EP1899773 - METHOD FOR DETERMINATION OF THE PROCESSING SEQUENCE OF COMPONENTS OF A FUNCTION PLAN AND ELECTRONIC DATA PROCESSING UNIT FOR CARRYING OUT SAID METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2008/12] | METHOD FOR DETERMINATION OF THE PROCESSING SEQUENCE OF A COMPONENT OF A FUNCTION PLAN AND ELECTRONIC DATA PROCESSING UNIT FOR CARRYING OUT SAID METHOD | ||
[2018/10] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.05.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.05.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE | [2017/35] |
Former [2013/11] | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/12] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DREBINGER, Andreas Goethestr. 36 91074 Herzogenaurach / DE | [2008/12] | Application number, filing date | 06777508.0 | 29.06.2006 | [2008/12] | WO2006EP63681 | Priority number, date | DE20051031246 | 01.07.2005 Original published format: DE102005031246 | [2008/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007003573 | Date: | 11.01.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/02] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1899773 | Date: | 19.03.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.01.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1899773 | Date: | 27.06.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.03.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G05B19/05 | [2008/12] | CPC: |
G05B19/054 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/26] |
Former [2008/12] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BESTIMMUNG DER BEARBEITUNGSREIHENFOLGE VON BAUSTEINEN EINES FUNKTIONSPLANS SOWIE ELEKTRONISCHE DATENVERARBEITUNGSANLAGE ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG DES VERFAHRENS | [2008/12] | English: | METHOD FOR DETERMINATION OF THE PROCESSING SEQUENCE OF COMPONENTS OF A FUNCTION PLAN AND ELECTRONIC DATA PROCESSING UNIT FOR CARRYING OUT SAID METHOD | [2018/10] | French: | PROCEDE POUR DETERMINER LA SEQUENCE DE TRAITEMENT DE MODULES D'UN SCHEMA LOGIQUE ET INSTALLATION DE TRAITEMENT DE DONNEES ELECTRONIQUE PERMETTANT DE METTRE EN OEUVRE CE PROCEDE | [2008/12] |
Former [2008/12] | METHOD FOR DETERMINATION OF THE PROCESSING SEQUENCE OF A COMPONENT OF A FUNCTION PLAN AND ELECTRONIC DATA PROCESSING UNIT FOR CARRYING OUT SAID METHOD | Entry into regional phase | 02.01.2008 | National basic fee paid | 02.01.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.01.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.01.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.01.2008 | Examination requested [2008/12] | 02.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.02.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.11.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.03.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.11.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.03.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.03.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.05.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 15.05.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 15.05.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.06.2008 | Opposition(s) | 28.03.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 18.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 20.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 19.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.06.2006 | CY | 27.06.2018 | CZ | 27.06.2018 | DK | 27.06.2018 | EE | 27.06.2018 | ES | 27.06.2018 | FI | 27.06.2018 | IT | 27.06.2018 | LT | 27.06.2018 | LV | 27.06.2018 | MC | 27.06.2018 | NL | 27.06.2018 | PL | 27.06.2018 | PT | 27.06.2018 | RO | 27.06.2018 | SE | 27.06.2018 | SI | 27.06.2018 | SK | 27.06.2018 | TR | 27.06.2018 | AT | 29.06.2018 | IE | 29.06.2018 | LU | 29.06.2018 | BE | 30.06.2018 | CH | 30.06.2018 | LI | 30.06.2018 | FR | 27.08.2018 | BG | 27.09.2018 | GR | 28.09.2018 | IS | 27.10.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/27] | HU | 29.06.2006 | |
CZ | 27.06.2018 | ||
DK | 27.06.2018 | ||
EE | 27.06.2018 | ||
ES | 27.06.2018 | ||
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
IT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
MC | 27.06.2018 | ||
NL | 27.06.2018 | ||
PL | 27.06.2018 | ||
PT | 27.06.2018 | ||
RO | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
SI | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
TR | 27.06.2018 | ||
AT | 29.06.2018 | ||
IE | 29.06.2018 | ||
LU | 29.06.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
CH | 30.06.2018 | ||
LI | 30.06.2018 | ||
FR | 27.08.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | CZ | 27.06.2018 | |
DK | 27.06.2018 | ||
EE | 27.06.2018 | ||
ES | 27.06.2018 | ||
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
IT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
MC | 27.06.2018 | ||
NL | 27.06.2018 | ||
PL | 27.06.2018 | ||
RO | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
SI | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
TR | 27.06.2018 | ||
AT | 29.06.2018 | ||
IE | 29.06.2018 | ||
LU | 29.06.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
CH | 30.06.2018 | ||
LI | 30.06.2018 | ||
FR | 27.08.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
Former [2020/03] | CZ | 27.06.2018 | |
DK | 27.06.2018 | ||
EE | 27.06.2018 | ||
ES | 27.06.2018 | ||
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
IT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
MC | 27.06.2018 | ||
NL | 27.06.2018 | ||
PL | 27.06.2018 | ||
RO | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
SI | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
AT | 29.06.2018 | ||
IE | 29.06.2018 | ||
