EP1915813 - CAGE ROTOR OF AN INDUCTION MOTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2008/18] | CAGE ROTOR FOR AN ASYNCHRONOUS MOTOR | ||
[2017/07] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.06.2018 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.06.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE | [2017/35] |
Former [2013/11] | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/18] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VERHOEVEN, Daniel Pinzberger Weg 24 90425 Nürnberg / DE | [2008/18] | Application number, filing date | 06777433.1 | 23.06.2006 | [2008/18] | WO2006EP63488 | Priority number, date | DE20051030377 | 29.06.2005 Original published format: DE102005030377 | [2008/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007000413 | Date: | 04.01.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1915813 | Date: | 30.04.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.01.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1915813 | Date: | 02.08.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.01.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H02K17/16 | [2008/18] | CPC: |
H02K17/16 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/31] |
Former [2008/18] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | KÄFIGLÄUFER EINER ASYNCHRONMASCHINE | [2008/18] | English: | CAGE ROTOR OF AN INDUCTION MOTOR | [2017/07] | French: | ROTOR A CAGE D'ECUREUIL D'UNE MACHINE ASYNCHRONE | [2008/18] |
Former [2008/18] | CAGE ROTOR FOR AN ASYNCHRONOUS MOTOR | Entry into regional phase | 27.12.2007 | National basic fee paid | 27.12.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.12.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.04.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 27.12.2007 | Examination requested [2008/18] | 03.02.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.04.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 19.05.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 19.05.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.02.2017 | Opposition(s) | 03.05.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 18.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 20.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 19.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.06.2006 | CY | 02.08.2017 | CZ | 02.08.2017 | DK | 02.08.2017 | EE | 02.08.2017 | ES | 02.08.2017 | LT | 02.08.2017 | LV | 02.08.2017 | MC | 02.08.2017 | NL | 02.08.2017 | PL | 02.08.2017 | PT | 02.08.2017 | RO | 02.08.2017 | SE | 02.08.2017 | SI | 02.08.2017 | SK | 02.08.2017 | TR | 02.08.2017 | BG | 02.11.2017 | GR | 03.11.2017 | IS | 02.12.2017 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/27] | HU | 23.06.2006 | |
CZ | 02.08.2017 | ||
DK | 02.08.2017 | ||
EE | 02.08.2017 | ||
ES | 02.08.2017 | ||
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LV | 02.08.2017 | ||
MC | 02.08.2017 | ||
NL | 02.08.2017 | ||
PL | 02.08.2017 | ||
PT | 02.08.2017 | ||
RO | 02.08.2017 | ||
SE | 02.08.2017 | ||
SI | 02.08.2017 | ||
SK | 02.08.2017 | ||
TR | 02.08.2017 | ||
BG | 02.11.2017 | ||
GR | 03.11.2017 | ||
IS | 02.12.2017 | ||
Former [2020/15] | CZ | 02.08.2017 | |
DK | 02.08.2017 | ||
EE | 02.08.2017 | ||
ES | 02.08.2017 | ||
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LV | 02.08.2017 | ||
MC | 02.08.2017 | ||
NL | 02.08.2017 | ||
PL | 02.08.2017 | ||
RO | 02.08.2017 | ||
SE | 02.08.2017 | ||
SI | 02.08.2017 | ||
SK | 02.08.2017 | ||
TR | 02.08.2017 | ||
BG | 02.11.2017 | ||
GR | 03.11.2017 | ||
IS | 02.12.2017 | ||
Former [2019/15] | CZ | 02.08.2017 | |
DK | 02.08.2017 | ||
EE | 02.08.2017 | ||
ES | 02.08.2017 | ||
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LV | 02.08.2017 | ||
MC | 02.08.2017 | ||
NL | 02.08.2017 | ||
PL | 02.08.2017 | ||
RO | 02.08.2017 | ||
SE | 02.08.2017 | ||
SI | 02.08.2017 | ||
SK | 02.08.2017 | ||
BG | 02.11.2017 | ||
GR | 03.11.2017 | ||
IS | 02.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | CZ | 02.08.2017 | |
DK | 02.08.2017 | ||
EE | 02.08.2017 | ||
ES | 02.08.2017 | ||
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LV | 02.08.2017 | ||
NL | 02.08.2017 | ||
PL | 02.08.2017 | ||
RO | 02.08.2017 | ||
SE | 02.08.2017 | ||
SI | 02.08.2017 | ||
SK | 02.08.2017 | ||
BG | 02.11.2017 | ||
GR | 03.11.2017 | ||
IS | 02.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | CZ | 02.08.2017 | |
DK | 02.08.2017 | ||
EE | 02.08.2017 | ||
ES | 02.08.2017 | ||
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LV | 02.08.2017 | ||
NL | 02.08.2017 | ||
PL | 02.08.2017 | ||
RO | 02.08.2017 | ||
SE | 02.08.2017 | ||
SK | 02.08.2017 | ||
BG | 02.11.2017 | ||
GR | 03.11.2017 | ||
IS | 02.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | CZ | 02.08.2017 | |
DK | 02.08.2017 | ||
ES | 02.08.2017 | ||
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LV | 02.08.2017 | ||
NL | 02.08.2017 | ||
PL | 02.08.2017 | ||
SE | 02.08.2017 | ||
BG | 02.11.2017 | ||
GR | 03.11.2017 | ||
IS | 02.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/12] | ES | 02.08.2017 | |
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LV | 02.08.2017 | ||
NL | 02.08.2017 | ||
PL | 02.08.2017 | ||
SE | 02.08.2017 | ||
BG | 02.11.2017 | ||
GR | 03.11.2017 | ||
IS | 02.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | LT | 02.08.2017 | |
NL | 02.08.2017 | ||
SE | 02.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/08] | LT | 02.08.2017 | |
NL | 02.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | LT | 02.08.2017 | Cited in | International search | [XY]DD10154 (SCHÜTZENMEISTER HEINZ) [X] 1,2,4,5,10 * page 2, column 2, paragraph 2 - paragraph 3 * * page 3, column 1, paragraph 4 - column 2, paragraph 1; figures 8,9 * [Y] 1-3,5,7,8,10-12; | [Y]JPH10322990 ; | [X]US5719457 (HELFER PETER [CH]) [X] 1,2,4,5,7,12 * column 2, line 53 - column 3, line 26; figures 1,2,4 *; | [XY]EP0786855 (FANUC LTD [JP]) [X] 1,2,6,7,10,11 * column 4, line 40 - column 6, line 45; figures 1,2,4a,4b,5 * [Y] 1,5,7,9-12; | [Y]JPH10174389 ; | [DXY]EP1453180 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [DX] 1,2,4,5,9-11 * the whole document * [Y] 1,2,4,5,7,11; | [DY]JP2000014105 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19990331), vol. 1999, no. 03, & JP10322990 A 19981204 (HITACHI LTD) [Y] 1-3,5,7,8,10-12 * abstract * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980930), vol. 1998, no. 11, & JP10174389 A 19980626 (HITACHI LTD) [Y] 1,5,7,9-12 * abstract * | [DY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20000831), vol. 2000, no. 04, & JP2000014105 A 20000114 (TOSHIBA CORP) [DY] 1,2,4,5,7,11 * abstract * | Examination | JPH10322990 | JPH10174389 | US5719457 | EP0786855 |