EP1902012 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING OPTICALLY ACTIVE AMINOALKYLPHENOLS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2008/13] | METHOD FOR PRODUCING OPTICALLY ACTIVE AMINOALKYLPHENOLS | ||
[2015/32] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.10.2016 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/50] | For all designated states BASF SE 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | ||
Former [2008/13] | For all designated states BASF SE 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DITRICH, Klaus Hermann-Sinsheimer-Weg 11 67161 Gönnheim / DE | [2008/13] | Representative(s) | BASF IP Association BASF SE G-FLP-C006 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/50] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2008/13] | Reitstötter - Kinzebach Ludwigsplatz 4 67059 Ludwigshafen / DE | Application number, filing date | 06777361.4 | 19.06.2006 | [2008/13] | WO2006EP63314 | Priority number, date | DE20051028492 | 20.06.2005 Original published format: DE102005028492 | [2008/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006136538 | Date: | 28.12.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1902012 | Date: | 26.03.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.12.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1902012 | Date: | 09.12.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.12.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C07C209/62, C07C209/88, C07B53/00, C07C213/02, C07C213/10 | [2015/32] | CPC: |
C07C213/10 (EP,US);
C07B53/00 (EP,US);
C07C213/02 (EP,US);
Y02P20/55 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C213/02, C07C215/50 (EP,US);
C07C213/02, C07C217/58 (US,EP);
C07C213/10, C07C215/50 (US,EP);
C07C213/10, C07C217/58 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [2008/13] | C07C209/62, C07C209/88 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/50] |
Former [2008/13] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON OPTISCH AKTIVEN AMINOALKYLPHENOLEN | [2015/34] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING OPTICALLY ACTIVE AMINOALKYLPHENOLS | [2015/34] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'AMINOALKYLPHENOLS OPTIQUEMENT ACTIFS | [2015/34] |
Former [2008/13] | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON OPTISCH AKTIVEN AMINOALKYLPHENOLEN | ||
Former [2008/13] | METHOD FOR PRODUCING OPTICALLY ACTIVE AMINOALKYLPHENOLS | ||
Former [2008/13] | PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'AMINOALKYLPHENOLS OPTIQUEMENT ACTIFS | Entry into regional phase | 21.01.2008 | National basic fee paid | 21.01.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.01.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.04.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.01.2008 | Examination requested [2008/13] | 16.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.08.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.02.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.08.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.01.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.08.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.09.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 25.11.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.07.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.10.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 22.10.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.10.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.04.2009 | Opposition(s) | 12.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 01.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.06.2006 | BG | 09.12.2015 | CY | 09.12.2015 | CZ | 09.12.2015 | DK | 09.12.2015 | EE | 09.12.2015 | FI | 09.12.2015 | LT | 09.12.2015 | LV | 09.12.2015 | MC | 09.12.2015 | PL | 09.12.2015 | RO | 09.12.2015 | SE | 09.12.2015 | SI | 09.12.2015 | SK | 09.12.2015 | TR | 09.12.2015 | GR | 10.03.2016 | IS | 09.04.2016 | PT | 11.04.2016 | AT | 19.06.2016 | IE | 19.06.2016 | LU | 19.06.2016 | BE | 30.06.2016 | [2018/38] |
Former [2018/29] | HU | 19.06.2006 | |
CY | 09.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2015 | ||
DK | 09.12.2015 | ||
EE | 09.12.2015 | ||
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
MC | 09.12.2015 | ||
PL | 09.12.2015 | ||
RO | 09.12.2015 | ||
SE | 09.12.2015 | ||
SI | 09.12.2015 | ||
SK | 09.12.2015 | ||
TR | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
IS | 09.04.2016 | ||
PT | 11.04.2016 | ||
AT | 19.06.2016 | ||
IE | 19.06.2016 | ||
LU | 19.06.2016 | ||
BE | 30.06.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 19.06.2006 | |