LU | 29.06.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
CH | 30.06.2018 | ||
LI | 30.06.2018 | ||
FR | 27.08.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/38] | CZ | 27.06.2018 | |
DK | 27.06.2018 | ||
EE | 27.06.2018 | ||
ES | 27.06.2018 | ||
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
IT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
MC | 27.06.2018 | ||
NL | 27.06.2018 | ||
PL | 27.06.2018 | ||
RO | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
SI | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
IE | 29.06.2018 | ||
LU | 29.06.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
CH | 30.06.2018 | ||
LI | 30.06.2018 | ||
FR | 27.08.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/37] | CZ | 27.06.2018 | |
DK | 27.06.2018 | ||
EE | 27.06.2018 | ||
ES | 27.06.2018 | ||
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
IT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
MC | 27.06.2018 | ||
NL | 27.06.2018 | ||
PL | 27.06.2018 | ||
RO | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
SI | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
IE | 29.06.2018 | ||
LU | 29.06.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
CH | 30.06.2018 | ||
LI | 30.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | CZ | 27.06.2018 | |
DK | 27.06.2018 | ||
EE | 27.06.2018 | ||
ES | 27.06.2018 | ||
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
IT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
MC | 27.06.2018 | ||
NL | 27.06.2018 | ||
PL | 27.06.2018 | ||
RO | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
IE | 29.06.2018 | ||
LU | 29.06.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
CH | 30.06.2018 | ||
LI | 30.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | CZ | 27.06.2018 | |
EE | 27.06.2018 | ||
ES | 27.06.2018 | ||
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
IT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
MC | 27.06.2018 | ||
NL | 27.06.2018 | ||
PL | 27.06.2018 | ||
RO | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
IE | 29.06.2018 | ||
LU | 29.06.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
CH | 30.06.2018 | ||
LI | 30.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | CZ | 27.06.2018 | |
EE | 27.06.2018 | ||
ES | 27.06.2018 | ||
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
IT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
MC | 27.06.2018 | ||
NL | 27.06.2018 | ||
PL | 27.06.2018 | ||
RO | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
IE | 29.06.2018 | ||
LU | 29.06.2018 | ||
CH | 30.06.2018 | ||
LI | 30.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/19] | CZ | 27.06.2018 | |
EE | 27.06.2018 | ||
ES | 27.06.2018 | ||
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
IT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
MC | 27.06.2018 | ||
NL | 27.06.2018 | ||
PL | 27.06.2018 | ||
RO | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
IE | 29.06.2018 | ||
LU | 29.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/17] | CZ | 27.06.2018 | |
EE | 27.06.2018 | ||
ES | 27.06.2018 | ||
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
IT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
MC | 27.06.2018 | ||
NL | 27.06.2018 | ||
PL | 27.06.2018 | ||
RO | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
LU | 29.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/15] | CZ | 27.06.2018 | |
EE | 27.06.2018 | ||
ES | 27.06.2018 | ||
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
IT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
MC | 27.06.2018 | ||
NL | 27.06.2018 | ||
PL | 27.06.2018 | ||
RO | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | CZ | 27.06.2018 | |
EE | 27.06.2018 | ||
ES | 27.06.2018 | ||
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
IT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
NL | 27.06.2018 | ||
PL | 27.06.2018 | ||
RO | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | CZ | 27.06.2018 | |
EE | 27.06.2018 | ||
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
IT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
NL | 27.06.2018 | ||
PL | 27.06.2018 | ||
RO | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | CZ | 27.06.2018 | |
EE | 27.06.2018 | ||
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
NL | 27.06.2018 | ||
PL | 27.06.2018 | ||
RO | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
SK | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | EE | 27.06.2018 | |
FI | 27.06.2018 | ||
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
NL | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 27.06.2018 | |
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
NL | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
IS | 27.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/03] | FI | 27.06.2018 | |
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
NL | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | FI | 27.06.2018 | |
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
GR | 28.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | FI | 27.06.2018 | |
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
LV | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | FI | 27.06.2018 | |
LT | 27.06.2018 | ||
SE | 27.06.2018 | ||
BG | 27.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | FI | 27.06.2018 | |
LT | 27.06.2018 | Cited in | International search | [DA]DE4230178 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [DA] 1-18* the whole document *; | [X]WO9934302 (TRICONEX CORP [US]) [X] 1,2,4,12,14,16,17 * page 3 - page 12 *; | [X]WO2004072744 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [X] 1,8,10,16,17 * page 1, line 7 - page 7, line 3 * | by applicant | WO9934302 | WO2004072744 |