EP1894306 - MULTI-CARRIER CONSTANT ENVELOPE SIGNAL SCHEME FOR POWER AND BANDWIDTH EFFICIENT COMMUNICATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.03.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ITT Manufacturing Enterprises, Inc. 1105 North Market Street Suite 1217 Wilmington, Delaware 19801 / US | [2011/19] |
Former [2008/10] | For all designated states ITT MANUFACTURING ENTERPRISES, INC. 1105 North Market Street Suite 1217 Wilmington, Delaware 19801 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CANGIANI, Gene, L. 17 Nantes Road Parsippany, NJ 07054 / US | 02 /
STOYANOV, Stephen 70 River Rd Unit B3 clifton, NJ 07014 / US | [2008/20] |
Former [2008/10] | 01 /
CANGIANI, Gene, L. 17 Nantes Road Parsippany, NJ 07054 / US | ||
02 /
STOYANOV, Stephen 562 Harrison Ave. Apt. 16 Lodi, NJ 07644 / US | Representative(s) | Steimle, Josef Dreiss Patentanwälte Postfach 10 37 62 70032 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Steimle, Josef Dreiss, Fuhlendorf, Steimle & Becker Patentanwälte Postfach 10 37 62 70032 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2008/10] | Steimle, Josef Patentanwälte Dreiss, Fuhlendorf, Steimle & Becker, Postfach 10 37 62 70032 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 06772890.7 | 09.06.2006 | [2008/10] | WO2006US22758 | Priority number, date | US20050688903P | 09.06.2005 Original published format: US 688903 P | [2008/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006133449 | Date: | 14.12.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/50] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1894306 | Date: | 05.03.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.12.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1894306 | Date: | 11.05.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 25.10.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.07.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04B1/00 | [2008/10] | CPC: |
H04L27/2614 (EP,US);
H04L25/03343 (EP,US);
H04L27/2003 (EP,US);
H04L27/2603 (EP);
H04L27/2627 (EP,US);
H04L5/026 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/10] | Extension states | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MEHRTRÄGER-KONSTANTHÜLLKURVEN-SIGNALSCHEMA FÜR STROM- UND BANDBREITENEFFIZIENTE KOMMUNIKATION | [2008/10] | English: | MULTI-CARRIER CONSTANT ENVELOPE SIGNAL SCHEME FOR POWER AND BANDWIDTH EFFICIENT COMMUNICATIONS | [2008/10] | French: | SIGNAL COMPOSITE A PORTEUSE MULTIPLE ET A ENVELOPPE CONSTANTE PERMETTANT DES COMMUNICATIONS EFFICACES EN PUISSANCE ET EN LARGEUR DE BANDE | [2008/10] | Entry into regional phase | 09.01.2008 | National basic fee paid | 09.01.2008 | Search fee paid | 25.04.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.04.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.04.2008 | Examination requested [2008/24] | 09.08.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.12.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.03.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 30.03.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.02.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 11.05.2011 | BE | 11.05.2011 | CY | 11.05.2011 | CZ | 11.05.2011 | DK | 11.05.2011 | EE | 11.05.2011 | FI | 11.05.2011 | HU | 11.05.2011 | LT | 11.05.2011 | LV | 11.05.2011 | NL | 11.05.2011 | PL | 11.05.2011 | RO | 11.05.2011 | SE | 11.05.2011 | SI | 11.05.2011 | SK | 11.05.2011 | TR | 11.05.2011 | IE | 09.06.2011 | LU | 09.06.2011 | CH | 30.06.2011 | LI | 30.06.2011 | MC | 30.06.2011 | BG | 11.08.2011 | GR | 12.08.2011 | ES | 22.08.2011 | IS | 11.09.2011 | PT | 12.09.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 11.05.2011 | |
