EP1915422 - PLASTICIZING SYSTEM FOR A RUBBER COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 23.05.2014 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.05.2014 | Withdrawal of application | published on 25.06.2014 [2014/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COMPAGNIE GENERALE DES ETABLISSEMENTS MICHELIN 12 cours Sablon 63000 Clermont-Ferrand / FR | For all designated states Michelin Recherche et Technique S.A. Route Louis Braille 10 et 12 1763 Granges-Paccot / CH | [2012/32] |
Former [2008/18] | For all designated states Société de Technologie Michelin 23, rue Breschet 63000 Clermont-Ferrand / FR | ||
For all designated states Michelin Recherche et Technique S.A. Route Louis Braille 10 et 12 1763 Granges-Paccot / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROBERT, Pierre 85, boulevard Lafayette F-63000 Clermont-Ferrand / FR | 02 /
DE LANDTSHEER, Stéphanie 51, rue Jules Favre F-63100 Clermont-Ferrand / FR | 03 /
FAVROT, Jean-Michel 33, rue des Vergers F-63800 Cournon-d'Auvergne / FR | 04 /
LOPITAUX, Garance 6, lieu-dit "Le Bray" F-03300 Bellenaves / FR | [2008/18] | Representative(s) | Ribière, Joel Manufacture Française des Pneumatiques Michelin CBS/CORP/J/PI - F35 - Ladoux 23, place des Carmes - Déchaux 63040 Clermont-Ferrand Cedex 9 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/18] | Ribière, Joel M.F.P. Michelin, SGD/LG/PI - F35 - Ladoux 63040 Clermont-Ferrand Cedex 9 / FR | Application number, filing date | 06776284.9 | 18.07.2006 | [2008/18] | WO2006EP07056 | Priority number, date | FR20050008502 | 08.08.2005 Original published format: FR 0508502 | [2008/18] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007017060 | Date: | 15.02.2007 | Language: | FR | [2007/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1915422 | Date: | 30.04.2008 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.02.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.02.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C08K5/00, C08K5/01, C08L21/00, B60C1/00 | [2008/18] | CPC: |
B60C1/0016 (EP,US);
C08K5/00 (KR);
B60C1/00 (KR);
C08K5/0016 (EP,US);
C08K5/01 (KR);
C08L21/00 (EP,KR,US)
| C-Set: |
C08K5/0016, C08L21/00 (EP,US);
C08L21/00, C08L2666/04 (US,EP);
C08L21/00, C08L2666/06 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/18] | Title | German: | WEICHMACHERSYSTEM FÜR EINE KAUTSCHUKZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2008/18] | English: | PLASTICIZING SYSTEM FOR A RUBBER COMPOSITION | [2008/18] | French: | SYSTEME PLASTIFIANT POUR COMPOSITION DE CAOUTCHOUC | [2008/18] | Entry into regional phase | 10.03.2008 | National basic fee paid | 10.03.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.03.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/18] | 01.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.02.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 04.05.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.05.2014 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2014/26] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.07.2008 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 04.05.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 04.05.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 28.05.2009 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP1077223 (GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER [US]) [Y] 1-37 * page 2, paragraph 6 * * page 4, paragraph 28 * * page 7, paragraph 44 * * page 9, lines 40,41 * * examples 1,2 *; | [Y]EP1270657 (CONTINENTAL AG [DE]) [Y] 1-37 * page 5, paragraphs 23,24 * * page 6, paragraph 34 * * examples V1,V3; table 1 *; | [Y]WO2004022644 (MICHELIN SOC TECH [FR], et al) [Y] 1-37 * page 2, lines 4-23 * * page 6, lines 1-6 ** page 7, lines 9-15 * |