27.05.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.06.2022 [2022/26] |
04.10.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] |
17.05.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.06.2013 [2013/25] |
10.02.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.03.2012 [2012/11] |
16.12.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.01.2012 [2012/03] |
16.09.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.10.2011 [2011/42] |
16.09.2011 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 19.10.2011 [2011/42] |
26.08.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.09.2011 [2011/39] |
19.08.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.09.2011 [2011/38] |
05.08.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.09.2011 [2011/36] |
15.07.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.08.2011 [2011/33] |
24.06.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.07.2011 [2011/30] |
06.05.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.06.2011 [2011/23] |
08.04.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.05.2011 [2011/19] |
08.10.2010 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 10.11.2010 [2010/45] |
24.09.2010 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
24.09.2010 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
28.07.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
18.05.2010 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
25.02.2010 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
25.02.2010 |
Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO |
|
08.01.2010 |
Change - extension states |
published on 10.02.2010 [2010/06] |
22.07.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.08.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
07.03.2008 |
Change - extension states |
published on 09.04.2008 [2008/15] |
15.02.2008 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 19.03.2008 [2008/12] |
15.02.2008 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 19.03.2008 [2008/12] |
16.01.2008 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
03.01.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.03.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
07.03.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.01.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.10.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|