CY | 09.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2015 | ||
DK | 09.12.2015 | ||
EE | 09.12.2015 | ||
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
MC | 09.12.2015 | ||
PL | 09.12.2015 | ||
RO | 09.12.2015 | ||
SE | 09.12.2015 | ||
SI | 09.12.2015 | ||
SK | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
IS | 09.04.2016 | ||
PT | 11.04.2016 | ||
AT | 19.06.2016 | ||
IE | 19.06.2016 | ||
BE | 30.06.2016 | ||
Former [2017/49] | CZ | 09.12.2015 | |
DK | 09.12.2015 | ||
EE | 09.12.2015 | ||
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
MC | 09.12.2015 | ||
PL | 09.12.2015 | ||
RO | 09.12.2015 | ||
SE | 09.12.2015 | ||
SI | 09.12.2015 | ||
SK | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
IS | 09.04.2016 | ||
PT | 11.04.2016 | ||
AT | 19.06.2016 | ||
IE | 19.06.2016 | ||
BE | 30.06.2016 | ||
Former [2017/38] | CZ | 09.12.2015 | |
DK | 09.12.2015 | ||
EE | 09.12.2015 | ||
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
MC | 09.12.2015 | ||
PL | 09.12.2015 | ||
RO | 09.12.2015 | ||
SE | 09.12.2015 | ||
SI | 09.12.2015 | ||
SK | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
IS | 09.04.2016 | ||
PT | 11.04.2016 | ||
IE | 19.06.2016 | ||
BE | 30.06.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | CZ | 09.12.2015 | |
DK | 09.12.2015 | ||
EE | 09.12.2015 | ||
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
MC | 09.12.2015 | ||
PL | 09.12.2015 | ||
RO | 09.12.2015 | ||
SE | 09.12.2015 | ||
SI | 09.12.2015 | ||
SK | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
IS | 09.04.2016 | ||
PT | 11.04.2016 | ||
BE | 30.06.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | CZ | 09.12.2015 | |
DK | 09.12.2015 | ||
EE | 09.12.2015 | ||
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
PL | 09.12.2015 | ||
RO | 09.12.2015 | ||
SE | 09.12.2015 | ||
SI | 09.12.2015 | ||
SK | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
IS | 09.04.2016 | ||
PT | 11.04.2016 | ||
BE | 30.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | CZ | 09.12.2015 | |
DK | 09.12.2015 | ||
EE | 09.12.2015 | ||
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
PL | 09.12.2015 | ||
RO | 09.12.2015 | ||
SE | 09.12.2015 | ||
SI | 09.12.2015 | ||
SK | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
IS | 09.04.2016 | ||
PT | 11.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | CZ | 09.12.2015 | |
DK | 09.12.2015 | ||
EE | 09.12.2015 | ||
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
RO | 09.12.2015 | ||
SE | 09.12.2015 | ||
SK | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
IS | 09.04.2016 | ||
PT | 11.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | CZ | 09.12.2015 | |
EE | 09.12.2015 | ||
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
RO | 09.12.2015 | ||
SE | 09.12.2015 | ||
SK | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
IS | 09.04.2016 | ||
PT | 11.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | CZ | 09.12.2015 | |
EE | 09.12.2015 | ||
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
RO | 09.12.2015 | ||
SE | 09.12.2015 | ||
SK | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/34] | CZ | 09.12.2015 | |
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
SE | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/31] | FI | 09.12.2015 | |
IS | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
SE | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/25] | FI | 09.12.2015 | |
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
SE | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | FI | 09.12.2015 | |
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
SE | 09.12.2015 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | LT | 09.12.2015 | |
SE | 09.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | LT | 09.12.2015 | Cited in | International search | [DX]WO9508636 (BASF AG [DE], et al) [DX] 1,3 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0865500 (BAYER AG [DE]) [X] 1-8,10,11 * the whole document *; | [X]US6576795 (FUNKE FRANK [DE], et al) [X] 1-12 * column 11, line 34 - column 12, line 10; claims 13,14 * * column 10, line 42 - line 52 *; | [X]DE19603575 (BAYER AG [DE]) [X] 1-8,10,11 * the whole document *; | [X]US5965032 (FREDE MARKUS [DE], et al) [X] 1-8,10,11 * column 9, line 5 - line 45 *; | [X]WO9623894 (BASF AG [DE], et al) [X] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0311385 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [A] - E.PETER KÜNDIG ET AL, "Asymmetric Syntheses of 2-(1-Aminoethyl)phenols", HELVETICA CHIMICA ACTA, (2004), vol. 87, no. 3, pages 561 - 579, XP002394554 [A] 1-12 * page 562 * * page 567 - page 568 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/hlca.200490054 |