EP1917121 - METHOD FOR SUBSEQUENTLY TREATING GLASS PANES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2008/19] | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR SUBSEQUENTLY TREATING GLASS PANES | ||
[2009/34] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.11.2010 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.11.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.12.2010 [2010/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schott AG Hattenbergstrasse 10 55122 Mainz / DE | [2008/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PLAPPER, Volker Ernst-Morneweg-Strasse 20 55232 Alzey / DE | 02 /
OTTERMANN, Clemens Eppsteiner Str. 4 65785 Hattersheim / DE | 03 /
KÖHR, Thomas Westring 38 55122 Mainz / DE | 04 /
SPEIT, Burkhardt Pliniusweg 20 55126 Mainz / DE | 05 /
CLAUSS, Michael Breckenheimer Strasse 56 65719 Hofheim / DE | [2008/19] | Representative(s) | Herden, Andreas F. Blumbach - Zinngrebe Patentanwälte PartG mbB Alexandrastraße 5 65187 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | Herden, Andreas F. Blumbach - Zinngrebe PatentConsult Patentanwälte Alexandrastrasse 5 65187 Wiesbaden / DE | ||
Former [2008/19] | Herden, Andreas F. Blumbach - Zinngrebe Patentanwälte Alexandrastrasse 5 65187 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 06776516.4 | 31.07.2006 | [2008/19] | WO2006EP07551 | Priority number, date | DE20051036776 | 02.08.2005 Original published format: DE102005036776 | DE20051036779 | 02.08.2005 Original published format: DE102005036779 | [2008/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007014732 | Date: | 08.02.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/06] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1917121 | Date: | 07.05.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.02.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1917121 | Date: | 30.12.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/53] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.06.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B24B7/24, B24B13/015 | [2008/19] | CPC: |
C03C19/00 (EP);
B24B13/015 (EP,KR);
B24B37/04 (EP);
B24B7/224 (EP);
B24B7/24 (KR);
B24B7/242 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE [2008/35] |
Former [2008/19] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM NACHBEARBEITEN VON GLASSCHEIBEN | [2009/34] | English: | METHOD FOR SUBSEQUENTLY TREATING GLASS PANES | [2009/34] | French: | PROCEDE D'USINAGE ULTERIEUR DE PLAQUES DE VERRE | [2009/34] |
Former [2008/19] | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM NACHBEARBEITEN VON GLASSCHEIBEN | ||
Former [2008/19] | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR SUBSEQUENTLY TREATING GLASS PANES | ||
Former [2008/19] | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF D'USINAGE ULTERIEUR DE PLAQUES DE VERRE | Entry into regional phase | 31.01.2008 | National basic fee paid | 31.01.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.01.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.05.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 31.01.2008 | Examination requested [2008/19] | 03.03.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 09.04.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 02.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.04.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.08.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.11.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 18.11.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.10.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP1333313 (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [X] 1-44,46-61 * the whole document *; | [A]US4833832 (LINDSEY ALAN F [BE], et al) [A] 1-44,46-61 * the whole document * |