19.10.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] |
14.09.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.10.2012 [2012/42] |
10.08.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.09.2012 [2012/37] |
31.12.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.02.2011 [2011/05] |
18.06.2010 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 21.07.2010 [2010/29] |
28.05.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.06.2010 [2010/26] |
16.04.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.05.2010 [2010/20] |
09.04.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.05.2010 [2010/19] |
26.03.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.04.2010 [2010/17] |
19.03.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.04.2010 [2010/16] |
05.03.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.04.2010 [2010/14] |
10.07.2009 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 12.08.2009 [2009/33] |
10.07.2009 |
Change - extension states |
published on 12.08.2009 [2009/33] |
07.07.2009 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
07.07.2009 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
08.05.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
26.02.2009 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
06.02.2009 |
Change - German title |
published on 11.03.2009 [2009/11] |
30.01.2009 |
Change - representative |
published on 04.03.2009 [2009/10] |
07.01.2009 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
12.11.2008 |
Change - representative |
published on 03.12.2008 [2008/49] |
12.11.2008 |
Change - applicant |
published on 03.12.2008 [2008/49] |
12.11.2008 |
Change - representative |
published on 03.12.2008 [2008/49] |
22.10.2008 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
27.06.2008 |
First examination report |
|
21.06.2008 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
28.05.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
14.03.2008 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 16.04.2008 [2008/16] |
14.03.2008 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 16.04.2008 [2008/16] |
08.02.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
26.01.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
19.04.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
10.02.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.10.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|