EP1887885 - METHOD FOR MAKING COMPOSITIONS WITH RICE FLOUR AND RICE STARCH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2008/08] | COMPOSITIONS WITH RICE FLOUR AND RICE STARCH | ||
[2017/14] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.06.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.07.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.03.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kellogg Europe Trading Limited Suite 3, One Earlsfort Centre Lower Hatch Street Dublin 2 / IE | [2018/01] |
Former [2013/06] | For all designated states Pringles S.a.r.l. 560 A Rue de Neudorf 2220 Luxembourg / LU | ||
Former [2008/08] | For all designated states The Procter and Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VILLAGRAN, Maria, Dolores 5300 Sunset Ridge Drive Mason, OH 45040 / US | [2008/08] | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2017/34] | Cabinet Plasseraud 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [2012/36] | Cabinet Plasseraud 52, rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [2012/29] | Nargolwalla, Cyra, et al Cabinet Plasseraud 52, rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [2009/50] | Kellenberger, Jakob, et al NV Procter & Gamble Services Company S.A. Intellectual Property Department Temselaan 100 1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | ||
Former [2008/08] | Kellenberger, Jakob, et al NV Procter & Gamble Services Company SA, Temselaan 100 1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | Application number, filing date | 06772636.4 | 07.06.2006 | [2008/08] | WO2006US22396 | Priority number, date | US20050687965P | 07.06.2005 Original published format: US 687965 P | [2008/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006133388 | Date: | 14.12.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/50] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1887885 | Date: | 20.02.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1887885 | Date: | 23.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.02.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A21D2/36, A21D13/04, A23L29/212, A23L7/13, A21D13/60, // A23K10/30, A23K50/40 | [2017/14] | CPC: |
A21D2/36 (EP,US);
A21D13/04 (EP);
A21D13/043 (EP);
A21D13/045 (EP);
A21D13/047 (EP,US);
A21D13/06 (EP);
A21D13/40 (EP,US);
A21D13/42 (EP);
A21D13/60 (EP,US);
A23K10/30 (EP,US);
A23K50/40 (EP,US);
A23L29/212 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2008/08] | A23L1/164, A23L1/0522, A23L1/10, A21D8/00, A23L1/39, A23K1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/34] |
Former [2008/08] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | METHODE ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN MIT REISMEHL UND REISSTÄRKE | [2017/14] | English: | METHOD FOR MAKING COMPOSITIONS WITH RICE FLOUR AND RICE STARCH | [2017/14] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE COMPOSITIONS À BASE DE FARINE DE RIZ ET D'AMIDON DE RIZ | [2017/17] |
Former [2008/08] | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN MIT REISMEHL UND REISSTÄRKE | ||
Former [2008/08] | COMPOSITIONS WITH RICE FLOUR AND RICE STARCH | ||
Former [2008/08] | COMPOSITIONS A BASE DE FARINE DE RIZ ET D'AMIDON DE RIZ | Entry into regional phase | 19.11.2007 | National basic fee paid | 19.11.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.11.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.11.2007 | Examination requested [2008/08] | 20.01.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.07.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.10.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.03.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.01.2017 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 26.01.2017 | 26.01.2017 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 30.01.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 24.02.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.03.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.07.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 11.07.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.07.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.01.2015 | Opposition(s) | 24.05.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 10.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 16.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.06.2006 | AT | 23.08.2017 | CY | 23.08.2017 | CZ | 23.08.2017 | DK | 23.08.2017 | EE | 23.08.2017 | FI | 23.08.2017 | LT | 23.08.2017 | LV | 23.08.2017 | MC | 23.08.2017 | NL | 23.08.2017 | PL | 23.08.2017 | PT | 23.08.2017 | RO | 23.08.2017 | SE | 23.08.2017 | SI | 23.08.2017 | SK | 23.08.2017 | TR | 23.08.2017 | BG | 23.11.2017 | GR | 24.11.2017 | IS | 23.12.2017 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/27] | HU | 07.06.2006 | |
