EP1909810 - INHIBITORS OF SERINE PROTEASE ACTIVITY AND THEIR USE IN METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR TREATMENT OF GRAFT REJECTION AND PROMOTION OF GRAFT SURVIVAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 21.07.2017 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 29.11.2017 [2017/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Regents of the University of Colorado 4001 Discovery Drive, Suite 390 Campus Box 588 UCB Boulder, CO 80309 / US | [2014/38] |
Former [2014/21] | For all designated states The Regents of the University of Colorado 4001 Discovery Drive, Suite 390 Campus Box 588 Sys Boulder, CO 80309 / US | ||
Former [2009/36] | For all designated states The Board of Regents of the University of Colorado 4001 Discovery Drive, Suite 390, Campus Box 588 SYS Boulder, CO 80309 / US | ||
Former [2008/16] | For all designated states The Regents of the University of Colorado 4001 Discovery Drive, Suite 390, Campus Box 588 SYS Boulder, CO 80309-0588 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHAPIRO, Leland 3070 Ash Street Denver, CO 80207 / US | 02 /
LEWIS, Eli, C. 1059 Fillmore Street Denver, CO 80206 / US | 03 /
DINARELLO, Charles, A. 333 15th Street Boulder, CO 80302 / US | [2008/16] | Representative(s) | Bohmann, Armin K., et al Bohmann Anwaltssozietät Nymphenburger Straße 1 80335 München / DE | [2014/38] |
Former [2008/16] | Bohmann, Armin K., et al Bohmann & Loosen Anwaltssozietät Nymphenburger Strasse 1 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06772664.6 | 07.06.2006 | [2008/16] | WO2006US22436 | Priority number, date | US20050687850P | 07.06.2005 Original published format: US 687850 P | [2008/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006133403 | Date: | 14.12.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/50] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1909810 | Date: | 16.04.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1909810 | Date: | 17.09.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/38] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP1909810 | Date: | 23.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 03.05.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.09.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/00, A61K38/16, A61K38/48 | [2008/16] | CPC: |
A61K38/57 (EP,US);
A61K35/39 (EP,US);
A61K38/191 (EP,US);
A61K38/217 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61P1/18 (EP);
A61P17/02 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
C07K16/40 (EP,US);
A61K2039/505 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K35/39, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K38/191, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K38/57, A61K2300/00 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/34] |
Former [2008/16] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HEMMER DER SERINPROTEASE-AKTIVITÄT UND IHRE VERWENDUNG IN VERFAHREN UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON TRANSPLANTAT-ABSTOSSUNG UND FÖRDERUNG DES TRANSPLANTAT-ÜBERLEBENS | [2008/16] | English: | INHIBITORS OF SERINE PROTEASE ACTIVITY AND THEIR USE IN METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR TREATMENT OF GRAFT REJECTION AND PROMOTION OF GRAFT SURVIVAL | [2008/16] | French: | INHIBITEURS DE L'ACTIVITE SERINE PROTEASE ET LEUR UTILISATION DANS DES PROCEDES ET COMPOSITIONS POUR LE TRAITEMENT DU REJET DU GREFFON ET LA PROMOTION DE LA SURVIE DU GREFFON | [2008/16] | Entry into regional phase | 07.01.2008 | National basic fee paid | 07.01.2008 | Search fee paid | 07.01.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.01.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.01.2008 | Examination requested [2008/16] | 19.04.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.12.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.02.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.07.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.09.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.05.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 12.07.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.08.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.02.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.03.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.05.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.06.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.10.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.04.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.08.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 06.08.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.08.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.06.2010 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
