EP1910162 - METHOD FOR ANCHORING OF FLOATING DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2008/16] | ANCHORING ELEMENT FOR FLOATING DEVICES | ||
[2009/11] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.06.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ventotec Offshore Constructions Planungs- und Vermarktungsgesellschaft mbH Blinke 6 26789 Leer / DE | [2009/33] |
Former [2008/49] | For all designated states Venotec Offshore Constructions Planungs- und Vermarktungsgesellschaft mbH Glück-Auf-Strasse 1 09599 Freiberg / DE | ||
Former [2008/16] | For all designated states Arcadis Consult GmbH Glück-Auf-Strasse 1 09599 Freiberg/Sachsen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JÄHNIG, Jens Talstrasse 28 01738 Dorfhain / DE | [2008/16] | Representative(s) | Rothkopf, Ferdinand, et al Rothkopf Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Maximilianstrasse 25 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/10] | Rothkopf, Ferdinand, et al Rothkopf Theobald Elbel Isartorplatz 5 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/49] | Rothkopf, Ferdinand Rothkopf Theobald Elbel Isartorplatz 5 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/16] | Rüger, Barthelt & Abel Patentanwälte Webergasse 3 73728 Esslingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 06776384.7 | 25.07.2006 | [2008/16] | WO2006EP07290 | Priority number, date | DE20051036679 | 04.08.2005 Original published format: DE102005036679 | [2008/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007014670 | Date: | 08.02.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1910162 | Date: | 16.04.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.02.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1910162 | Date: | 12.08.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.02.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B63B21/50, B63B21/29 | [2008/16] | CPC: |
B63B21/50 (EP);
B63B21/29 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/16] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR VERANKERUNG VON SCHWIMMKÖRPERANORDNUNGEN | [2009/11] | English: | METHOD FOR ANCHORING OF FLOATING DEVICES | [2009/11] | French: | PROCEDE D'ANCRAGE POUR DES DISPOSITIFS FLOTTANTS | [2009/11] |
Former [2008/16] | VERANKERUNGSELEMENT FÜR SCHWIMMKÖRPERANORDNUNGEN | ||
Former [2008/16] | ANCHORING ELEMENT FOR FLOATING DEVICES | ||
Former [2008/16] | ELEMENT D'ANCRAGE POUR DES DISPOSITIFS FLOTTANTS | Entry into regional phase | 21.01.2008 | National basic fee paid | 21.01.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.01.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.01.2008 | Examination requested [2008/16] | 26.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.01.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.03.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.06.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 29.06.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.05.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 12.08.2009 | CZ | 12.08.2009 | EE | 12.08.2009 | FI | 12.08.2009 | IE | 12.08.2009 | LT | 12.08.2009 | LV | 12.08.2009 | RO | 12.08.2009 | SE | 12.08.2009 | SI | 12.08.2009 | SK | 12.08.2009 | TR | 12.08.2009 | BG | 12.11.2009 | GR | 13.11.2009 | IS | 12.12.2009 | PT | 12.12.2009 | HU | 13.02.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/42] | CY | 12.08.2009 | |
CZ | 12.08.2009 | ||
EE | 12.08.2009 | ||
FI | 12.08.2009 | ||
IE | 12.08.2009 | ||
LT | 12.08.2009 | ||
LV | 12.08.2009 | ||
RO | 12.08.2009 | ||
SE | 12.08.2009 | ||
SI | 12.08.2009 | ||
SK | 12.08.2009 | ||
BG | 12.11.2009 | ||
GR | 13.11.2009 | ||
IS | 12.12.2009 | ||
PT | 12.12.2009 | ||
HU | 13.02.2010 | ||
Former [2012/37] | CY | 12.08.2009 | |
CZ | 12.08.2009 | ||
EE | 12.08.2009 | ||
FI | 12.08.2009 | ||
IE | 12.08.2009 | ||
LT | 12.08.2009 | ||
LV | 12.08.2009 | ||
RO | 12.08.2009 | ||
SE | 12.08.2009 | ||
SI | 12.08.2009 | ||
SK | 12.08.2009 | ||
BG | 12.11.2009 | ||
GR | 13.11.2009 | ||
IS | 12.12.2009 | ||
PT | 12.12.2009 | ||
Former [2011/05] | CZ | 12.08.2009 | |
EE | 12.08.2009 | ||
FI | 12.08.2009 | ||
IE | 12.08.2009 | ||
LT | 12.08.2009 | ||
LV | 12.08.2009 | ||
RO | 12.08.2009 | ||
SE | 12.08.2009 | ||
SI | 12.08.2009 | ||
SK | 12.08.2009 | ||
BG | 12.11.2009 | ||
GR | 13.11.2009 | ||
IS | 12.12.2009 | ||
PT | 12.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/26] | CZ | 12.08.2009 | |
EE | 12.08.2009 | ||
FI | 12.08.2009 | ||
IE | 12.08.2009 | ||
LT | 12.08.2009 | ||
LV | 12.08.2009 | ||
RO | 12.08.2009 | ||
SE | 12.08.2009 | ||
SI | 12.08.2009 | ||
SK | 12.08.2009 | ||
BG | 12.11.2009 | ||
IS | 12.12.2009 | ||
PT | 12.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/20] | EE | 12.08.2009 | |
FI | 12.08.2009 | ||
IE | 12.08.2009 | ||
LT | 12.08.2009 | ||
LV | 12.08.2009 | ||
SE | 12.08.2009 | ||
SI | 12.08.2009 | ||
BG | 12.11.2009 | ||
IS | 12.12.2009 | ||
PT | 12.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/17] | FI | 12.08.2009 | |
LT | 12.08.2009 | ||
LV | 12.08.2009 | ||
SE | 12.08.2009 | ||
SI | 12.08.2009 | ||
BG | 12.11.2009 | ||
IS | 12.12.2009 | ||
PT | 12.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/16] | FI | 12.08.2009 | |
LT | 12.08.2009 | ||
LV | 12.08.2009 | ||
SE | 12.08.2009 | ||
SI | 12.08.2009 | ||
IS | 12.12.2009 | ||
PT | 12.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/14] | FI | 12.08.2009 | |
LT | 12.08.2009 | ||
LV | 12.08.2009 | ||
SE | 12.08.2009 | ||
SI | 12.08.2009 | ||
IS | 12.12.2009 | Cited in | International search | [XY]GB2025876 (PETROLES CIE FRANCAISE) [X] 1-4,7,9,10,12,14,15,19 * page 2, line 130 - page 3, line 32 * * page 3, line 61 - line 73; figure - * [Y] 16,17; | [X]DE3201975 (LOBENDANK FRITZ) [X] 1-6,8,10 * page 3; figure - *; | [XY]JPS58214488 (NAKAMURA SOUJIROU) [X] 1-3,9,12-15,18,19 * the whole document * [Y] 16,17; | [Y]US4602588 (MACLEAN JOHN A [US]) [Y] 16,17 * column 4, line 14 - line 32; figure - *; | [X]US4922847 (RYDER JR R JAMES [US], et al) [X] 1-3,7,9,12,14 * abstract *; | [Y]US4951592 (BARONGAN NARCISO P [US]) [Y] 16,17 * abstract *; | [DA]DE10223314 (KELEMEN PETER [DE]) [DA] 1-24* abstract * |