 | LT | 23.02.2011 | LV | 23.02.2011 | NL | 23.02.2011 | PL | 23.02.2011 | RO | 23.02.2011 | SE | 23.02.2011 | SI | 23.02.2011 | SK | 23.02.2011 | TR | 23.02.2011 | BG | 23.05.2011 | GR | 24.05.2011 | CH | 31.05.2011 | IE | 31.05.2011 | LI | 31.05.2011 | LU | 31.05.2011 | MC | 31.05.2011 | ES | 03.06.2011 | PT | 23.06.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 23.02.2011 | |
BE | 23.02.2011 | ||
CY | 23.02.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2011 | ||
DK | 23.02.2011 | ||
EE | 23.02.2011 | ||
FI | 23.02.2011 | ||
IS | 23.02.2011 | ||
IT | 23.02.2011 | ||
LT | 23.02.2011 | ||
LV | 23.02.2011 | ||
NL | 23.02.2011 | ||
PL | 23.02.2011 | ||
RO | 23.02.2011 | ||
SE | 23.02.2011 | ||
SI | 23.02.2011 | ||
SK | 23.02.2011 | ||
TR | 23.02.2011 | ||
BG | 23.05.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
CH | 31.05.2011 | ||
IE | 31.05.2011 | ||
LI | 31.05.2011 | ||
LU | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
ES | 03.06.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 23.02.2011 | |
BE | 23.02.2011 | ||
CY | 23.02.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2011 | ||
DK | 23.02.2011 | ||
EE | 23.02.2011 | ||
FI | 23.02.2011 | ||
IS | 23.02.2011 | ||
IT | 23.02.2011 | ||
LT | 23.02.2011 | ||
LV | 23.02.2011 | ||
NL | 23.02.2011 | ||
PL | 23.02.2011 | ||
RO | 23.02.2011 | ||
SE | 23.02.2011 | ||
SI | 23.02.2011 | ||
SK | 23.02.2011 | ||
BG | 23.05.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
CH | 31.05.2011 | ||
IE | 31.05.2011 | ||
LI | 31.05.2011 | ||
LU | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
ES | 03.06.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 23.02.2011 | |
BE | 23.02.2011 | ||
CY | 23.02.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2011 | ||
DK | 23.02.2011 | ||
EE | 23.02.2011 | ||
FI | 23.02.2011 | ||
IT | 23.02.2011 | ||
LT | 23.02.2011 | ||
LV | 23.02.2011 | ||
NL | 23.02.2011 | ||
PL | 23.02.2011 | ||
RO | 23.02.2011 | ||
SE | 23.02.2011 | ||
SI | 23.02.2011 | ||
SK | 23.02.2011 | ||
BG | 23.05.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
CH | 31.05.2011 | ||
IE | 31.05.2011 | ||
LI | 31.05.2011 | ||
LU | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
ES | 03.06.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | ||
Former [2012/24] | AT | 23.02.2011 | |
BE | 23.02.2011 | ||
CY | 23.02.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2011 | ||
DK | 23.02.2011 | ||
EE | 23.02.2011 | ||
FI | 23.02.2011 | ||
IT | 23.02.2011 | ||
LT | 23.02.2011 | ||
LV | 23.02.2011 | ||
NL | 23.02.2011 | ||
PL | 23.02.2011 | ||
RO | 23.02.2011 | ||
SE | 23.02.2011 | ||
SI | 23.02.2011 | ||
SK | 23.02.2011 | ||
BG | 23.05.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
CH | 31.05.2011 | ||
IE | 31.05.2011 | ||
LI | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
ES | 03.06.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | AT | 23.02.2011 | |
BE | 23.02.2011 | ||
CY | 23.02.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2011 | ||
DK | 23.02.2011 | ||
EE | 23.02.2011 | ||
FI | 23.02.2011 | ||
LT | 23.02.2011 | ||
LV | 23.02.2011 | ||
NL | 23.02.2011 | ||
PL | 23.02.2011 | ||
RO | 23.02.2011 | ||
SE | 23.02.2011 | ||
SI | 23.02.2011 | ||
SK | 23.02.2011 | ||
BG | 23.05.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
CH | 31.05.2011 | ||
IE | 31.05.2011 | ||
LI | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
ES | 03.06.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | AT | 23.02.2011 | |
BE | 23.02.2011 | ||
CY | 23.02.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2011 | ||
DK | 23.02.2011 | ||
EE | 23.02.2011 | ||
FI | 23.02.2011 | ||
LT | 23.02.2011 | ||
LV | 23.02.2011 | ||
NL | 23.02.2011 | ||
PL | 23.02.2011 | ||
RO | 23.02.2011 | ||
SE | 23.02.2011 | ||
SI | 23.02.2011 | ||
SK | 23.02.2011 | ||
BG | 23.05.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
CH | 31.05.2011 | ||
LI | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