17.06.2015
23.06.2015
ADMISSIBLE BALEMA GmbH Schlossergasse 28 77694 Kehl / DE Opponent's representative Straus, Alexander, et al, et al Patentanwälte Becker, Kurig, Straus Bavariastrasse 7 80336 München / DE | [2016/49] |
Former [2015/30] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
17.06.2015
BALEMA GmbH Schlossergasse 28 77694 Kehl / DE Opponent's representative Baumann, Rüdiger Walter, et al, et al Pfister & Pfister Patent- & Rechtsanwälte Hallhof 6-7 87700 Memmingen / DE | 22.07.2015 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 01.02.2016 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 21.11.2016 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 21.11.2016 | Date of oral proceedings | 13.12.2016 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 13.12.2016 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 05.04.2017 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 17.07.2017 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 12.07.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 12.07.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.07.2012 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.06.2006 | AT | 17.09.2014 | BE | 17.09.2014 | BG | 17.09.2014 | CY | 17.09.2014 | CZ | 17.09.2014 | DK | 17.09.2014 | EE | 17.09.2014 | FI | 17.09.2014 | LT | 17.09.2014 | LV | 17.09.2014 | MC | 17.09.2014 | NL | 17.09.2014 | PL | 17.09.2014 | RO | 17.09.2014 | SE | 17.09.2014 | SI | 17.09.2014 | SK | 17.09.2014 | TR | 17.09.2014 | GR | 18.12.2014 | IS | 17.01.2015 | PT | 19.01.2015 | IE | 07.06.2015 | LU | 07.06.2015 | CH | 30.06.2015 | LI | 30.06.2015 | [2017/46] |
Former [2017/39] | HU | 07.06.2006 | |
AT | 17.09.2014 | ||
BG | 17.09.2014 | ||
CY | 17.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 17.09.2014 | ||
DK | 17.09.2014 | ||
EE | 17.09.2014 | ||
FI | 17.09.2014 | ||
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LV | 17.09.2014 | ||
MC | 17.09.2014 | ||
NL | 17.09.2014 | ||
PL | 17.09.2014 | ||
RO | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
SI | 17.09.2014 | ||
SK | 17.09.2014 | ||
TR | 17.09.2014 | ||
GR | 18.12.2014 | ||
IS | 17.01.2015 | ||
PT | 19.01.2015 | ||
IE | 07.06.2015 | ||
LU | 07.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 17.09.2014 | |
CY | 17.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 17.09.2014 | ||
DK | 17.09.2014 | ||
EE | 17.09.2014 | ||
FI | 17.09.2014 | ||
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LV | 17.09.2014 | ||
MC | 17.09.2014 | ||
NL | 17.09.2014 | ||
PL | 17.09.2014 | ||
RO | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
SI | 17.09.2014 | ||
SK | 17.09.2014 | ||
GR | 18.12.2014 | ||
IS | 17.01.2015 | ||
PT | 19.01.2015 | ||
IE | 07.06.2015 | ||
LU | 07.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 17.09.2014 | |
CY | 17.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 17.09.2014 | ||
DK | 17.09.2014 | ||
EE | 17.09.2014 | ||
FI | 17.09.2014 | ||
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LV | 17.09.2014 | ||
MC | 17.09.2014 | ||
NL | 17.09.2014 | ||
PL | 17.09.2014 | ||
RO | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
SI | 17.09.2014 | ||
SK | 17.09.2014 | ||
GR | 18.12.2014 | ||
IS | 17.01.2015 | ||
PT | 19.01.2015 | ||
IE | 07.06.2015 | ||
LU | 07.06.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | AT | 17.09.2014 | |
CY | 17.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 17.09.2014 | ||
DK | 17.09.2014 | ||
EE | 17.09.2014 | ||
FI | 17.09.2014 | ||
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LV | 17.09.2014 | ||
MC | 17.09.2014 | ||
NL | 17.09.2014 | ||
PL | 17.09.2014 | ||
RO | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
SI | 17.09.2014 | ||
SK | 17.09.2014 | ||
GR | 18.12.2014 | ||
IS | 17.01.2015 | ||
PT | 19.01.2015 | ||
LU | 07.06.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | AT | 17.09.2014 | |
CY | 17.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 17.09.2014 | ||
DK | 17.09.2014 | ||
EE | 17.09.2014 | ||
FI | 17.09.2014 | ||
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LV | 17.09.2014 | ||
MC | 17.09.2014 | ||
NL | 17.09.2014 | ||
PL | 17.09.2014 | ||
RO | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
SI | 17.09.2014 | ||
SK | 17.09.2014 | ||
GR | 18.12.2014 | ||
IS | 17.01.2015 | ||
PT | 19.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | AT | 17.09.2014 | |
CY | 17.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 17.09.2014 | ||
DK | 17.09.2014 | ||
