EP1925015 - SYSTEM FOR PLASMA TREATMENT OF ENDLESS MATERIALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2008/22] | PLANT FOR PLASMA TREATMENT OF ENDLESS MATERIALS | ||
[2010/14] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.09.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ziger, Peter Grabenstrasse 40 A-8010 Graz / AT | For all designated states Eiselt, Primoz Pesnica pri Mariboro 38d 2211 Pesnica pri Mariboro / SI | [2008/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2008/22] | Representative(s) | Margotti, Herwig Franz, et al Schwarz & Partner Patentanwälte Wipplingerstrasse 30 1010 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | Margotti, Herwig Franz, et al Kopecky & Schwarz Patentanwälte Wipplingerstrasse 30 1010 Wien / AT | ||
Former [2008/22] | Margotti, Herwig Franz, et al Wipplingerstrase 30 1010 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 06774775.8 | 12.09.2006 | [2008/22] | WO2006AT00377 | Priority number, date | AT20050001496 | 12.09.2005 Original published format: AT 14962005 | [2008/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007030850 | Date: | 22.03.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1925015 | Date: | 28.05.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.03.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1925015 | Date: | 17.11.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.03.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H01J37/32 | [2008/22] | CPC: |
H01J37/32018 (EP);
H01J37/32009 (EP);
H01J37/32055 (EP);
H01J37/3266 (EP);
H01J37/3277 (EP);
H01J2237/3325 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/22] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANLAGE ZUR PLASMAPROZESSIERUNG VON ENDLOSMATERIAL | [2008/22] | English: | SYSTEM FOR PLASMA TREATMENT OF ENDLESS MATERIALS | [2010/14] | French: | INSTALLATION DE TRAITEMENT AU PLASMA D'UN MATERIAU SANS FIN | [2008/22] |
Former [2008/22] | PLANT FOR PLASMA TREATMENT OF ENDLESS MATERIALS | Entry into regional phase | 10.03.2008 | National basic fee paid | 10.03.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.03.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.07.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 10.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/22] | 14.04.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.07.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 26.07.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.08.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 17.11.2010 | CZ | 17.11.2010 | DK | 17.11.2010 | EE | 17.11.2010 | HU | 17.11.2010 | IE | 17.11.2010 | LT | 17.11.2010 | LV | 17.11.2010 | PL | 17.11.2010 | RO | 17.11.2010 | SI | 17.11.2010 | SK | 17.11.2010 | TR | 17.11.2010 | BG | 17.02.2011 | GR | 18.02.2011 | ES | 28.02.2011 | IS | 17.03.2011 | PT | 17.03.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | CY | 17.11.2010 | |
CZ | 17.11.2010 | ||
DK | 17.11.2010 | ||
EE | 17.11.2010 | ||
IE | 17.11.2010 | ||
LT | 17.11.2010 | ||
LV | 17.11.2010 | ||
PL | 17.11.2010 | ||
RO | 17.11.2010 | ||
SI | 17.11.2010 | ||
SK | 17.11.2010 | ||
TR | 17.11.2010 | ||
BG | 17.02.2011 | ||
GR | 18.02.2011 | ||
ES | 28.02.2011 | ||
IS | 17.03.2011 | ||
PT | 17.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | CY | 17.11.2010 | |
CZ | 17.11.2010 | ||
DK | 17.11.2010 | ||
EE | 17.11.2010 | ||
IE | 17.11.2010 | ||
LT | 17.11.2010 | ||
LV | 17.11.2010 | ||
PL | 17.11.2010 | ||
RO | 17.11.2010 | ||
SI | 17.11.2010 | ||
SK | 17.11.2010 | ||
BG | 17.02.2011 | ||
GR | 18.02.2011 | ||
ES | 28.02.2011 | ||
IS | 17.03.2011 | ||
PT | 17.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | CY | 17.11.2010 | |
CZ | 17.11.2010 | ||
DK | 17.11.2010 | ||
EE | 17.11.2010 | ||
IE | 17.11.2010 | ||
LT | 17.11.2010 | ||
LV | 17.11.2010 | ||
PL | 17.11.2010 | ||
SI | 17.11.2010 | ||
SK | 17.11.2010 | ||
BG | 17.02.2011 | ||
GR | 18.02.2011 | ||
ES | 28.02.2011 | ||
IS | 17.03.2011 | ||
PT | 17.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/35] | CY | 17.11.2010 | |
CZ | 17.11.2010 | ||
EE | 17.11.2010 | ||
IE | 17.11.2010 | ||
LT | 17.11.2010 | ||
LV | 17.11.2010 | ||
SI | 17.11.2010 | ||
BG | 17.02.2011 | ||
GR | 18.02.2011 | ||
ES | 28.02.2011 | ||
IS | 17.03.2011 | ||
PT | 17.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/33] | CY | 17.11.2010 | |
IE | 17.11.2010 | ||
LT | 17.11.2010 | ||
LV | 17.11.2010 | ||
SI | 17.11.2010 | ||
BG | 17.02.2011 | ||
GR | 18.02.2011 | ||
ES | 28.02.2011 | ||
IS | 17.03.2011 | ||
PT | 17.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/30] | CY | 17.11.2010 | |
LT | 17.11.2010 | ||
LV | 17.11.2010 | ||
SI | 17.11.2010 | ||
BG | 17.02.2011 | ||
GR | 18.02.2011 | ||
IS | 17.03.2011 | ||
PT | 17.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/23] | LT | 17.11.2010 | |
LV | 17.11.2010 | ||
IS | 17.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/19] | LT | 17.11.2010 | Cited in | International search | [A]US6083355 (SPENCE PAUL [US]) [A] 1-25 * column 6, lines 1-53 * * column 8, lines 1-5 * * column 9, lines 18-39 * * column 10, lines 29-57; figure 1 *; | [DYA]WO2004073009 (ZIGER PETER [AT], et al) [DY] 1,6,8-10,17,21 * page 1, lines 1-8, paragraph 1 * * page 1, lines 1-5, paragraph 4 * * page 4, line 2, paragraph 10 - page 6, line 4, paragraph 6 * * page 8, line 1, paragraph 13 - page 9, line 7, paragraph 2; figure 1 * * page 10, paragraph 3; figures 7,10 * * page 11, line 1, paragraph 2 - line 1, paragraph 4; figure 1 * * page 12; table 1 * [A] 2-5,7,11-16,18-20,22-25; | [A]US6818853 (SCHEIN JOCHEN [US], et al) [A] 1-7 * column 3, lines 28-35 ** column 5, lines 26-39; figure 2 *; | [Y]WO2005010228 (ADVANCED ENERGY IND INC [US]) [Y] 1,6,8-10,17,21 * page 3, lines 17-22 * * page 5, line 10 - line 30; figure 1 *; | [A]US2005145174 (CHALEIX DANIEL [FR], et al) [A] 1-25 * paragraph [0009] * * paragraphs [0019] , [0020] * * paragraphs [0034] - [0040]; figures 1,2 * * paragraphs [0042] , [0043]; figure 3 *; | [A]DE10361908 (XTREME TECH GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-7 * paragraph [0015] * * paragraphs [0040] - [0042]; figures 1,2a-c * |