AT | 23.08.2017 | ||
CZ | 23.08.2017 | ||
DK | 23.08.2017 | ||
EE | 23.08.2017 | ||
FI | 23.08.2017 | ||
LT | 23.08.2017 | ||
LV | 23.08.2017 | ||
MC | 23.08.2017 | ||
NL | 23.08.2017 | ||
PL | 23.08.2017 | ||
PT | 23.08.2017 | ||
RO | 23.08.2017 | ||
SE | 23.08.2017 | ||
SI | 23.08.2017 | ||
SK | 23.08.2017 | ||
TR | 23.08.2017 | ||
BG | 23.11.2017 | ||
GR | 24.11.2017 | ||
IS | 23.12.2017 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 23.08.2017 | |
CZ | 23.08.2017 | ||
DK | 23.08.2017 | ||
EE | 23.08.2017 | ||
FI | 23.08.2017 | ||
LT | 23.08.2017 | ||
LV | 23.08.2017 | ||
MC | 23.08.2017 | ||
NL | 23.08.2017 | ||
PL | 23.08.2017 | ||
RO | 23.08.2017 | ||
SE | 23.08.2017 | ||
SI | 23.08.2017 | ||
SK | 23.08.2017 | ||
TR | 23.08.2017 | ||
BG | 23.11.2017 | ||
GR | 24.11.2017 | ||
IS | 23.12.2017 | ||
Former [2019/15] | AT | 23.08.2017 | |
CZ | 23.08.2017 | ||
DK | 23.08.2017 | ||
EE | 23.08.2017 | ||
FI | 23.08.2017 | ||
LT | 23.08.2017 | ||
LV | 23.08.2017 | ||
MC | 23.08.2017 | ||
NL | 23.08.2017 | ||
PL | 23.08.2017 | ||
RO | 23.08.2017 | ||
SE | 23.08.2017 | ||
SI | 23.08.2017 | ||
SK | 23.08.2017 | ||
BG | 23.11.2017 | ||
GR | 24.11.2017 | ||
IS | 23.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 23.08.2017 | |
CZ | 23.08.2017 | ||
DK | 23.08.2017 | ||
EE | 23.08.2017 | ||
FI | 23.08.2017 | ||
LT | 23.08.2017 | ||
LV | 23.08.2017 | ||
NL | 23.08.2017 | ||
PL | 23.08.2017 | ||
RO | 23.08.2017 | ||
SE | 23.08.2017 | ||
SI | 23.08.2017 | ||
SK | 23.08.2017 | ||
BG | 23.11.2017 | ||
GR | 24.11.2017 | ||
IS | 23.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 23.08.2017 | |
CZ | 23.08.2017 | ||
DK | 23.08.2017 | ||
EE | 23.08.2017 | ||
FI | 23.08.2017 | ||
LT | 23.08.2017 | ||
LV | 23.08.2017 | ||
NL | 23.08.2017 | ||
PL | 23.08.2017 | ||
RO | 23.08.2017 | ||
SE | 23.08.2017 | ||
SK | 23.08.2017 | ||
BG | 23.11.2017 | ||
GR | 24.11.2017 | ||
IS | 23.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 23.08.2017 | |
CZ | 23.08.2017 | ||
DK | 23.08.2017 | ||
FI | 23.08.2017 | ||
LT | 23.08.2017 | ||
LV | 23.08.2017 | ||
NL | 23.08.2017 | ||
PL | 23.08.2017 | ||
SE | 23.08.2017 | ||
BG | 23.11.2017 | ||
GR | 24.11.2017 | ||
IS | 23.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/12] | AT | 23.08.2017 | |
FI | 23.08.2017 | ||
LT | 23.08.2017 | ||
LV | 23.08.2017 | ||
NL | 23.08.2017 | ||
PL | 23.08.2017 | ||
SE | 23.08.2017 | ||
BG | 23.11.2017 | ||
GR | 24.11.2017 | ||
IS | 23.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 23.08.2017 | |
FI | 23.08.2017 | ||
LT | 23.08.2017 | ||
NL | 23.08.2017 | ||
SE | 23.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | FI | 23.08.2017 | |
LT | 23.08.2017 | ||
NL | 23.08.2017 | ||
SE | 23.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/08] | FI | 23.08.2017 | |
LT | 23.08.2017 | ||
NL | 23.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | LT | 23.08.2017 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP1481590 (HAYASHIBARA BIOCHEM LAB [JP]) [X] 1-3,5-7,9,10,12,15,18,19,21,22 * example 5 *; | [X]US6224921 (SHIH FREDERICK F [US], et al) [X] 1-11,13-16,18 * claim 1 *; | [Y]WO9903356 (NUTRA WELL FOODS INC [CA]) [Y] 1,2 * example 6 *; | [Y]GB1465843 (ABE S) [Y] 1,2 * page 2, lines 1-26 *; | [A]US6558730 (GISAW YONAS [US], et al) [A] 2 * claim 8 *; | [A]WO9951111 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al) [A] 1-28 * claims 1-10 *; | [A]WO9920125 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [A] 28 * claims 1-10 * | [X] - KADAN R S ET AL, "FUNCTIONAL PROPERTIES OF EXTRUDED RICE FLOURS", JOURNAL OF FOOD SCIENCE, INSTITUTE OF FOOD TECHNOLOGISTS, CHICAGO, IL, US, (2003), vol. 68, no. 5, ISSN 0022-1147, pages 1669 - 1672, XP009040029 [X] 29 * table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1365-2621.2003.tb12311.x |