EP1910594 - MOTION TRANSMITTING CABLE LINER AND ASSEMBLIES CONTAINING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.04.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.04.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.05.2012 [2012/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Reynolds, Kim 435 Lantern Lane Berwyn, PA 19312 / US | For all designated states Marino, Charles 1064 Kennett Way West Chester, PA 19380 / US | For all designated states Kray, Kevin 818 Camp Circle Phoenixville, PA 19460 / US | [2008/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2008/16] | Representative(s) | Clarke, Lionel Paul, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/52] | Clarke, Lionel Paul, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | ||
Former [2008/16] | Hucker, Charlotte Jane Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 06773662.9 | 21.06.2006 | [2008/16] | WO2006US24100 | Priority number, date | US20050694356P | 25.06.2005 Original published format: US 694356 P | [2008/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007002168 | Date: | 04.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1910594 | Date: | 16.04.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.01.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 04.01.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.04.2011 | Classification | IPC: | D02G3/00, H01B7/00 | [2008/16] | CPC: |
F16C1/26 (EP,US);
Y10T74/20456 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/16] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BEWEGUNG VERMITTELNDES KABELFUTTER UND ES ENTHALTENDE ANORDNUNGEN | [2008/16] | English: | MOTION TRANSMITTING CABLE LINER AND ASSEMBLIES CONTAINING SAME | [2008/16] | French: | SEPARATEUR DE CABLE TRANSMETTEUR DE MOUVEMENT ET ASSEMBLAGES CONTENANT CELUI-CI | [2008/16] | Entry into regional phase | 24.01.2008 | National basic fee paid | 24.01.2008 | Search fee paid | 24.01.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.01.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.01.2008 | Examination requested [2008/16] | 09.11.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/19] | 19.12.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2009 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   10.07.2009 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2382966 (ARENS CHARLES A) [X] 1,2,4-6 * page 3, column r, line 7 - line 26; figure 10 * * page 3, column l, line 70 - column r, line 1 * [Y] 1-6; | [XY]US3240233 (JOHNSTON ARCHIBALD P) [X] 1,2,4-6 * column 2, line 22 - line 25 * * column 4, line 27 - line 75; figures 3,7 * [Y] 1-6; | [XY]DE2257891 (GEMO BIEGSAME WELLEN) [X] 1,2,4,5 * the whole document * [Y] 1-5; | [XY]DE3021533 (KAMMERER GMBH M [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,5 * the whole document * [Y] 1-5; | [XY]DE19906746 (TOKIWA CHEM IND LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,5,6 * the whole document *[Y] 1-3,5,6; | [YD]US6040384 (REYNOLDS KIM A [US], et al) [YD] 1-6 * the whole document * | International search | [X]US5935707 (HEUSER HOLGER [DE]); | [Y]US6040384 (REYNOLDS KIM A [US], et al) |