BE | 11.05.2011 | ||
CY | 11.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 11.05.2011 | ||
DK | 11.05.2011 | ||
EE | 11.05.2011 | ||
FI | 11.05.2011 | ||
LT | 11.05.2011 | ||
LV | 11.05.2011 | ||
NL | 11.05.2011 | ||
PL | 11.05.2011 | ||
RO | 11.05.2011 | ||
SE | 11.05.2011 | ||
SI | 11.05.2011 | ||
SK | 11.05.2011 | ||
TR | 11.05.2011 | ||
IE | 09.06.2011 | ||
LU | 09.06.2011 | ||
CH | 30.06.2011 | ||
LI | 30.06.2011 | ||
MC | 30.06.2011 | ||
BG | 11.08.2011 | ||
GR | 12.08.2011 | ||
ES | 22.08.2011 | ||
IS | 11.09.2011 | ||
PT | 12.09.2011 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 11.05.2011 | |
BE | 11.05.2011 | ||
CY | 11.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 11.05.2011 | ||
DK | 11.05.2011 | ||
EE | 11.05.2011 | ||
FI | 11.05.2011 | ||
LT | 11.05.2011 | ||
LV | 11.05.2011 | ||
NL | 11.05.2011 | ||
PL | 11.05.2011 | ||
RO | 11.05.2011 | ||
SE | 11.05.2011 | ||
SI | 11.05.2011 | ||
SK | 11.05.2011 | ||
IE | 09.06.2011 | ||
LU | 09.06.2011 | ||
CH | 30.06.2011 | ||
LI | 30.06.2011 | ||
MC | 30.06.2011 | ||
BG | 11.08.2011 | ||
GR | 12.08.2011 | ||
ES | 22.08.2011 | ||
IS | 11.09.2011 | ||
PT | 12.09.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 11.05.2011 | |
BE | 11.05.2011 | ||
CY | 11.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 11.05.2011 | ||
DK | 11.05.2011 | ||
EE | 11.05.2011 | ||
FI | 11.05.2011 | ||
LT | 11.05.2011 | ||
LV | 11.05.2011 | ||
NL | 11.05.2011 | ||
PL | 11.05.2011 | ||
RO | 11.05.2011 | ||
SE | 11.05.2011 | ||
SI | 11.05.2011 | ||
SK | 11.05.2011 | ||
IE | 09.06.2011 | ||
LU | 09.06.2011 | ||
CH | 30.06.2011 | ||
LI | 30.06.2011 | ||
MC | 30.06.2011 | ||
GR | 12.08.2011 | ||
ES | 22.08.2011 | ||
IS | 11.09.2011 | ||
PT | 12.09.2011 | ||
Former [2013/21] | AT | 11.05.2011 | |
BE | 11.05.2011 | ||
CY | 11.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 11.05.2011 | ||
DK | 11.05.2011 | ||
EE | 11.05.2011 | ||
FI | 11.05.2011 | ||
LT | 11.05.2011 | ||
LV | 11.05.2011 | ||
NL | 11.05.2011 | ||
PL | 11.05.2011 | ||
RO | 11.05.2011 | ||
SE | 11.05.2011 | ||
SI | 11.05.2011 | ||
SK | 11.05.2011 | ||
IE | 09.06.2011 | ||
CH | 30.06.2011 | ||
LI | 30.06.2011 | ||
MC | 30.06.2011 | ||
GR | 12.08.2011 | ||
ES | 22.08.2011 | ||
IS | 11.09.2011 | ||
PT | 12.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | AT | 11.05.2011 | |
BE | 11.05.2011 | ||
CY | 11.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 11.05.2011 | ||
DK | 11.05.2011 | ||
EE | 11.05.2011 | ||
FI | 11.05.2011 | ||
LT | 11.05.2011 | ||
LV | 11.05.2011 | ||
NL | 11.05.2011 | ||
PL | 11.05.2011 | ||
RO | 11.05.2011 | ||
SE | 11.05.2011 | ||
SI | 11.05.2011 | ||
SK | 11.05.2011 | ||
IE | 09.06.2011 | ||
CH | 30.06.2011 | ||
LI | 30.06.2011 | ||
GR | 12.08.2011 | ||
ES | 22.08.2011 | ||
IS | 11.09.2011 | ||
PT | 12.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | AT | 11.05.2011 | |
BE | 11.05.2011 | ||
CY | 11.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 11.05.2011 | ||
