EP1893355 - DENSE FLUID COMPOSITIONS FOR REMOVAL OF HARDENED PHOTORESIST, POST-ETCH RESIDUE AND/OR BOTTOM ANTI-REFLECTIVE COATING LAYERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 17.04.2009 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2009 | Withdrawal of application | published on 20.05.2009 [2009/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ADVANCED TECHNOLOGY MATERIALS, INC. 7 Commerce Drive Danbury, CT 06810 / US | [2008/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KORZENSKI, Michael B. 110 Woodcrest Lane Danbury, Connecticut 06810 / US | 02 /
VISINTIN, Pamela M. 18 Teator Lane Red Hook, New York 12571 / US | 03 /
BAUM, Thomas H. 2 Handol Lane New Fairfield, Connecticut 06812 / US | 04 /
MINSEK, David W. 20 Skyview Drive New Milford, Connecticut 06776 / US | 05 /
XU, Chongying 8 Heather Court New Milford, Connecticut 06776 / US | [2008/10] | Representative(s) | ABG Intellectual Property Law, S.L. Avenida de Burgos, 16D Edificio Euromor 28036 Madrid / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2008/10] | ABG Patentes, S.L. Orense 68, 7th floor 28020 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 06773283.4 | 16.06.2006 | [2008/10] | WO2006US23388 | Priority number, date | US20050691178P | 16.06.2005 Original published format: US 691178 P | [2008/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006138505 | Date: | 28.12.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1893355 | Date: | 05.03.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.12.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 28.12.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B08B3/00 | [2008/10] | CPC: |
C11D7/08 (EP,US);
G03F7/42 (KR);
C11D3/3947 (EP,US);
C09K13/08 (KR);
C11D7/264 (EP,US);
C11D7/265 (EP,US);
C11D7/32 (EP,US);
C11D7/34 (EP,US);
C11D7/5004 (EP,US);
G03F7/425 (EP,US);
G03F7/426 (EP,US);
H01L21/02063 (EP,US);
C11D2111/22 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/10] | Extension states | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DICHTE FLUIDZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUM ENTFERNEN VON GEHÄRTETEM FOTOLACK, RÜCKSTÄNDEN NACH DEM ÄTZEN UND/ODER ANTIREFLEXIONSBODENÜBERZUGSSCHICHTEN | [2008/10] | English: | DENSE FLUID COMPOSITIONS FOR REMOVAL OF HARDENED PHOTORESIST, POST-ETCH RESIDUE AND/OR BOTTOM ANTI-REFLECTIVE COATING LAYERS | [2008/10] | French: | COMPOSITIONS DE FLUIDE DENSE POUR L'ELIMINATION DE PHOTORESINE DURCIE, DE RESIDU POST-GRAVURE ET/OU DE COUCHES DE REVETEMENT ANTIREFLET DE FOND | [2008/10] | Entry into regional phase | 11.01.2008 | National basic fee paid | 11.01.2008 | Search fee paid | 11.01.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.01.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.01.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.01.2008 | Examination requested [2008/10] | 15.04.2009 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2009/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4215005 (MEY JOHN E VANDER [US]); | [A]US6641678 (DEYOUNG JAMES P [US], et al) |