EP1911056 - OPERATOR'S ELEMENT COMPRISING AN ADJUSTABLE CATCH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.10.2010 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.10.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.11.2010 [2010/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Preh GmbH An der Stadthalle 97616 Bad Neustadt a.d. Saale / DE | [2008/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ECKERT, Gerold Am Bersbach 16 97616 Bad Neustadt a.d. Saale / DE | 02 /
KIRCHNER, Thilo Steinbergstrasse 19 97705 Burkardroth / DE | [2008/16] | Representative(s) | Bauer, Wulf, et al Patentanwälte Bauer Vorberg Kayser Partnerschaft mbB Goltsteinstrasse 87 50968 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/31] | Bauer, Wulf, et al Bauer Vorberg Kayser Patentanwälte Lindenallee 43 50968 Köln (Marienburg) / DE | ||
Former [2009/08] | Bauer, Wulf, et al Bauer - Vorberg - Kayser Patentanwälte Lindenallee 43 50968 Köln / DE | ||
Former [2008/16] | Thul, Hermann Thul Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Rheinmetall Platz 1 40476 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 06776279.9 | 18.07.2006 | [2008/16] | WO2006EP07048 | Priority number, date | DE20051033986 | 21.07.2005 Original published format: DE102005033986 | DE20061026610 | 08.06.2006 Original published format: DE102006026610 | [2008/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007009748 | Date: | 25.01.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1911056 | Date: | 16.04.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.01.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.01.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H01H19/11, H01H3/50 | [2008/16] | CPC: |
G05G5/06 (EP);
B60K35/10 (EP);
G05G1/08 (EP);
H01H19/11 (EP);
B60K2360/126 (EP);
H01H2215/03 (EP);
H01H3/50 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/16] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BEDIENELEMENT MIT EINSTELLBARER RAST | [2008/16] | English: | OPERATOR'S ELEMENT COMPRISING AN ADJUSTABLE CATCH | [2008/16] | French: | ÉLÉMENT DE COMMANDE À CRAN D'ARRÊT RÉGLABLE | [2008/16] | Entry into regional phase | 21.02.2008 | National basic fee paid | 21.02.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.02.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.02.2008 | Examination requested [2008/16] | 10.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.05.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/47] | 28.06.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2010 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE1221336 (BUSCH JAEGER DUERENER METALL) [A] 1* column 3, lines 1-22; figure 1 *; | [A]DE2434272 (MARQUARDT J & J) [A] 1 * page 9, paragraph 2 *; | [A]US4038508 (MAPELSDEN GEORGE C) [A] 1 * figure 2 *; | [A]US4191867 (FEASTER DONAVON L [US]) [A] 1 * figure 1 *; | [DY]DE19505737 (BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE]) [DY] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [Y]US2005139033 (ERDLOFF DIRK [DE]) [Y] 1-6 * paragraph [0021] * |