DK | 11.05.2011 | ||
EE | 11.05.2011 | ||
FI | 11.05.2011 | ||
LT | 11.05.2011 | ||
LV | 11.05.2011 | ||
NL | 11.05.2011 | ||
PL | 11.05.2011 | ||
RO | 11.05.2011 | ||
SE | 11.05.2011 | ||
SI | 11.05.2011 | ||
SK | 11.05.2011 | ||
GR | 12.08.2011 | ||
ES | 22.08.2011 | ||
IS | 11.09.2011 | ||
PT | 12.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | AT | 11.05.2011 | |
BE | 11.05.2011 | ||
CY | 11.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 11.05.2011 | ||
DK | 11.05.2011 | ||
EE | 11.05.2011 | ||
FI | 11.05.2011 | ||
LT | 11.05.2011 | ||
LV | 11.05.2011 | ||
NL | 11.05.2011 | ||
RO | 11.05.2011 | ||
SE | 11.05.2011 | ||
SI | 11.05.2011 | ||
SK | 11.05.2011 | ||
GR | 12.08.2011 | ||
ES | 22.08.2011 | ||
IS | 11.09.2011 | ||
PT | 12.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | AT | 11.05.2011 | |
BE | 11.05.2011 | ||
CY | 11.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 11.05.2011 | ||
EE | 11.05.2011 | ||
FI | 11.05.2011 | ||
LT | 11.05.2011 | ||
LV | 11.05.2011 | ||
NL | 11.05.2011 | ||
SE | 11.05.2011 | ||
SI | 11.05.2011 | ||
GR | 12.08.2011 | ||
ES | 22.08.2011 | ||
IS | 11.09.2011 | ||
PT | 12.09.2011 | ||
PL | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/01] | AT | 11.05.2011 | |
BE | 11.05.2011 | ||
CY | 11.05.2011 | ||
FI | 11.05.2011 | ||
LT | 11.05.2011 | ||
LV | 11.05.2011 | ||
NL | 11.05.2011 | ||
SE | 11.05.2011 | ||
SI | 11.05.2011 | ||
GR | 12.08.2011 | ||
ES | 22.08.2011 | ||
IS | 11.09.2011 | ||
PT | 12.09.2011 | ||
PL | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/52] | AT | 11.05.2011 | |
CY | 11.05.2011 | ||
FI | 11.05.2011 | ||
LT | 11.05.2011 | ||
LV | 11.05.2011 | ||
SE | 11.05.2011 | ||
SI | 11.05.2011 | ||
GR | 12.08.2011 | ||
ES | 22.08.2011 | ||
IS | 11.09.2011 | ||
PT | 12.09.2011 | ||
PL | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | CY | 11.05.2011 | |
FI | 11.05.2011 | ||
LT | 11.05.2011 | ||
LV | 11.05.2011 | ||
SE | 11.05.2011 | ||
SI | 11.05.2011 | ||
GR | 12.08.2011 | ||
ES | 22.08.2011 | ||
IS | 11.09.2011 | ||
PT | 12.09.2011 | ||
PL | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 11.05.2011 | |
FI | 11.05.2011 | ||
LT | 11.05.2011 | ||
SE | 11.05.2011 | ||
GR | 12.08.2011 | ||
ES | 22.08.2011 | ||
PT | 12.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/48] | LT | 11.05.2011 | |
SE | 11.05.2011 | ||
PT | 12.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | LT | 11.05.2011 | |
PT | 12.09.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]WO0108326 (ITT MFG ENTERPRISES INC [US]) [X] 1,2,10,11,13-15,23 * page 4, line 22 - page 5, line 9 * * page 6, line 1 - page 13, line 27 * * figures 3,6,7 * [A] 4,12,16 [I] 3,5-9,17-22,24; | [A] - SPILKER J J ET AL, "CODE MULTIPLEXING VIA MAJORITY LOGIC FOR GPS MODERNIZATION", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INSTITUTE OF NAVIGATION (ION) GPS, XX, XX, (19980915), pages 265 - 273, XP008002043 [A] 1-24 * page 265 - page 270 * | International search | [X]US2002075907 (CANGIANI GENE L [US], et al); | [Y]US2002150068 (ORR RICHARD S [US], et al) | by applicant | WO0108326 | - SPILKER J J ET AL., "CODE MULTIPLEXING VIA MAJORITY LOGIC FOR GPS MODERNIZATION", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INSTITUTE OF NAVIGATION (ION) GPS, (19980915), vol. XX, no. XX, pages 265 - 273 |