EP1907761 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR COOLING AND DEHUMIDIFYING ROOM AIR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.09.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastrasse 27c 80686 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastrasse 27c 80686 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/15] | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastrasse 27c 80686 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KÜNZEL, Hartwig Adolf-Kolping-Strasse 51 83607 Holzkirchen / DE | 02 /
SEDLBAUER, Klaus Wallbergstrasse 6 83607 Holzkirchen / DE | [2008/15] | Application number, filing date | 06776290.6 | 18.07.2006 | [2008/15] | WO2006EP07062 | Priority number, date | DE20051034141 | 19.07.2005 Original published format: DE102005034141 | [2008/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007009752 | Date: | 25.01.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1907761 | Date: | 09.04.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.01.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1907761 | Date: | 23.11.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.01.2007 | Classification | IPC: | F24F3/14, F24F5/00 | [2008/15] | CPC: |
F24F5/0035 (EP,US);
F24F1/0007 (EP,US);
F24F1/0071 (EP,US);
F24F3/1417 (EP,US);
F24F2003/144 (US);
F24F2006/001 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/47] |
Former [2008/15] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR KÜHLUNG UND ENTFEUCHTUNG DER RAUMLUFT | [2008/15] | English: | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR COOLING AND DEHUMIDIFYING ROOM AIR | [2008/15] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR REFROIDIR ET ASSECHER L'AIR D'UNE PIECE | [2008/15] | Entry into regional phase | 19.02.2008 | National basic fee paid | 19.02.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.02.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.02.2008 | Examination requested [2008/15] | 19.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.06.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.01.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.05.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.07.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.10.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 13.10.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.10.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.12.2008 | Opposition(s) | 24.08.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 28.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.07.2006 | CY | 23.11.2016 | CZ | 23.11.2016 | DK | 23.11.2016 | EE | 23.11.2016 | FI | 23.11.2016 | LT | 23.11.2016 | LV | 23.11.2016 | MC | 23.11.2016 | PL | 23.11.2016 | RO | 23.11.2016 | SE | 23.11.2016 | SI | 23.11.2016 | SK | 23.11.2016 | TR | 23.11.2016 | BG | 23.02.2017 | GR | 24.02.2017 | IS | 23.03.2017 | IE | 18.07.2017 | BE | 31.07.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 18.07.2006 | |
CY | 23.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2016 | ||
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
FI | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
MC | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RO | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
SI | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
TR | 23.11.2016 | ||
BG | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
IE | 18.07.2017 | ||
BE | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 18.07.2006 | |
CY | 23.11.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.11.2016 | ||
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
FI | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
MC | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RO | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
SI | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
BG | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
IE | 18.07.2017 | ||
BE | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 18.07.2006 | |
CZ | 23.11.2016 | ||
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
FI | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
MC | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RO | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
SI | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
BG | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
IE | 18.07.2017 | ||
BE | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2019/30] | CZ | 23.11.2016 | |
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
FI | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
MC | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RO | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
SI | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
BG | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
IE | 18.07.2017 | ||
BE | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | CZ | 23.11.2016 | |
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
FI | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RO | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
SI | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
BG | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
IE | 18.07.2017 | ||
BE | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | CZ | 23.11.2016 | |
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
FI | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RO | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
SI | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
BG | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
IE | 18.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | CZ | 23.11.2016 | |
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
FI | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RO | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
SI | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
BG | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/42] | CZ | 23.11.2016 | |
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
FI | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RO | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
BG | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/37] | CZ | 23.11.2016 | |
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
FI | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RO | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/35] | CZ | 23.11.2016 | |
DK | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
FI | 23.11.2016 | ||
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
RO | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/26] | FI | 23.11.2016 | |
LT | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
PL | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 23.11.2016 | Cited in | International search | [A]FR2637510 (MERIDIONAL OENOLOGIE CENTRE [FR]) [A] 7-9 * the whole document *; | [XA]WO9522724 (CONTAINER SUPPORT SYSTEMS LIMI [NZ], et al) [X] 1,10 * the whole document * [A] 2-6; | [A]WO0116546 (CZINTOS CSONGOR [HU]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [XDP]WO2006058959 (BIOLAN OY [FI], et al) [XDP] 1,10* the whole document * | Examination | JPH05322230 |