ES | 03.06.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | AT | 23.02.2011 | |
BE | 23.02.2011 | ||
CY | 23.02.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2011 | ||
DK | 23.02.2011 | ||
EE | 23.02.2011 | ||
FI | 23.02.2011 | ||
LT | 23.02.2011 | ||
LV | 23.02.2011 | ||
NL | 23.02.2011 | ||
RO | 23.02.2011 | ||
SE | 23.02.2011 | ||
SI | 23.02.2011 | ||
SK | 23.02.2011 | ||
BG | 23.05.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
CH | 31.05.2011 | ||
LI | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
ES | 03.06.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | ||
Former [2012/07] | AT | 23.02.2011 | |
BE | 23.02.2011 | ||
CY | 23.02.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2011 | ||
DK | 23.02.2011 | ||
EE | 23.02.2011 | ||
FI | 23.02.2011 | ||
LT | 23.02.2011 | ||
LV | 23.02.2011 | ||
NL | 23.02.2011 | ||
RO | 23.02.2011 | ||
SE | 23.02.2011 | ||
SI | 23.02.2011 | ||
SK | 23.02.2011 | ||
BG | 23.05.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
CH | 31.05.2011 | ||
LI | 31.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
ES | 03.06.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | ||
PL | 20.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | AT | 23.02.2011 | |
BE | 23.02.2011 | ||
CY | 23.02.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2011 | ||
DK | 23.02.2011 | ||
EE | 23.02.2011 | ||
FI | 23.02.2011 | ||
LT | 23.02.2011 | ||
LV | 23.02.2011 | ||
NL | 23.02.2011 | ||
RO | 23.02.2011 | ||
SE | 23.02.2011 | ||
SI | 23.02.2011 | ||
SK | 23.02.2011 | ||
BG | 23.05.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
ES | 03.06.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | ||
PL | 20.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | AT | 23.02.2011 | |
BE | 23.02.2011 | ||
CY | 23.02.2011 | ||
CZ | 23.02.2011 | ||
DK | 23.02.2011 | ||
EE | 23.02.2011 | ||
FI | 23.02.2011 | ||
LT | 23.02.2011 | ||
LV | 23.02.2011 | ||
NL | 23.02.2011 | ||
RO | 23.02.2011 | ||
SE | 23.02.2011 | ||
SI | 23.02.2011 | ||
SK | 23.02.2011 | ||
BG | 23.05.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
ES | 03.06.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | ||
PL | 20.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | AT | 23.02.2011 | |
BE | 23.02.2011 | ||
CY | 23.02.2011 | ||
DK | 23.02.2011 | ||
EE | 23.02.2011 | ||
FI | 23.02.2011 | ||
LT | 23.02.2011 | ||
LV | 23.02.2011 | ||
NL | 23.02.2011 | ||
SE | 23.02.2011 | ||
SI | 23.02.2011 | ||
BG | 23.05.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
ES | 03.06.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | AT | 23.02.2011 | |
BE | 23.02.2011 | ||
CY | 23.02.2011 | ||
FI | 23.02.2011 | ||
LT | 23.02.2011 | ||
LV | 23.02.2011 | ||
NL | 23.02.2011 | ||
SE | 23.02.2011 | ||
SI | 23.02.2011 | ||
BG | 23.05.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
ES | 03.06.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | BE | 23.02.2011 | |
CY | 23.02.2011 | ||
FI | 23.02.2011 | ||
LT | 23.02.2011 | ||
LV | 23.02.2011 | ||
SE | 23.02.2011 | ||
SI | 23.02.2011 | ||
BG | 23.05.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
ES | 03.06.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | LT | 23.02.2011 | |
LV | 23.02.2011 | ||
SE | 23.02.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
ES | 03.06.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO0150968 (SYNTHES AG [CH], et al) [X] 1-5,15 * page 8, paragraph 8 - page 13, paragraph 2 * * figures 1,2,58 * [Y] 6,7,9-14; | [XAY]US2005113831 (FRANCK BRUNO [FR], et al) [X] 1,2,5,8 * page 2, paragraph 18 - page 3, paragraph 33 * * figures 1,3,4,6 * [A] 3,4,15 [Y] 9-14; | [YA]US2005192573 (ABDELGANY MAHMOUD F [US], et al) [Y] 6,7,14 * page 3, paragraph 44 - page 4, paragraph 45 * * figures 3B-4A *[A] 1,9 | International search | [A]US6217578 (CROZET YVES [US], et al); | [Y]US2004049188 (SLIVKA MICHAEL ANDREW [US], et al); | [Y]US2005192572 (ABDELGANY MAHMOUD F [US], et al); | [A]US2005228377 (CHAO NAM T [US], et al) | by applicant | US5312405 | US5334203 | US5498263 |