26.06.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] |
05.06.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.07.2020 [2020/28] |
29.05.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.07.2020 [2020/27] |
13.03.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.04.2020 [2020/16] |
13.12.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.01.2020 [2020/03] |
16.08.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.09.2019 [2019/38] |
09.08.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.09.2019 [2019/37] |
24.05.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.06.2019 [2019/26] |
10.05.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.06.2019 [2019/24] |
03.05.2019 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 05.06.2019 [2019/23] |
19.04.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.05.2019 [2019/21] |
05.04.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.05.2019 [2019/19] |
22.03.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.04.2019 [2019/17] |
08.03.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.04.2019 [2019/15] |
22.02.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.03.2019 [2019/13] |
15.02.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.03.2019 [2019/12] |
08.02.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.03.2019 [2019/11] |
01.02.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.03.2019 [2019/10] |
25.01.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.02.2019 [2019/09] |
18.01.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.02.2019 [2019/08] |
14.12.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.01.2019 [2019/03] |
23.11.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.12.2018 [2018/52] |
16.11.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.12.2018 [2018/51] |
09.11.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.12.2018 [2018/50] |
02.11.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.12.2018 [2018/49] |
19.10.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] |
25.05.2018 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 27.06.2018 [2018/26] |
18.05.2018 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
18.05.2018 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
18.05.2018 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
01.03.2018 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
02.02.2018 |
Change - English title |
published on 07.03.2018 [2018/10] |
28.07.2017 |
Change - applicant |
published on 30.08.2017 [2017/35] |
23.06.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.06.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.06.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.03.2015 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
15.11.2014 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
25.06.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.06.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.02.2013 |
Change - applicant |
published on 13.03.2013 [2013/11] |
27.06.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.06.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.03.2011 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
28.10.2010 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
24.06.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.02.2010 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
30.10.2009 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
23.06.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.10.2008 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
05.09.2008 |
Change - extension states |
published on 08.10.2008 [2008/41] |
03.07.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.05.2008 |
First examination report |
|
29.05.2008 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
07.03.2008 |
Change - extension states |
published on 09.04.2008 [2008/15] |
15.02.2008 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 19.03.2008 [2008/12] |
15.02.2008 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 19.03.2008 [2008/12] |
12.01.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
09.01.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
09.01.2008 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
03.04.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
24.02.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
16.01.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.10.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|