Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7906171 | Global Dossier | 15.03.2011 | B2 | US2009047444 | 19.02.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102005032711 | 07.07.2005 | WO2006EP63778 | 03.07.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2009500522 | Global Dossier | 08.01.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | DE102005032711 | 07.07.2005 | WO2006EP63778 | 03.07.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1899499 | Global Dossier | 10.11.2010 | B1 | EP1899499 | 19.03.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102005032711 | 07.07.2005 | WO2006EP63778 | 03.07.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE487809T | 15.11.2010 | T1 | Priority number | Date | DE102005032711 | 07.07.2005 | WO2006EP63778 | 03.07.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE502006008288D1 | 23.12.2010 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DE102005032711 | 07.07.2005 | WO2006EP63778 | 03.07.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK1899499T | 14.02.2011 | T3 | Priority number | Date | DE102005032711 | 07.07.2005 | WO2006EP63778 | 03.07.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007006674 | Global Dossier | 18.01.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102005032711 | 07.07.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101218373 | 09.07.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | DE102005032711 | 07.07.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102005032711 | 11.01.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102005032711 | 07.07.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2355429T | 25.03.2011 | T3 | Priority number | Date | DE102005032711 | 07.07.2005 |