Designated contracting states | AT | Lapse: 17.10.2012 | BE | | BG | Lapse: 17.01.2013 | CH | | CY | Lapse: 17.10.2012 | CZ | | DE | | DK | | EE | Lapse: 17.10.2012 | ES | | FI | Lapse: 17.10.2012 | FR | | GB | | GR | | HU | Lapse: 23.06.2006 | IE | | IS | Lapse: 17.02.2013 | IT | | LI | | LT | Lapse: 17.10.2012 | LU | Lapse: 23.06.2013 | LV | Lapse: 17.10.2012 | MC | Lapse: 17.10.2012 | NL | | PL | | PT | | RO | | SE | | SI | Lapse: 17.10.2012 | SK | Lapse: 17.10.2012 | TR | Lapse: 17.10.2012 | Examination procedure | 30.08.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Entry into regional phase | 16.01.2008 | National basic fee paid | | 16.01.2008 | Search fee paid | | 16.01.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | | 16.01.2008 | Examination fee paid | | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | European patent granted | 17.10.2012 | Opposition procedure | 18.07.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.09.2013 | INPADOC data Tooltip | The EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority. | Event date: | 16.04.2008 | | Event description: | REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED | Effective DATE: | 20080116 | | Event date: | 16.04.2008 | | Event description: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | A2 | Designated State(s): | AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR | | Event date: | 16.04.2008 | | Event description: | REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT | Validation States: | AL BA HR MK RS | | Event date: | 01.10.2008 | | Event description: | REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (DELETED) | | Event date: | 22.09.2010 | | Event description: | SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT DRAWN UP AND DESPATCHED | Effective DATE: | 20100823 | | Event date: | 18.05.2011 | | Event description: | FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED | Effective DATE: | 20110415 | | Event date: | 28.09.2011 | | Event description: | PARTY DATA CHANGED (APPLICANT DATA CHANGED OR RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION TRANSFERRED) | OWNER: | ISIS PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. | | Event date: | 28.09.2011 | | Event description: | PARTY DATA CHANGED (APPLICANT DATA CHANGED OR RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION TRANSFERRED) | OWNER: | COLD SPRING HARBOR LABORATORY | | Event date: | 18.04.2012 | | Event description: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | C12N 15/11 20060101AFI20120312BHEP | | Event date: | 18.04.2012 | | Event description: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | C12N 15/113 20100101ALI20120312BHEP | | Event date: | 18.04.2012 | | Event description: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | A61K 31/712 20060101ALI20120312BHEP | | Event date: | 18.04.2012 | | Event description: | TITLE (CORRECTION) | Free Format Text: | COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR MODULATION OF SMN2 SPLICING | | Event date: | 17.10.2012 | | Event description: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | B1 | Designated State(s): | AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR | | Event date: | 17.10.2012 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG GB FG4D | Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED | | Event date: | 31.10.2012 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH EP | Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENT TAKES EFFECT AS A NATIONAL PATENT IN CH/LI | | Event date: | 07.11.2012 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG IE FG4D | Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND | | Event date: | 13.12.2012 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R096 602006032530 DE | Code Expl.: | +DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT | Effective DATE: | 20121213 | | Event date: | 19.12.2012 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG NL T3 | Code Expl.: | +TRANSLATION FILED FOR AN EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED FOR NL, CONFIRMING ART. 52 PAR. 1 OR 6 OF THE PATENTS ACT 1995 | | Event date: | 31.12.2012 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH NV | Code Expl.: | NEW AGENT | REPRESENTATIVE: | E. BLUM AND CO. AG PATENT- UND MARKENANWAELTE , CH | | Event date: | 03.12.2012 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG PT SC4A | Code Expl.: | +TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE | Free Format Text: | AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION | Effective DATE: | 20121116 | | Event date: | 05.02.2013 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG SE TRGR | Code Expl.: | +TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT | | Event date: | 04.02.2013 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DK T3 | Code Expl.: | +EP PATENT WITH DANISH CLAIMS | | Event date: | 04.03.2013 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG ES FG2A 2397113 ES T3 | Code Expl.: | +DEFINITIVE PROTECTION | Effective DATE: | 20130304 | | Event date: | 25.03.2013 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG LT MG4D | Code Expl.: | -INVALIDATED EUROPEAN PATENT | | Event date: | 29.03.2013 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG PL T3 | Code Expl.: | +TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT | | Event date: | 30.04.2013 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FI | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20121017 | | Event date: | 30.04.2013 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | LT | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20121017 | | Event date: | 30.04.2013 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IS | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20130217 | | Event date: | 31.05.2013 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | CY | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20121017 | | Event date: | 31.05.2013 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | LV | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20121017 | | Event date: | 31.05.2013 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | SI | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20121017 | | Event date: | 28.06.2013 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | AT | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20121017 | | Event date: | 31.07.2013 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | EE | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20121017 | | Event date: | 31.07.2013 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | BG | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20130117 | | Event date: | 31.07.2013 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | SK | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20121017 | | Event date: | 12.03.2012 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R079 602006032530 DE | Code Expl.: | AMENDMENT OF IPC MAIN CLASS | Free Format Text: | PREVIOUS MAIN CLASS: C07H0021020000 | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | C12N0015110000 | | Event date: | 25.09.2013 | | Event description: | NO OPPOSITION FILED | Effective DATE: | 20130718 | | Event date: | 14.11.2013 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R097 602006032530 DE | Code Expl.: | +NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION | Effective DATE: | 20130718 | | Event date: | 15.11.2012 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG AT REF 579942 AT T | Code Expl.: | +REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT VALIDATED IN AUSTRIA) | Effective DATE: | 20121115 | | Event date: | 15.03.2013 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG AT MK05 579942 AT T | Code Expl.: | -DELETION ACC. TO PAR. 5 (WITHDRAWAL OF THE TRANSLATION OF THE EP PATENT) | Effective DATE: | 20121017 | | Event date: | 31.01.2014 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | MC | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20121017 | | Event date: | 26.11.2012 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG RO EPE | Code Expl.: | +EP PATENT VALID IN ROMANIA | | Event date: | 30.06.2015 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | TR | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20121017 | | Event date: | 31.07.2015 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | HU | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT; INVALID AB INITIO | Effective DATE: | 20060623 | | Event date: | 31.07.2015 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | LU | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20130623 | | Event date: | 29.03.2013 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG GR EP 20130400025 GR | Code Expl.: | +EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE | Effective DATE: | 20130225 | | Event date: | 16.05.2016 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR PLFP | Code Expl.: | +FEE PAYMENT | Year of Fee Payment: | 11 | | Event date: | 02.12.2016 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R082 602006032530 DE | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE | REPRESENTATIVE: | BOEHMERT & BOEHMERT ANWALTSPARTNERSCHAFT MBB -, DE | | Event date: | 02.12.2016 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R081 602006032530 DE | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE | OWNER: | COLD SPRING HARBOR LABORATORY, COLD SPRING HAR, US | Free Format Text: | FORMER OWNERS: COLD SPRING HARBOR LABORATORY, COLD SPRING HARBOR, N.Y, US; ISIS PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., CARLSFELD, CALIF., US | | Event date: | 02.12.2016 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R081 602006032530 DE | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE | OWNER: | BIOGEN MA INC., CAMBRIDGE, US | Free Format Text: | FORMER OWNERS: COLD SPRING HARBOR LABORATORY, COLD SPRING HARBOR, N.Y, US; ISIS PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., CARLSFELD, CALIF., US | | Event date: | 13.04.2017 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH PUEA | Code Expl.: | ASSIGNMENT OF THE SHARE | OWNER: | COLD SPRING HARBOR LABORATORY, US | Free Format Text: | FORMER OWNER: COLD SPRING HARBOR LABORATORY, US | | Event date: | 13.04.2017 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH PFA | Code Expl.: | NAME/FIRM CHANGED | OWNER: | COLD SPRING HARBOR LABORATORY, US | Free Format Text: | FORMER OWNER: COLD SPRING HARBOR LABORATORY, US | | Event date: | 19.05.2017 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR CD | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME | OWNER: | IONIS PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., US | Effective DATE: | 20170413 | | Event date: | 19.05.2017 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR CD | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME | OWNER: | COLD SPRING HARBOR LABORATORY, US | Effective DATE: | 20170413 | | Event date: | 21.06.2017 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG GB 732E | Code Expl.: | AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977) | Free Format Text: | REGISTERED BETWEEN 20170525 AND 20170531 | | Event date: | 27.06.2017 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR PLFP | Code Expl.: | +FEE PAYMENT | Year of Fee Payment: | 12 | | Event date: | 12.07.2017 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG NL HC | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF NAME(S) OF PROPRIETOR(S) | OWNER: | IONIS PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.; US | Free Format Text: | DETAILS ASSIGNMENT: CHANGE OF OWNER(S), CHANGE OF OWNER(S) NAME; FORMER OWNER NAME: ISIS PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. | Effective DATE: | 20170626 | | Event date: | 12.07.2017 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG NL PD | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF OWNERSHIP | OWNER: | COLD SPRING HARBOR LABORATORY; US | Free Format Text: | DETAILS ASSIGNMENT: CHANGE OF OWNER(S), ASSIGNMENT; FORMER OWNER NAME: IONIS PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. | Effective DATE: | 20170412 | | Event date: | 04.08.2017 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR TQ | Code Expl.: | PARTIAL TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY | OWNER: | COLD SPRING HARBOR LABORATORY, US | Effective DATE: | 20170703 | | Event date: | 04.08.2017 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR TQ | Code Expl.: | PARTIAL TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY | OWNER: | BIOGEN MA INC., US | Effective DATE: | 20170703 | | Event date: | 20.10.2017 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG ES PC2A | Code Expl.: | +TRANSFER OF PATENT | OWNER: | BIOGEN MA INC. | Effective DATE: | 20171016 | | Event date: | 25.10.2017 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R082 602006032530 DE | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE | REPRESENTATIVE: | WEICKMANN & WEICKMANN PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAEL, DE | | Event date: | 02.12.2016 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R082 602006032530 DE | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE | REPRESENTATIVE: | WEICKMANN & WEICKMANN PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAEL, DE | | Event date: | 08.11.2017 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG NL SPCF | Code Expl.: | APPLICATION FOR A SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE | Free Format Text: | PRODUCT NAME: NUSINERSEN, DESGEWENST IN DE VORM VAN EEN ZOUT; REGISTRATION NO/DATE: EU/1/17/1188 20170601 | SPC Suppl Protection Certif: | 300905 | Filing DATE: | 20171031 | Expiry DATE: | 20260622 | Extension DATE: | 20310622 | | Event date: | 28.11.2017 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG SE SPCF | Code Expl.: | APPLICATION FOR SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE FILED | Free Format Text: | PRODUCT NAME: NUSINERSEN OR SALTS THEREOF; REG. NO/DATE: EU/1/17/1188 20170601 | SPC Suppl Protection Certif: | 1790053-1 | | Event date: | 30.11.2017 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH NV | Code Expl.: | NEW AGENT | REPRESENTATIVE: | BOHEST AG, CH | | Event date: | 30.11.2017 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH SPCF | Code Expl.: | SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE FILED | Free Format Text: | PRODUCT NAME: NUSINERSEN; REGISTRATION NO/DATE: SWISSMEDIC 66495 20.09.2017 | Filing DATE: | 20171121 | | Event date: | 30.11.2017 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH PCOW | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF PATENT OWNER(S) | Free Format Text: | NEW ADDRESS: BOX 100, ONE BUNGTOWN ROAD, COLD SPRING HARBOR, NY 11724 (US) $ BIOGEN MA INC., 225 BINNEY STREET, CAMBRIDGE, MA 02142 (US) | | Event date: | 11.12.2017 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DK CTFF | Code Expl.: | APPLICATION FOR SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE (SPC) FILED | Free Format Text: | PRODUCT NAME: NUSINERSEN ELLER SALTE DERAF; REG. NO/DATE: EU/1/17/1188 20170601 | SPC Suppl Protection Certif: | CA 2017 00054 | Filing DATE: | 20171113 | Expiry DATE: | 20260623 | Extension DATE: | 20310623 | | Event date: | 13.12.2017 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG GB CTFF | Code Expl.: | SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE FILED | Free Format Text: | PRODUCT NAME: NUSINERSEN OR SALTS THEREOF; REGISTERED: UK EU/1/17/1188 20170601 | SPC Suppl Protection Certif: | SPC/GB17/067 | Filing DATE: | 20171116 | | Event date: | 17.11.2017 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR CP | Code Expl.: | SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE (SPC) FILED | Free Format Text: | PRODUCT NAME: NUSINERSEN OU SES SELS; REGISTRATION NO/DATE: EU/1/17/1188 20170601 | SPC Suppl Protection Certif: | 17C1049 | Filing DATE: | 20171117 | | Event date: | 23.11.2017 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R065 602006032530 DE | Code Expl.: | +REQUEST FOR GRANT OF SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE VALIDLY FILED | Free Format Text: | PRODUCT NAME: NUSINERSEN ODER SALZE DAVON (INTERNATIONALER, NICHT FIRMENEIGENER NAME); REGISTRATION NO/DATE: EU/1/17/1188 20170530 | SPC Suppl Protection Certif: | 122017000099 | Filing DATE: | 20171110 | Expiry DATE: | 20260624 | | Event date: | 13.12.2017 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG IE SPCF | Code Expl.: | REQUEST FOR GRANT OF SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE | Free Format Text: | PRODUCT NAME: NUSINERSEN OR SALTS THEREOF; REGISTRATION NO/DATE: EU/1/17/1188 20170530 | SPC Suppl Protection Certif: | 2017/051 | Filing DATE: | 20171109 | | Event date: | 12.06.2018 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG SE SPCG | Code Expl.: | +SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE GRANTED | Free Format Text: | PRODUCT NAME: NUSINERSEN OR SALTS THEREOF; REG. NO/DATE: EU/1/17/1188 20170601 | SPC Suppl Protection Certif: | 1790053-1 | Expiry DATE: | 20260624 | Extension DATE: | 20310623 | | Event date: | 06.06.2018 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR PLFP | Code Expl.: | +FEE PAYMENT | Year of Fee Payment: | 13 | | Event date: | 12.02.2018 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG BE SPCF | Code Expl.: | SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE FILED | Free Format Text: | PRODUCT NAME: SPINRAZA - NUSINERSEN; AUTHORISATION NUMBER AND DATE: EU/1/17/1188 20170601 | SPC Suppl Protection Certif: | 2017C/047 | Filing DATE: | 20171110 | Expiry DATE: | 20260623 | Extension DATE: | 20310623 | | Event date: | 09.01.2019 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG IE SPCG | Code Expl.: | +SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE GRANTED | Free Format Text: | PRODUCT NAME: NUSINERSEN OR SALTS THEREOF; REGISTRATION NO/DATE: EU/1/17/1188 20170530 | SPC Suppl Protection Certif: | 2017/051 | Extension DATE: | 20310622 | Effective DATE: | 20181221 | | Event date: | 01.12.2017 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG IT SPCG 502012902114126 IT | Code Expl.: | +SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE (SPC) GRANTED | Free Format Text: | PRODUCT NAME: NUSINERSEN O SUOI SALI(SPINRAZA); AUTHORISATION NUMBER(S) AND DATE(S): EU/1/17/1188, 20170601 | SPC Suppl Protection Certif: | 132017000128668 | Extension DATE: | 20310623 | | Event date: | 10.11.2017 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG IT SPCF 502012902114126 IT | Code Expl.: | +SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE (SPC) FILED | Free Format Text: | PRODUCT NAME: NUSINERSEN O SUOI SALI(SPINRAZA); AUTHORISATION NUMBER(S) AND DATE(S): EU/1/17/1188, 20170601 | SPC Suppl Protection Certif: | 132017000128668 | | Event date: | 31.03.2020 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH SPCW | Code Expl.: | -SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE WITHDRAWN | Free Format Text: | PRODUCT NAME: NUSINERSEN; REGISTRATION NO/DATE: SWISSMEDIC-ZULASSUNG 66495 20.09.2017 | SPC Suppl Protection Certif: | C01910395/01 | | Event date: | 13.03.2020 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR SPCW | Code Expl.: | -COMPLETE WITHDRAWAL OF AN SPC [SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE] | Free Format Text: | PRODUCT NAME: NUSINERSEN OU SES SELS; REGISTRATION NO/DATE: EU/1/17/1188 20170601 | SPC Suppl Protection Certif: | 17C1049 | Filing DATE: | 20171117 | | Event date: | 11.05.2020 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DK CTFW | Code Expl.: | -SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE (SPC) WITHDRAWN, REFUSED OR DEEMED WITHDRAWN | Free Format Text: | PRODUCT NAME: NUSINERSEN ELLER SALTE DERAF; REG. NO/DATE: EU/1/17/1188 20170601 | SPC Suppl Protection Certif: | CA 2017 00054 | Filing DATE: | 20171113 | Expiry DATE: | 20260623 | | Event date: | 14.09.2012 | | Event description: | (EXPECTED) GRANT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009210 | | Event date: | 07.09.2012 | | Event description: | GRANT FEE PAID | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR3 | | Event date: | 23.04.2012 | | Event description: | DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT A PATENT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR1 | | Event date: | 14.03.2008 | | Event description: | PUBLIC REFERENCE MADE UNDER ARTICLE 153(3) EPC TO A PUBLISHED INTERNATIONAL APPLICATION THAT HAS ENTERED THE EUROPEAN PHASE | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009012 | | Event date: | 23.08.2013 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: NO OPPOSITION FILED WITHIN TIME LIMIT | | Event date: | 20.10.2021 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG GB CTFW | Code Expl.: | -APPLICATION TO WITHDRAW OR OFFER TO SURRENDER A SUPPLEMENTARY PROTECTION CERTIFICATE | Free Format Text: | PRODUCT NAME: NUSINERSEN OR SALTS THEREOF; REGISTERED: UK EU/1/17/1188 20170601 | SPC Suppl Protection Certif: | SPC/GB17/067 | Filing DATE: | 20171116 | | Event date: | 23.08.2013 | | Event description: | NO OPPOSITION FILED WITHIN TIME LIMIT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009261 | | Event date: | 12.07.2023 | | Event description: | OPT-OUT OF THE COMPETENCE OF THE UNIFIED PATENT COURT (UPC) REGISTERED | Effective DATE: | 20230529 | | Event date: | 27.06.2024 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | NL | Payment DATE: | 20240521 | Year of Fee Payment: | 19 | | Event date: | 05.07.2024 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IE | Payment DATE: | 20240523 | Year of Fee Payment: | 19 | | Event date: | 08.07.2024 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GB | Payment DATE: | 20240521 | Year of Fee Payment: | 19 | | Event date: | 10.07.2024 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DE | Payment DATE: | 20240521 | Year of Fee Payment: | 19 | | Event date: | 11.07.2024 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DK | Payment DATE: | 20240521 | Year of Fee Payment: | 19 | | Event date: | 15.07.2024 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GR | Payment DATE: | 20240523 | Year of Fee Payment: | 19 | | Event date: | 23.07.2024 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | CZ | Payment DATE: | 20240530 | Year of Fee Payment: | 19 | | Event date: | 31.07.2024 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FR | Payment DATE: | 20240522 | Year of Fee Payment: | 19 | | Event date: | 31.07.2024 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IT | Payment DATE: | 20240522 | Year of Fee Payment: | 19 | | Event date: | 31.07.2024 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | RO | Payment DATE: | 20240612 | Year of Fee Payment: | 19 | | Event date: | 01.08.2024 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | PT | Payment DATE: | 20240521 | Year of Fee Payment: | 19 | | Event date: | 01.08.2024 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | PL | Payment DATE: | 20240524 | Year of Fee Payment: | 19 | | Event date: | 30.08.2024 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | BE | Payment DATE: | 20240521 | Year of Fee Payment: | 19 | | Event date: | 30.08.2024 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | SE | Payment DATE: | 20240521 | Year of Fee Payment: | 19 | | Event date: | 21.10.2024 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | ES | Payment DATE: | 20240701 | Year of Fee Payment: | 19 | | Event date: | 21.10.2024 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | CH | Payment DATE: | 20240701 | Year of Fee Payment: | 19 | |