EE | 17.09.2014 | ||
FI | 17.09.2014 | ||
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LV | 17.09.2014 | ||
NL | 17.09.2014 | ||
PL | 17.09.2014 | ||
RO | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
SI | 17.09.2014 | ||
SK | 17.09.2014 | ||
GR | 18.12.2014 | ||
IS | 17.01.2015 | ||
PT | 19.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/34] | AT | 17.09.2014 | |
CY | 17.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 17.09.2014 | ||
DK | 17.09.2014 | ||
EE | 17.09.2014 | ||
FI | 17.09.2014 | ||
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LV | 17.09.2014 | ||
NL | 17.09.2014 | ||
PL | 17.09.2014 | ||
RO | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
SK | 17.09.2014 | ||
GR | 18.12.2014 | ||
IS | 17.01.2015 | ||
PT | 19.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/25] | AT | 17.09.2014 | |
CY | 17.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 17.09.2014 | ||
EE | 17.09.2014 | ||
FI | 17.09.2014 | ||
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LV | 17.09.2014 | ||
NL | 17.09.2014 | ||
PL | 17.09.2014 | ||
RO | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
SK | 17.09.2014 | ||
GR | 18.12.2014 | ||
IS | 17.01.2015 | ||
PT | 19.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | CY | 17.09.2014 | |
CZ | 17.09.2014 | ||
EE | 17.09.2014 | ||
FI | 17.09.2014 | ||
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LV | 17.09.2014 | ||
NL | 17.09.2014 | ||
PL | 17.09.2014 | ||
RO | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
SK | 17.09.2014 | ||
GR | 18.12.2014 | ||
IS | 17.01.2015 | ||
PT | 19.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | CY | 17.09.2014 | |
CZ | 17.09.2014 | ||
EE | 17.09.2014 | ||
FI | 17.09.2014 | ||
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LV | 17.09.2014 | ||
NL | 17.09.2014 | ||
RO | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
SK | 17.09.2014 | ||
GR | 18.12.2014 | ||
IS | 17.01.2015 | ||
PT | 19.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/22] | CY | 17.09.2014 | |
FI | 17.09.2014 | ||
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LV | 17.09.2014 | ||
NL | 17.09.2014 | ||
RO | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
GR | 18.12.2014 | ||
PT | 19.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/16] | CY | 17.09.2014 | |
FI | 17.09.2014 | ||
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LV | 17.09.2014 | ||
NL | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
GR | 18.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | CY | 17.09.2014 | |
FI | 17.09.2014 | ||
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LV | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
GR | 18.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 17.09.2014 | |
FI | 17.09.2014 | ||
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
GR | 18.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | FI | 17.09.2014 | |
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | LT | 17.09.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2003053998 (DAEMEN MARC A R C [NL], et al) [X] 1-15 * claims 1,9,13 *; | [X] - DAEMEN MARC A R C ET AL, "Functional protection by acute phase proteins alpha1-acid glycoprotein and alpha1-antitrypsin against ischemia/reperfusion injury by preventing apoptosis and inflammation", CIRCULATION, (20000919), vol. 102, no. 12, ISSN 0009-7322, pages 1420 - 1426, XP002544513 [X] 1-15 * abstract * | [A] - BREIT S N ET AL, "The role of alpha1-antitrypsin deficiency in the pathogenesis of immune disorders", CLINICAL IMMUNOLOGY AND IMMUNOPATHOLOGY, SAN DIEGO, CA, US, vol. 35, no. 3, ISSN 0090-1229, (19850601), pages 363 - 380, (19850601), XP026189357 [A] 1-15 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0090-1229(85)90097-2 | [A] - SONG S ET AL, "Recombinant adeno-associated virus-mediated alpha-1 antitrypsin gene therapy prevents type I diabetes in NOD mice", GENE THERAPY, MACMILLAN PRESS LTD., BASINGSTOKE, GB, (20040101), vol. 11, no. 2, ISSN 0969-7128, pages 181 - 186, XP002517682 [A] 1-15 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/SJ.GT.3302156 | [PX] - LEWIS E C ET AL, "alpha1-Antitrypsin Monotherapy Prolongs Islet Allograft Survival in Mice", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA, NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCE, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (20050823), vol. 102, no. 34, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 12153 - 12158, XP003011675 [PX] 1-15 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.0505579102 | International search | [X]WO0051624 (TRUSTEES OF UNIVERSITY TECHNOL [US]) |