EP1909882 - SINGLE PUNCTURE ANTEGRADE-RETROGRADE ENDOVASCULAR SHEATH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.12.2010 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.12.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.01.2011 [2011/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ramaiah, Venkatesh Arizona Heart Institute 2632 N. 20th Street Phoenix, AZ 85006 / US | For all designated states Mcnutt, Robert Arizona Heart Institute 2632 N. 20th Street Phoenix, AZ 85006 / US | [2008/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2008/16] | Representative(s) | Gervasi, Gemma, et al Notarbartolo & Gervasi GmbH Bavariaring 21 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/40] | Gervasi, Gemma, et al Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A. Bavariaring 21 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/25] | Gervasi, Gemma, et al Notarbartolo & Gervasi GmbH Bavariaring 21 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/16] | Hackney, Nigel John, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 06774521.6 | 05.07.2006 | [2008/16] | WO2006US26219 | Priority number, date | US20050595427P | 05.07.2005 Original published format: US 595427 P | [2008/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007005977 | Date: | 11.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1909882 | Date: | 16.04.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.01.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.01.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61M25/09, A61F2/06 | [2008/16] | CPC: |
A61M25/01 (EP,US);
A61M25/0662 (EP,US);
A61M25/09041 (EP,US);
A61M2025/018 (EP,US);
A61M2025/0681 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/16] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANTEGRADE/RETROGRADE ENDOVASKULÄRE EINZELPUNKTIONSSCHLEUSE | [2008/16] | English: | SINGLE PUNCTURE ANTEGRADE-RETROGRADE ENDOVASCULAR SHEATH | [2008/16] | French: | GAINE ENDOVASCULAIRE ANTEROGRADE-RETROGRADE A PONCTION UNIQUE | [2008/16] | Entry into regional phase | 05.02.2008 | National basic fee paid | 05.02.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.02.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.02.2008 | Examination requested [2008/16] | 12.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.07.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/03] | 30.08.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2010 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9960915 (RUIZ CARLOS E [US]) [X] 1,2,5,6 * page 6, line 19 - page 17, line 12; figures 1,2,5,7-11 *; | [XY]US2003181923 (VARDI GIL [US]) [X] 1,5,6 * the whole document * [Y] 3,4,7,8; | [YA]WO02076333 (ADVANCED STENT TECH INC [US], et al) [Y] 3,4,7,8 * the whole document * [A] 1,2,5,6; | [X]WO9836709 (SCIMED LIFE SYSTEMS INC [US]) [X] 1-8 * page 8, line 6 - page 9, line 11; figure 8a *; | [X]US5720735 (DORROS GERALD [US]) [X] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [A]WO0108724 (EMBOL X INC [US]) [A] 1-8 * abstract *; | [A]WO0103762 (ENDOLOGIX INC [US]) [A] 1-8 * abstract * |