EP1974302 - DIALYSIS MACHINE WITH TRANSPORT MODE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.04.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.04.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.05.2014 [2014/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Renal Solutions, Inc. 770 Commonwealth Drive, Suite 101 Warrendale PA 15086 / US | [2008/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ASH, Stephen, R. 2514 Mar Ruth Drive Lafayette, IN 47905 / US | [2008/40] | Representative(s) | Harguth, Alexander Fish & Richardson P.C. Highlight Business Towers Mies-van-der-Rohe-Strasse 8 80807 München / DE | [2009/01] |
Former [2008/40] | Harguth, Alexander Fish & Richardson P.C. Regus Business Center Landsberger Strasse 155 80687 Munich / DE | Application number, filing date | 06771689.4 | 31.05.2006 | [2008/40] | WO2006US21055 | Priority number, date | US20060756785P | 06.01.2006 Original published format: US 756785 P | [2008/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007081383 | Date: | 19.07.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1974302 | Date: | 01.10.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.07.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.07.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G06F19/00 | [2008/40] | CPC: |
A61M1/16 (EP,US);
G16H20/40 (EP,US);
G16H40/63 (EP,US);
A61M1/3626 (EP,US);
A61M1/3663 (EP,US);
A61M2205/52 (EP,US);
A61M2205/8206 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/40] | Title | German: | DIALYSEMASCHINE MIT TRANSPORTMODUS | [2008/40] | English: | DIALYSIS MACHINE WITH TRANSPORT MODE | [2008/40] | French: | MACHINE DE DIALYSE DOTEE D'UN MODE TRANSPORT | [2008/40] | Entry into regional phase | 04.08.2008 | National basic fee paid | 04.08.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.08.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.08.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 04.08.2008 | Examination requested [2008/40] | 28.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.02.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.12.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/20] | 09.01.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/20] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.10.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 06.08.2008 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   25.09.2008 | 31.05.2013 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0597817 (ALTHIN MEDICAL INC [US]) [A] 1-17 * page 9, line 6 - page 11, line 19; figure 7 * * page 22, line 20 - page 23, line 3 *; | [X]GB2310602 (AKSYS LTD [US]) [X] 1-13 * page 1, line 1 - page 15, line 28 * * page 68, line 36 - page 76, line 6 *; | [A]US6468242 (WILSON LARRY [US], et al) [A] * column 6, line 15 - line 46 * * column 8, line 8 - column 12, line 41 ** column 13, line 58 - column 15, line 47 * |