Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8899055 | Global Dossier | 02.12.2014 | B2 | US2008229765 | 25.09.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006EP07062 | 18.07.2006 | DE102005034141 | 19.07.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1907761 | Global Dossier | 23.11.2016 | B1 | EP1907761 | 09.04.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006EP07062 | 18.07.2006 | DE102005034141 | 19.07.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2613929T | 29.05.2017 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2006EP07062 | 18.07.2006 | DE102005034141 | 19.07.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007009752 | Global Dossier | 25.01.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102005034141 | 19.07.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102005034141 | 25.01.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102005034141 | 19.07.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT1907761T | 21.02.2017 | T | Priority number | Date | DE102005034141 | 19.07.2005 |