EP1886442 - METHOD FOR MEASURING SENSITIVITY OF DATA PACKET SIGNAL RECEIVER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.05.2013 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.06.2013 [2013/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Litepoint Corporation 2635 N. 1st Street, 101 San Jose, CA 95134 / US | [2008/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OLGAARD, Christian 366 W. Olive Avenue, 1 Sunnyvale, California 94086 / US | 02 /
ANDERSEN, Carsten 825 E. Evelyn Avenue, 435 Sunnyvale, California 94086 / US | [2008/07] | Representative(s) | Foster, Mark Charles, et al Mathisen & Macara LLP Charta House 30-38 Church Street Staines-upon-Thames, Middlesex TW18 4EP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/07] | Foster, Mark Charles, et al Mathisen & Macara The Coach House 6-8 Swakeley's Road Ickenham, Uxbridge Middlesex UB10 8BZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 06771779.3 | 01.06.2006 | [2008/07] | WO2006US21190 | Priority number, date | US20050908946 | 01.06.2005 Original published format: US 908946 | [2008/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006130732 | Date: | 07.12.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/49] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1886442 | Date: | 13.02.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.12.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 15.11.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/26 | [2008/07] | CPC: |
H04L43/00 (EP,KR,US);
H04L43/0823 (KR);
H04L43/0847 (EP,KR,US);
H04L43/50 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/07] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR MESSUNG DER SENSITIVITÄT EINES DATENPAKETSIGNALEMPFÄNGERS | [2008/07] | English: | METHOD FOR MEASURING SENSITIVITY OF DATA PACKET SIGNAL RECEIVER | [2008/07] | French: | PROCEDE DE MESURE DE LA SENSIBILITE D'UN RECEPTEUR DE SIGNAL DE PAQUET DE DONNEES | [2008/07] | Entry into regional phase | 02.10.2007 | National basic fee paid | 02.10.2007 | Search fee paid | 02.10.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.10.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.10.2007 | Examination requested [2008/07] | 31.12.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/26] | 07.02.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2013/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2012 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US5479452 (HAYES DAVID J [US], et al); | [X]US5691988 (YAMADA KATSUJI [JP], et al); | [Y]WO0106684 (NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD [FI], et al) |