EP1945669 - CHIMERIC ANTIBODIES WITH NEW WORLD PRIMATE REGIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.08.2013 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.09.2013 [2013/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cephalon Australia Pty Ltd Level 2 37 Epping Road Macquarie Park, NSW 2113 / AU | [N/P] |
Former [2010/38] | For all designated states Cephalon Australia Pty Ltd Level 2, 37 Epping Road Macquarie Park NSW 2113 / AU | ||
Former [2008/30] | For all designated states ARANA THERAPEUTICS LIMITED Level 2, 37 Epping Road Macquarie Park New South Wales 2113 / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JENNINGS, Philip, Anthony 5 Oswald Close Warrawee, New South Wales 2074 / AU | 02 /
DOYLE, Anthony, Gerard 6B Plunkett Street Drummoyne, New South Wales 2047 / AU | 03 /
CLARKE, Adam, William 7/96-98 Hampden Road Russell Lea, New South Wales 2046 / AU | [2008/30] | Representative(s) | Care, Alison, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/30] | Care, Alison, et al Kilburn & Strode 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 06774813.7 | 15.08.2006 | [2008/30] | WO2006AU01166 | Priority number, date | AU20050904406 | 15.08.2005 Original published format: AU 2005904406 | [2008/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007019621 | Date: | 22.02.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1945669 | Date: | 23.07.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.02.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 22.02.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.06.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/18, A61K39/395, C07K16/46 | [2009/27] | CPC: |
C07K16/18 (EP,KR);
A61K39/395 (KR);
C07K2317/24 (EP);
C07K2317/565 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2008/30] | C07K16/18, A61K39/395 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/30] | Extension states | AL | 17.03.2008 | BA | 17.03.2008 | HR | 17.03.2008 | MK | 17.03.2008 | RS | 17.03.2008 | Title | German: | CHIMÄRE ANTIKÖRPER MIT NEUWELTPRIMATENREGIONEN | [2008/30] | English: | CHIMERIC ANTIBODIES WITH NEW WORLD PRIMATE REGIONS | [2008/30] | French: | ANTICORPS CHIMÉRIQUES AVEC RÉGIONS DE PRIMATES DU NOUVEAU MONDE | [2008/30] | Entry into regional phase | 17.03.2008 | National basic fee paid | 17.03.2008 | Search fee paid | 17.03.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.03.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/30] | 26.06.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.04.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.11.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.08.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/36] | 09.04.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2013/36] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.10.2009 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 25.08.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 25.08.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 07.09.2011 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2012 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DY]WO9302108 (IDEC PHARMA CORP [US]) [DY] 1-15 * page 2 - page 12 *; | [Y]US2003143682 (NICOLAIDES NICHOLAS C [US], et al) [Y] 6,7,13 * page 3, paragraph 27 - page 15, paragraph 53; example 6 *; | [DY] - VON BUDINGEN HANS-CHRISTIAN ET AL, "Characterization of the expressed immunoglobulin IGHV repertoire in the New World marmoset Callithrix jacchus", IMMUNOGENETICS, (200109), vol. 53, no. 7, ISSN 0093-7711, pages 557 - 563, XP002527012 [DY] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s002510100362 | [Y] - SPEIDEL M T ET AL, "Detection of human and marmoset immunoglobulin heavy chain by a polyclonal antiserum to a marmoset immunoglobulin-related T cell product", EXPERIMENTAL AND CLINICAL IMMUNOGENETICS, S.KARGER, BASEL, CH, (19890101), vol. 6, no. 4, ISSN 0254-9670, pages 245 - 250, XP009116561 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * | [Y] - REITER Y ET AL, "An antibody single-domain phage display library of a native heavy chain variable region: isolation of functional single-domain VH molecules with a unique interface", JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, LONDON, GB, (19990101), vol. 290, no. 3, ISSN 0022-2836, pages 685 - 698, XP004461990 [Y] 8 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/jmbi.1999.2923 | [Y] - HOLT L J ET AL, "Domain antibodies: proteins for therapy", TRENDS IN BIOTECHNOLOGY, ELSEVIER PUBLICATIONS, CAMBRIDGE, GB, (20031101), vol. 21, no. 11, ISSN 0167-7799, pages 484 - 490, XP004467495 [Y] 8 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.tibtech.2003.08.007 | [Y] - FOOTE J ET AL, "Antibody framework residues affecting the conformation of the hypervariable loops", JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, LONDON, GB, vol. 224, no. 2, ISSN 0022-2836, (19920320), pages 487 - 499, (19920320), XP024011188 [Y] 6,7,13 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0022-2836(92)91010-M | International search | [A] - LANGERMANS J. ET AL., "Reactivity of human T-lymphocyte-specific antibodies with peripheral blood mononuclear cells and spleen of Aotus azarae ssp. boliviensis (owl monkey)", J. MED. PRIMATOL., (2000), vol. 29, pages 397 - 401, XP008077203 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1600-0684.2000.290603.x | Examination | WO0233042 | WO2004003019 |