EP1921795 - A METHOD OF REALIZING USER REGISTRATION TRIGGER IN IP MULTIMEDIA SUBSYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.03.2013 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2019 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: TR | published on 17.07.2019 [2019/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2012/20] | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District, Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | ||
Former [2008/20] | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building, Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHU, Fenqin Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2012/20] |
Former [2008/20] | 01 /
ZHU, Fenqin Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | Representative(s) | Kreuz, Georg Maria, et al Huawei Technologies Duesseldorf GmbH Riesstraße 25 80992 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/04] | Kreuz, Georg Maria, et al Huawei Technologies Duesseldorf GmbH Dessauerstrasse 3 80992 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/13] | Löfgren, Bengt Håkan Alpo, et al Groth & Co KB Box 6107 102 32 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2009/49] | Warcoin, Jacques, et al Cabinet Régimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | ||
Former [2008/20] | Warcoin, Jacques, et al Cabinet Régimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | Application number, filing date | 06775291.5 | 04.08.2006 | [2008/20] | WO2006CN01971 | Priority number, date | CN20051036979 | 30.08.2005 Original published format: CN200510036979 | [2008/20] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007025450 | Date: | 08.03.2007 | Language: | ZH | [2007/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1921795 | Date: | 14.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1921795 | Date: | 16.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 08.03.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.10.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H04W8/04, H04L29/06, H04L29/12, H04L12/56 | [2011/44] | CPC: |
H04L12/56 (EP,US);
H04L61/4588 (EP,BR,US);
H04L65/1016 (EP,BR,US);
H04L65/1073 (EP,BR,US);
H04L65/1095 (EP);
H04W8/04 (EP,BR,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/20] | H04L12/24, H04L12/56 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/20] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES BENUTZERREGISTRIERUNGS-AUSLÖSERS IN EINEM MULTIMEDIA-SUBSYSTEM EINES IP-NETZWERKS | [2008/20] | English: | A METHOD OF REALIZING USER REGISTRATION TRIGGER IN IP MULTIMEDIA SUBSYSTEM | [2008/20] | French: | METHODE POUR REALISER UN DECLENCHEMENT D'INSCRIPTION D'UTILISATEUR DANS UN SOUS-SYSTEME MULTIMEDIA IP | [2008/20] | Entry into regional phase | 13.11.2007 | Translation filed | 13.11.2007 | National basic fee paid | 13.11.2007 | Search fee paid | 13.11.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.11.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.11.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.11.2007 | Examination requested [2008/20] | 11.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.04.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.12.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.02.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.10.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.03.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 05.03.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.03.2009 | Opposition(s) | 19.02.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.08.2006 | AT | 16.05.2012 | BE | 16.05.2012 | CY | 16.05.2012 | CZ | 16.05.2012 | DK | 16.05.2012 | EE | 16.05.2012 | FI | 16.05.2012 | LT | 16.05.2012 | LV | 16.05.2012 | NL | 16.05.2012 | PL | 16.05.2012 | RO | 16.05.2012 | SE | 16.05.2012 | SI | 16.05.2012 | SK | 16.05.2012 | IE | 04.08.2012 | LU | 04.08.2012 | BG | 16.08.2012 | GR | 17.08.2012 | CH | 31.08.2012 | LI | 31.08.2012 | MC | 31.08.2012 | IS | 16.09.2012 | PT | 17.09.2012 | [2019/29] |
