EP1913754 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR CONFIGURATION OF TELECOMMUNICATION TERMINALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.07.2011 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.07.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.08.2011 [2011/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gigaset Communications GmbH Hofmannstrasse 61 81379 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/29] | For all designated states Gigaset Communications GmbH Hofmannstraße 61 81379 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/17] | For all designated states Siemens Home and Office Communication Devices GmbH & Co. KG Hofmannstrasse 61 81379 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TÖBBEN, Wilfried Pfarrer-Becking-Str. 6 46397 Bocholt / DE | 02 /
WIENAND, Jörg Willingsweide 1 46399 Bocholt / DE | [2008/17] | Representative(s) | Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Kaistraße 16A 40221 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/29] | Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte Neuer Zollhof 2 40221 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2009/02] | Schulz, Dirk Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte Neuer Zollhof 2 40221 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2008/41] | Maier, Daniel Oliver, et al Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/17] | Maier, Daniel Oliver, et al Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06776594.1 | 03.08.2006 | [2008/17] | WO2006EP07712 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008014809 | Date: | 07.02.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1913754 | Date: | 23.04.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.02.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.02.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/08, H04L12/24, H04Q7/32, G06F9/44, G06F9/445 | [2008/17] | CPC: |
H04L41/5054 (EP,US);
H04L65/1101 (US);
H04L65/1104 (EP,US);
H04L67/34 (EP,US);
H04W28/18 (EP,US);
H04W4/00 (EP,US);
H04W88/02 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/17] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR KONFIGURATION VON TELEKOMMUNIKATIONSENDGERÄTEN | [2008/17] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR CONFIGURATION OF TELECOMMUNICATION TERMINALS | [2008/17] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ POUR LA CONFIGURATION DE TERMINAUX DE TÉLÉCOMMUNICATION | [2008/17] | Entry into regional phase | 07.03.2008 | National basic fee paid | 07.03.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.03.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/17] | 16.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.11.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.10.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.02.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/34] | 01.04.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/34] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.05.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]EP1091522 (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [X] 16 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0022] * [A] 1,8; | [X]US2003135596 (MOYER STANLEY L [US], et al) [X] 1-4,7-12,15,16,21 * abstract * * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0031] *; | [X]WO03102775 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [X] 1-8,10-15 * abstract * * page 1, line 1 - line 7 * * page 2, line 10 - line 28 * * page 3, line 7 - page 4, line 2 * * page 4, line 29 - page 7, line 31 *; | [X]GB2412461 (BUSINESS SERVE PLC [GB], et al) [X] 1,7-9,15 * abstract * * page 2, line 1 - page 3, line 16 * * page 5, line 23 - page 11, line 14 *; | [E]US2006208931 (BOESE JAN [DE], et al) [E] 1,2,6,8,9,16,17 * abstract * * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0035] * * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0043] ** paragraph [0047] * |