Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8635597 | Global Dossier | 21.01.2014 | B2 | US2009216343 | 27.08.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006EP63681 | 29.06.2006 | DE102005031246 | 01.07.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1899773 | Global Dossier | 27.06.2018 | B1 | EP1899773 | 19.03.2008 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2006EP63681 | 29.06.2006 | DE102005031246 | 01.07.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007003573 | Global Dossier | 29.03.2007 | A3 | WO2007003573 | 11.01.2007 | A2 | Priority number | Date | DE102005031246 | 01.07.2005 |