Former [2014/34] | HU | 04.08.2006 | |
AT | 16.05.2012 | ||
BE | 16.05.2012 | ||
CY | 16.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 16.05.2012 | ||
DK | 16.05.2012 | ||
EE | 16.05.2012 | ||
FI | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LV | 16.05.2012 | ||
NL | 16.05.2012 | ||
PL | 16.05.2012 | ||
RO | 16.05.2012 | ||
SE | 16.05.2012 | ||
SI | 16.05.2012 | ||
SK | 16.05.2012 | ||
IE | 04.08.2012 | ||
LU | 04.08.2012 | ||
TR | 04.08.2012 | ||
BG | 16.08.2012 | ||
GR | 17.08.2012 | ||
CH | 31.08.2012 | ||
LI | 31.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
PT | 17.09.2012 | ||
Former [2014/27] | AT | 16.05.2012 | |
BE | 16.05.2012 | ||
CY | 16.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 16.05.2012 | ||
DK | 16.05.2012 | ||
EE | 16.05.2012 | ||
FI | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LV | 16.05.2012 | ||
NL | 16.05.2012 | ||
PL | 16.05.2012 | ||
RO | 16.05.2012 | ||
SE | 16.05.2012 | ||
SI | 16.05.2012 | ||
SK | 16.05.2012 | ||
IE | 04.08.2012 | ||
LU | 04.08.2012 | ||
TR | 04.08.2012 | ||
BG | 16.08.2012 | ||
GR | 17.08.2012 | ||
CH | 31.08.2012 | ||
LI | 31.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
PT | 17.09.2012 | ||
Former [2014/25] | AT | 16.05.2012 | |
BE | 16.05.2012 | ||
CY | 16.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 16.05.2012 | ||
DK | 16.05.2012 | ||
EE | 16.05.2012 | ||
FI | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LV | 16.05.2012 | ||
NL | 16.05.2012 | ||
PL | 16.05.2012 | ||
RO | 16.05.2012 | ||
SE | 16.05.2012 | ||
SI | 16.05.2012 | ||
SK | 16.05.2012 | ||
IE | 04.08.2012 | ||
TR | 04.08.2012 | ||
BG | 16.08.2012 | ||
GR | 17.08.2012 | ||
CH | 31.08.2012 | ||
LI | 31.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
PT | 17.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 16.05.2012 | |
BE | 16.05.2012 | ||
CY | 16.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 16.05.2012 | ||
DK | 16.05.2012 | ||
EE | 16.05.2012 | ||
FI | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LV | 16.05.2012 | ||
NL | 16.05.2012 | ||
PL | 16.05.2012 | ||
RO | 16.05.2012 | ||
SE | 16.05.2012 | ||
SI | 16.05.2012 | ||
SK | 16.05.2012 | ||
IE | 04.08.2012 | ||
BG | 16.08.2012 | ||
GR | 17.08.2012 | ||
CH | 31.08.2012 | ||
LI | 31.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
PT | 17.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 16.05.2012 | |
BE | 16.05.2012 | ||
CY | 16.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 16.05.2012 | ||
DK | 16.05.2012 | ||
EE | 16.05.2012 | ||
FI | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LV | 16.05.2012 | ||
NL | 16.05.2012 | ||
PL | 16.05.2012 | ||
RO | 16.05.2012 | ||
SE | 16.05.2012 | ||
SI | 16.05.2012 | ||
SK | 16.05.2012 | ||
IE | 04.08.2012 | ||
GR | 17.08.2012 | ||
CH | 31.08.2012 | ||
LI | 31.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
PT | 17.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | AT | 16.05.2012 | |
BE | 16.05.2012 | ||
CY | 16.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 16.05.2012 | ||
DK | 16.05.2012 | ||
EE | 16.05.2012 | ||
FI | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LV | 16.05.2012 | ||
NL | 16.05.2012 | ||
PL | 16.05.2012 | ||
RO | 16.05.2012 | ||
SE | 16.05.2012 | ||
SI | 16.05.2012 | ||
SK | 16.05.2012 | ||
GR | 17.08.2012 | ||
CH | 31.08.2012 | ||
LI | 31.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
PT | 17.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/16] | AT | 16.05.2012 | |
BE | 16.05.2012 | ||
CY | 16.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 16.05.2012 | ||
DK | 16.05.2012 | ||
EE | 16.05.2012 | ||
FI | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LV | 16.05.2012 | ||
NL | 16.05.2012 | ||
PL | 16.05.2012 | ||
RO | 16.05.2012 | ||
SE | 16.05.2012 | ||
