EP1896550 - STABILIZED ELECTROCHROMIC MEDIA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.06.2014 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/10] | For all designated states BASF SE 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | ||
Former [2008/21] | For all designated states Ciba Holding Inc. Klybeckstrasse 141 4057 Basel / CH | ||
Former [2008/11] | For all designated states Ciba Specialty Chemicals Holding Inc. Klybeckstrasse 141 CH-4057 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YALE, David A. 40 Wooster Street Bethel, CT 06801 / US | 02 /
CLIFF, Nancy Nase 17 Longview Lane Ringwood, NJ 07456 / US | 03 /
KANOUNI, Mouhcine 300 West 135th Street, Apt. 11b New York, NY 10030 / US | [2008/11] | Representative(s) | Fiesser, Gerold Michael, et al Herzog Fiesser & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Isartorplatz 1 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/02] | Fiesser, Gerold Michael, et al Herzog Fiesser & Partner Patentanwälte Isartorplatz 1 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06777382.0 | 21.06.2006 | [2008/11] | WO2006EP63381 | Priority number, date | US20050695356P | 30.06.2005 Original published format: US 695356 P | [2008/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007003508 | Date: | 11.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1896550 | Date: | 12.03.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.01.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1896550 | Date: | 14.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.01.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C09K9/02, G02F1/15, G03C1/815 | [2008/11] | CPC: |
C09K9/02 (EP,KR,US);
C07D211/94 (EP,KR,US);
C08K5/3435 (EP,KR,US);
G02F1/15 (KR);
G02F1/167 (EP,KR,US);
C09K2211/1029 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/11] | Title | German: | STABILISIERTE ELEKTROCHROME MEDIEN | [2008/11] | English: | STABILIZED ELECTROCHROMIC MEDIA | [2008/11] | French: | MILIEUX ÉLECTROCHROMIQUES STABILISÉS | [2008/11] | Entry into regional phase | 30.11.2007 | National basic fee paid | 30.11.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.11.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.11.2007 | Examination requested [2008/11] | 25.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.01.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.01.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.05.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.10.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.03.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.06.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 20.06.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.07.2008 | Opposition(s) | 15.05.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 01.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.06.2006 | BG | 14.08.2013 | CY | 14.08.2013 | CZ | 14.08.2013 | EE | 14.08.2013 | LT | 14.08.2013 | LV | 14.08.2013 | MC | 14.08.2013 | PL | 14.08.2013 | RO | 14.08.2013 | SI | 14.08.2013 | SK | 14.08.2013 | TR | 14.08.2013 | GR | 15.11.2013 | IS | 14.12.2013 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 21.06.2006 | |
BG | 14.08.2013 | ||
CY | 14.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 14.08.2013 | ||
EE | 14.08.2013 | ||
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LV | 14.08.2013 | ||
MC | 14.08.2013 | ||
PL | 14.08.2013 | ||
RO | 14.08.2013 | ||
SI | 14.08.2013 | ||
SK | 14.08.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
IS | 14.12.2013 | ||
Former [2016/25] | BG | 14.08.2013 | |
CY | 14.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 14.08.2013 | ||
EE | 14.08.2013 | ||
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LV | 14.08.2013 | ||
MC | 14.08.2013 | ||
PL | 14.08.2013 | ||
RO | 14.08.2013 | ||
SI | 14.08.2013 | ||
SK | 14.08.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
IS | 14.12.2013 | ||
Former [2015/09] | CY | 14.08.2013 | |
CZ | 14.08.2013 | ||
EE | 14.08.2013 | ||
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LV | 14.08.2013 | ||
MC | 14.08.2013 | ||
PL | 14.08.2013 | ||
RO | 14.08.2013 | ||
SI | 14.08.2013 | ||
SK | 14.08.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
IS | 14.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/23] | CY | 14.08.2013 | |
CZ | 14.08.2013 | ||
EE | 14.08.2013 | ||
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LV | 14.08.2013 | ||
PL | 14.08.2013 | ||
RO | 14.08.2013 | ||
SI | 14.08.2013 | ||
SK | 14.08.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
IS | 14.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/22] | CY | 14.08.2013 | |
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LV | 14.08.2013 | ||
PL | 14.08.2013 | ||
RO | 14.08.2013 | ||
SI | 14.08.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
IS | 14.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | CY | 14.08.2013 | |
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LV | 14.08.2013 | ||
PL | 14.08.2013 | ||
SI | 14.08.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
IS | 14.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | CY | 03.07.2013 | |
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LV | 14.08.2013 | ||
PL | 14.08.2013 | ||
SI | 14.08.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
IS | 14.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | CY | 03.07.2013 | |
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
PL | 14.08.2013 | ||
IS | 14.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | CY | 03.07.2013 | |
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
IS | 14.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | LT | 14.08.2013 | Cited in | International search | [X]JPH0525472 ; | [A]US5204473 (WINTER ROLAND A E [US], et al) [A] 1-17 * column 1, line 17 - column 7, line 31 * * column 7, lines 32-50 * * example 2 * * claim 1 *; | [X]US5239406 (LYNAM NIALL R [US]) [X] 2-6,11-17 * column 15, lines 35-46 * * column 16, line 60 - column 17, line 25 * * claims 1,76 *; | [A]US5770114 (BYKER HARLAN J [US], et al) [A] 1-17* the whole document *; | [X]WO03103622 (CIBA SC HOLDING AG [CH], et al) [X] 1-15 * page 1, line 3 - page 19, line 28 * * page 19, lines 30,31 * * page 20, line 15 - page 21, line 26 * * page 31, line 29 - page 32, line 11 * * examples 7,8 * * claims 1-11 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930614), vol. 017, no. 309, Database accession no. (C - 1070), & JP05025472 A 19930202 (OOKURASHIYOU INSATSU KYOKUCHO) [X] 1-17 * abstract * | by applicant | US4247175 | US4407565 | US4772103 | US6020987 | US2003002084 | US6753844 | US6753999 |