EP1922246 - WATER CRAFT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.12.2011 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nikolakis, Dimitrios Elebeken 6 22299 Hamburg / DE | [2008/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2008/21] | Representative(s) | Groth, Wieland Patentanwalt Zippelhaus 4 20457 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/21] | Groth, Wieland Schopenstehl 22 20095 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 06775905.0 | 25.08.2006 | [2008/21] | WO2006DE01487 | Priority number, date | DE20051041439 | 31.08.2005 Original published format: DE102005041439 | [2008/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007025512 | Date: | 08.03.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/10] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1922246 | Date: | 21.05.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.03.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1922246 | Date: | 16.02.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.02.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B63B1/22, B63B1/38, B63H19/06 | [2008/21] | CPC: |
B63B1/38 (EP);
B63B1/22 (EP);
Y02T70/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/21] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | WASSERFAHRZEUG | [2008/21] | English: | WATER CRAFT | [2008/21] | French: | VEHICULE MARIN | [2008/21] | Entry into regional phase | 26.03.2008 | National basic fee paid | 26.03.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.03.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/21] | 27.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.07.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 11.09.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.09.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.12.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 29.12.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.11.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/04] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 14.09.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 14.09.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 16.02.2011 | EE | 16.02.2011 | HU | 16.02.2011 | IE | 16.02.2011 | IS | 16.02.2011 | LT | 16.02.2011 | LV | 16.02.2011 | PL | 16.02.2011 | RO | 16.02.2011 | SI | 16.02.2011 | SK | 16.02.2011 | BG | 16.05.2011 | PT | 16.06.2011 | AT | 25.08.2011 | LU | 25.08.2011 | CH | 31.08.2011 | LI | 31.08.2011 | MC | 31.08.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/33] | CZ | 16.02.2011 | |
EE | 16.02.2011 | ||
IE | 16.02.2011 | ||
IS | 16.02.2011 | ||
LT | 16.02.2011 | ||
LV | 16.02.2011 | ||
PL | 16.02.2011 | ||
RO | 16.02.2011 | ||
SI | 16.02.2011 | ||
SK | 16.02.2011 | ||
BG | 16.05.2011 | ||
PT | 16.06.2011 | ||
AT | 25.08.2011 | ||
LU | 25.08.2011 | ||
CH | 31.08.2011 | ||
LI | 31.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | CZ | 16.02.2011 | |
EE | 16.02.2011 | ||
IE | 16.02.2011 | ||
LT | 16.02.2011 | ||
LV | 16.02.2011 | ||
PL | 16.02.2011 | ||
RO | 16.02.2011 | ||
SI | 16.02.2011 | ||
SK | 16.02.2011 | ||
BG | 16.05.2011 | ||
PT | 16.06.2011 | ||
AT | 25.08.2011 | ||
LU | 25.08.2011 | ||
CH | 31.08.2011 | ||
LI | 31.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
Former [2013/07] | CZ | 16.02.2011 | |
EE | 16.02.2011 | ||
IE | 16.02.2011 | ||
LT | 16.02.2011 | ||
LV | 16.02.2011 | ||
PL | 16.02.2011 | ||
RO | 16.02.2011 | ||
SI | 16.02.2011 | ||
SK | 16.02.2011 | ||
BG | 16.05.2011 | ||
PT | 16.06.2011 | ||
AT | 25.08.2011 | ||
CH | 31.08.2011 | ||
LI | 31.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | CZ | 16.02.2011 | |
EE | 16.02.2011 | ||
IE | 16.02.2011 | ||
LT | 16.02.2011 | ||
LV | 16.02.2011 | ||
PL | 16.02.2011 | ||
RO | 16.02.2011 | ||
SI | 16.02.2011 | ||
SK | 16.02.2011 | ||
BG | 16.05.2011 | ||
PT | 16.06.2011 | ||
CH | 31.08.2011 | ||
LI | 31.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/18] | CZ | 16.02.2011 | |
EE | 16.02.2011 | ||
IE | 16.02.2011 | ||
LT | 16.02.2011 | ||
LV | 16.02.2011 | ||
PL | 16.02.2011 | ||
RO | 16.02.2011 | ||
SI | 16.02.2011 | ||
SK | 16.02.2011 | ||
BG | 16.05.2011 | ||
PT | 16.06.2011 | ||
MC | 31.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | CZ | 16.02.2011 | |
EE | 16.02.2011 | ||
IE | 16.02.2011 | ||
LT | 16.02.2011 | ||
LV | 16.02.2011 | ||
PL | 16.02.2011 | ||
RO | 16.02.2011 | ||
SI | 16.02.2011 | ||
SK | 16.02.2011 | ||
BG | 16.05.2011 | ||
PT | 16.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/48] | EE | 16.02.2011 | |
IE | 16.02.2011 | ||
LT | 16.02.2011 | ||
LV | 16.02.2011 | ||
PL | 16.02.2011 | ||
SI | 16.02.2011 | ||
BG | 16.05.2011 | ||
PT | 16.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | LT | 16.02.2011 | |
LV | 16.02.2011 | ||
PL | 16.02.2011 | ||
SI | 16.02.2011 | ||
BG | 16.05.2011 | ||
PT | 16.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | LT | 16.02.2011 | |
LV | 16.02.2011 | ||
PL | 16.02.2011 | ||
PT | 16.06.2011 | Cited in | International search | [X]DE3121402 (BRODNIG GERALD DIPL ING) [X] 1-4,8-12,14-19,22-26 * figures 15-24 * * page 36, paragraph L - page 37 * * page 25, paragraph 1 *; | [X]EP0071763 (GUIGAN FRANCK) [X] 1,3,4,8-10,12,13,15-19,22-26 * figure - ** page 3, paragraph L - page 5, line 27 * |