SI | 16.05.2012 | ||
SK | 16.05.2012 | ||
GR | 17.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
PT | 17.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 16.05.2012 | |
BE | 16.05.2012 | ||
CY | 16.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 16.05.2012 | ||
DK | 16.05.2012 | ||
EE | 16.05.2012 | ||
FI | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LV | 16.05.2012 | ||
NL | 16.05.2012 | ||
PL | 16.05.2012 | ||
RO | 16.05.2012 | ||
SE | 16.05.2012 | ||
SI | 16.05.2012 | ||
SK | 16.05.2012 | ||
GR | 17.08.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
PT | 17.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | AT | 16.05.2012 | |
BE | 16.05.2012 | ||
CY | 16.05.2012 | ||
DK | 16.05.2012 | ||
EE | 16.05.2012 | ||
FI | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LV | 16.05.2012 | ||
NL | 16.05.2012 | ||
PL | 16.05.2012 | ||
SE | 16.05.2012 | ||
SI | 16.05.2012 | ||
GR | 17.08.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
PT | 17.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 16.05.2012 | |
BE | 16.05.2012 | ||
CY | 16.05.2012 | ||
DK | 16.05.2012 | ||
FI | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LV | 16.05.2012 | ||
NL | 16.05.2012 | ||
PL | 16.05.2012 | ||
SE | 16.05.2012 | ||
SI | 16.05.2012 | ||
GR | 17.08.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
PT | 17.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 16.05.2012 | |
BE | 16.05.2012 | ||
CY | 16.05.2012 | ||
FI | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LV | 16.05.2012 | ||
PL | 16.05.2012 | ||
SE | 16.05.2012 | ||
SI | 16.05.2012 | ||
GR | 17.08.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
PT | 17.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/04] | BE | 16.05.2012 | |
CY | 16.05.2012 | ||
FI | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LV | 16.05.2012 | ||
PL | 16.05.2012 | ||
SE | 16.05.2012 | ||
SI | 16.05.2012 | ||
GR | 17.08.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
PT | 17.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/01] | CY | 16.05.2012 | |
FI | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LV | 16.05.2012 | ||
PL | 16.05.2012 | ||
SE | 16.05.2012 | ||
SI | 16.05.2012 | ||
GR | 17.08.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
PT | 17.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/51] | CY | 16.05.2012 | |
FI | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LV | 16.05.2012 | ||
PL | 16.05.2012 | ||
SE | 16.05.2012 | ||
SI | 16.05.2012 | ||
GR | 17.08.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 16.05.2012 | |
FI | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
LV | 16.05.2012 | ||
PL | 16.05.2012 | ||
SE | 16.05.2012 | ||
GR | 17.08.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 16.05.2012 | |
FI | 16.05.2012 | ||
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
PL | 16.05.2012 | ||
SE | 16.05.2012 | ||
IS | 16.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | FI | 16.05.2012 | |
LT | 16.05.2012 | ||
SE | 16.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | LT | 16.05.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO02091786 (NOKIA CORP [FI], et al) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [X]WO2005039108 (NOKIA CORP [FI], et al) [X] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [L] - 3GPP TSG SA WG2 ARCHITECTURE, "IMS Registration Trigger", S2-052159, Sophia Antipolis, France, (20050909), pages 1 - 2, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_sa/WG2_Arch/TSGS2_48_Sophia_Antipolis/Docs/S2-052159.zip, (20081021), XP002500626 [L] 1-10 * the whole document * | International search | [A]WO02102107 (NOKIA CORP [FI], et al); | [A]US2003119506 (SINGHAI SANDEEP [US], et al); | [A]CN1642130 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]); | [XP]CN1767482 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) | by applicant | WO2005039108 | CN1767482 |