EP1915144 - METHOD TO REDUCE OXIDATIVE DAMAGE AND IMPROVE MITOCHONDRIAL EFFICIENCY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 03.02.2012 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.02.2012 | Withdrawal of application | published on 07.03.2012 [2012/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Accera, Inc. 380 Interlocken Crescent, Suite 780 Broomfield, CO 80021 / US | [2009/32] |
Former [2008/18] | For all designated states Accera, Inc. 10901 West 120th Avenue, Suite 340 Broomfield, Colorado 80021 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HENDERSON, Samuel, T. 2110 West 10th Ave, Apt. 203 Broomfield, CO 80020 / US | [2008/18] | Representative(s) | Clegg, Richard Ian, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/18] | Clegg, Richard Ian, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 06773269.3 | 15.06.2006 | [2008/18] | WO2006US23342 | Priority number, date | US20050692328P | 20.06.2005 Original published format: US 692328 P | [2008/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007001883 | Date: | 04.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/01] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1915144 | Date: | 30.04.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.01.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 31.05.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/22, A61K31/225, A61K31/202, A61K31/685, A61K31/683, A61K31/33, A61P25/16, A61P25/28, A61P25/08, A61P25/18, A61P9/00, A61P9/10, A61P43/00 | [2009/34] | CPC: |
A61K31/22 (EP,US);
A61K31/202 (EP,US);
A61K31/205 (EP,US);
A61K31/225 (EP,US);
A61K31/23 (EP,US);
A61K31/33 (EP,US);
A61K31/683 (EP,US);
A61K31/685 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61P25/08 (EP);
A61P25/16 (EP);
A61P25/18 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P3/04 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/205, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/23, A61K2300/00 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [2008/18] | A61K31/22, A61K31/225, A61K31/202, A61K31/685, A61K31/683, A61K31/33 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/18] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR REDUZIERUNG VON OXIDATIVEN SCHÄDEN UND ZUR VERBESSERUNG DER MITOCHONDRIEN-EFFIZIENZ | [2008/18] | English: | METHOD TO REDUCE OXIDATIVE DAMAGE AND IMPROVE MITOCHONDRIAL EFFICIENCY | [2008/18] | French: | PROCÉDÉ VISANT À RÉDUIRE LES DOMMAGES OXYDATIFSET À AMÉLIORER L'EFFICACITÉ DES MITOCHONDRIES | [2008/18] | Entry into regional phase | 09.01.2008 | National basic fee paid | 09.01.2008 | Search fee paid | 09.01.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.01.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.01.2008 | Examination requested [2008/18] | 01.05.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.12.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.09.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.11.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.07.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 23.09.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.01.2012 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2012/10] | 23.01.2012 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 09.02.2012 | 09.02.2012 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | EP11193305.7 / EP2468273 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.12.2009 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 23.09.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 23.09.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 14.10.2011 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 29.09.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 29.09.2010 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 22.10.2010 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6835750 (HENDERSON SAMUEL T [US]) [X] 1-18 * whole document, particulary: col. 9, l. 15-20 col. 10, l. 13-15 col. 10, l. 58-64 col. 11, l. 10-12, 14-20 col. 14, l. 3-30 col. 14, l. 50 - col. 15, l. 45 col. 16, l. 1-3 col. 17, l. 59 - col. 18, l. 3 col. 18, l. l. 3-9, 23-30, 48-53 col. 19, l. 30-35 examples 1 and 2 claim 1 *; | [X]WO0182928 (HENDERSON SAMUEL T [US]) [X] 1-18 * whole document, particulary: p. 10, l. 15-20 p. 11, l. 12-20 p. 14, l. 19-33 p. 16, l. 1-7, 10-16 examples 1 and 2 claim 1 * | International search | [Y]US2005013884 (RENNELS M SCOTT [US]); | [Y]US2004052926 (APFELBAUM UDO [CH]) | [Y] - PEGORIER J.-P. ET AL., "Fatty acid metabolism in hepatocytes isolates from rats adapted to high-fat diets containing long- or medium-chain triacylglycerols", BIOCHEM. JOURNAL, (1988), vol. 249, pages 801 - 806, XP003013150 |