EP1926789 - COATINGS CONTAINING POLYSILAZANES FOR METAL AND POLYMER SURFACES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.05.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.01.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.2021 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 11.08.2021 [2021/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ridgefield Acquisition 46 Place Guillaume II 1648 Luxembourg / LU | [2020/10] |
Former [2017/18] | For all designated states AZ Electronic Materials (Luxembourg) S.à.r.l. 46 Place Guillaume ll 1648 Luxembourg / LU | ||
Former [2012/50] | For all designated states AZ Electronic Materials (Luxembourg) S.à.r.l. 32-36, Boulevard d`Avranches 1160 Luxembourg / LU | ||
Former [2012/10] | For all designated states AZ Electronic Materials (Luxembourg) S.à.r.l. 2, Avenue Charles de Gaulle 1653 Luxembourg / LU | ||
Former [2009/08] | For all designated states Clariant Finance (BVI) Limited Citco Building, Wickhams Cay P.O. Box 662 Road Town, Tortola / VG | ||
Former [2008/23] | For all designated states Clariant International Ltd. Rothausstrasse 61 4132 Muttenz / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRAND, Stefan Bahnhofstrasse 28 69493 Hirschberg-Leutershausen / DE | 02 /
DIERDORF, Andreas Usinger Str. 16F 65719 Hofheim / DE | 03 /
LIEBE, Hubert Odenwaldblick 52 65207 Wiesbaden / DE | 04 /
WACKER, Andreas Karl-Ludwig-Strasse 14 68165 Mannheim / DE | [2008/23] | Representative(s) | Rippel, Hans Christoph, et al Patentanwälte Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler PartG mbB Eastsite One Seckenheimer Landstrasse 4 68163 Mannheim / DE | [2019/26] |
Former [2012/10] | Rippel, Hans Christoph, et al Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler LLP Eastsite One Seckenheimer Landstrasse 4 68163 Mannheim / DE | ||
Former [2009/08] | Jacobi, Carola, et al Clariant Produkte (Deutschland) GmbH Group Intellectual Property Am Unisys-Park 1 65843 Sulzbach am Taunus / DE | ||
Former [2008/23] | Paczkowski, Marcus, et al Clariant Produkte (Deutschland) GmbH Group Intellectual Property Am Unisys-Park 1 65843 Sulzbach / DE | Application number, filing date | 06777067.7 | 25.08.2006 | [2008/23] | WO2006EP08352 | Priority number, date | DE20051042944 | 08.09.2005 Original published format: DE102005042944 | [2008/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007028511 | Date: | 15.03.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/11] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1926789 | Date: | 04.06.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.03.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1926789 | Date: | 26.06.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.11.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C09D183/16 | [2008/23] | CPC: |
C09D183/16 (EP,US);
C08G77/62 (EP);
Y10T428/25 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31507 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31511 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31667 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C09D183/16, C08K5/09 (EP);
C09D183/16, C08K5/098 (EP);
C09D183/16, C08K5/17 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2019/26] |
Former [2008/23] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | POLYSILAZANE ENTHALTENDE BESCHICHTUNGEN FÜR METALL- UND POLYMEROBERFLÄCHEN | [2008/23] | English: | COATINGS CONTAINING POLYSILAZANES FOR METAL AND POLYMER SURFACES | [2008/23] | French: | REVETEMENTS CONTENANT DU POLYSILAZANE POUR DES SURFACES METALLIQUES ET POLYMERES | [2008/23] | Entry into regional phase | 08.04.2008 | National basic fee paid | 29.05.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.05.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.05.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.05.2008 | Examination requested [2008/28] | 09.02.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.08.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.12.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 13.08.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.01.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.05.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 14.05.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.05.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.02.2017 | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 11.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 14.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 10.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.08.2006 | CY | 26.06.2019 | CZ | 26.06.2019 | DK | 26.06.2019 | EE | 26.06.2019 | FI | 26.06.2019 | LT | 26.06.2019 | LV | 26.06.2019 | MC | 26.06.2019 | PL | 26.06.2019 | RO | 26.06.2019 | SI | 26.06.2019 | SK | 26.06.2019 | TR | 26.06.2019 | AT | 25.08.2019 | LU | 25.08.2019 | BE | 31.08.2019 | CH | 31.08.2019 | LI | 31.08.2019 | BG | 26.09.2019 | GR | 27.09.2019 | IS | 26.10.2019 | PT | 28.10.2019 | [2021/32] |
Former [2021/26] | CY | 26.06.2019 | |
CZ | 26.06.2019 | ||
DK | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
MC | 26.06.2019 | ||
PL | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
SI | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
TR | 26.06.2019 | ||
AT | 25.08.2019 | ||
LU | 25.08.2019 | ||
BE | 31.08.2019 | ||
CH | 31.08.2019 | ||
LI | 31.08.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
IS | 26.10.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/51] | CZ | 26.06.2019 | |
DK | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
MC | 26.06.2019 | ||
PL | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
SI | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
TR | 26.06.2019 | ||
AT | 25.08.2019 | ||
LU | 25.08.2019 | ||
BE | 31.08.2019 | ||
CH | 31.08.2019 | ||
LI | 31.08.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
IS | 26.10.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/37] | CZ | 26.06.2019 | |
DK | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
MC | 26.06.2019 | ||
PL | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
SI | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
TR | 26.06.2019 | ||
LU | 25.08.2019 | ||
BE | 31.08.2019 | ||
CH | 31.08.2019 | ||
LI | 31.08.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
IS | 26.10.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | CZ | 26.06.2019 | |
DK | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
MC | 26.06.2019 | ||
PL | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
TR | 26.06.2019 | ||
LU | 25.08.2019 | ||
CH | 31.08.2019 | ||
LI | 31.08.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
IS | 26.10.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | CZ | 26.06.2019 | |
DK | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
MC | 26.06.2019 | ||
PL | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
TR | 26.06.2019 | ||
LU | 25.08.2019 | ||
CH | 31.08.2019 | ||
LI | 31.08.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | CZ | 26.06.2019 | |
DK | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
MC | 26.06.2019 | ||
PL | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
TR | 26.06.2019 | ||
CH | 31.08.2019 | ||
LI | 31.08.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | CZ | 26.06.2019 | |
DK | 26.06.2019 | ||
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
TR | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
IS | 26.10.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | CZ | 26.06.2019 | |
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
TR | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
IS | 26.10.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | CZ | 26.06.2019 | |
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
IS | 26.10.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | CZ | 26.06.2019 | |
EE | 26.06.2019 | ||
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
SK | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | CZ | 26.06.2019 | |
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
RO | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
PT | 28.10.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | CZ | 26.06.2019 | |
FI | 26.06.2019 | ||
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | FI | 26.06.2019 | |
LT | 26.06.2019 | ||
LV | 26.06.2019 | ||
BG | 26.09.2019 | ||
GR | 27.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | FI | 26.06.2019 | |
LT | 26.06.2019 | Cited in | International search | [X]US6383641 (KONDOU SATOSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-17 * column 18 ** column 20 *; | [X]US2003083453 (LUKACS ALEXANDER [US], et al) [X] 1-17 * page 6, column 1, line 10 * * Seite 9, [0127] *; | [X]US2003164113 (SUZUKI TADASHI [JP]) [X] 1-3,5,7-17 * Seite 3 [0027];; claim 1 *; | [X]WO2004039904 (CLARIANT INT LTD [CH], et al) [X] 1-17 * page 7, line 27 - line 30 * * page 10, line 9 * |