EP1924286 - PHROPHYLACTIC AND/OR THERAPEUTIC METHOD FOR TREATMENT OF AUTOIMMUNE DISEASE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 05.03.2010 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.03.2010 | Withdrawal of application | published on 07.04.2010 [2010/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Garvan Institute of Medical Research St. Vincent's Hospital 384 Victoria Street Darlinghurst, NSW 2010 / AU | [N/P] |
Former [2008/22] | For all designated states GARVAN INSTITUTE OF MEDICAL RESEARCH St. Vincent's Hospital, 384 Victoria Street Darlinghurst, NSW 2010 / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GREY, Shane 2/18 Eastern Avenue Dover Heights, New South Wales 2030 / AU | [2008/22] | Representative(s) | Plougmann Vingtoft a/s Strandvejen 70 2900 Hellerup / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2008/22] | Plougmann & Vingtoft A/S Sundkrogsgade 9 P.O. Box 831 2100 Copenhagen Ø / DK | Application number, filing date | 06774811.1 | 14.08.2006 | [2008/22] | WO2006AU01163 | Priority number, date | US20050707803P | 12.08.2005 Original published format: US 707803 P | [2008/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007019618 | Date: | 22.02.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1924286 | Date: | 28.05.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.02.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 22.02.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.12.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/28, A61K39/395, A61K38/00, A61P3/08, A61P3/10, A61P37/00, A61P37/02, A61P37/06 | [2010/02] | CPC: |
A61K39/0008 (EP,US);
A61P3/08 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2008/22] | A61K39/395, A61K38/00, A61P3/08, A61P3/10, A61P37/00, A61P37/02, A61P37/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/22] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PROPHYLAKTISCHES UND/ODER THERAPEUTISCHES VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON AUTOIMMUNKRANKHEITEN | [2008/22] | English: | PHROPHYLACTIC AND/OR THERAPEUTIC METHOD FOR TREATMENT OF AUTOIMMUNE DISEASE | [2008/22] | French: | PROCÉDÉ THÉRAPEUTIQUE ET/OU PHROPYLACTIQUE POUR LE TRAITEMENT D'UNE MALADIE AUTO-IMMUNE | [2008/22] | Entry into regional phase | 11.03.2008 | National basic fee paid | 11.03.2008 | Search fee paid | 11.03.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.03.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.03.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/22] | 01.03.2010 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2010/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO03072713 (BIOGEN INC [US], et al) [X] 1-12* examples 1,2; claims 1-5 * | International search | [X]WO0067796 (GENENTECH INC [US], et al); | [X]WO2004056312 (GENENTECH INC [US], et al); | [X]US2003103986 (RIXON MARK W [US], et al); | [X] - WINTER E. ET AL., "Prevention Strategies for Type 1 Diabetes Mellitus: Current Status and Future Directions", BIODRUGS, (2003), vol. 17, no. 1, pages 39 - 64, XP008059735 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2165/00063030-200317010-00004 | [X] - CANNINGA-VAN DIJK M.R. ET AL., "Anti-CD20 monoclonal antibody treatment in 6 patients with therapy-refractory chronic graft-versus-host disease", BLOOD, (2004), vol. 104, no. 8, pages 2603 - 2606, XP003008628 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1182/blood-2004-05-1855 | [Y] - BROOKS-WORRELL B.M. ET AL., "Autoimmunity to Islet Proteins in Children Diagnosed with New-Onset Diabetes", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL ENDOCRINOLOGY AND METABOLISM, (2004), vol. 89, no. 5, pages 2222 - 2227, XP003008629 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1210/jc.2003-031360 | [Y] - NAGATA M. ET AL., "Detection of Autoreactive T Cells in Type 1 Diabetes Using Coded Autoantigens and an Immunoglobulin-Free Cytokine ELISPOT Assay", ANNALS OF THE NEW YORK ACADEMY OF SCIENCES, (2004), vol. 1037, pages 10 - 15, XP008077204 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1196/annals.1337.002 | [Y] - SMERDON R.A. ET AL., "CD5+ B-Cells at the Onset of Type 1 Diabetes and in the Prediabetic Period", DIABETES CARE, (1994), vol. 17, no. 7, pages 657 - 664, XP008077212 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2337/diacare.17.7.657 | [X] - GROSS J.A. ET AL., "TACI and BCMA are receptors for a TNF homologue implicated in B-cell autoimmune disease", NATURE, (2000), vol. 404, pages 995 - 999, XP002104939 | [X] - GROSS J.A. ET AL., "TACI-IG Neutralizes Molecules Critical for B Cell Development and Autoimmune Disease: Impaired B Cell Maturation in Mice Lacking BLYsS", IMMUNITY, (2001), vol. 15, pages 289 - 302, XP003008630 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1074-7613(01)00183-2 | [X] - PELLETIER M. ET AL., "Comparison of Soluble Decoy IgG Fusion Proteins of BAFF-R and BCMA as Antagonists for BAFF", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGY CHEMISTRY, (2003), vol. 278, no. 35, pages 33127 - 33133, XP002321479 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M305754200 |