EP1899499 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING A LAYER, WHICH HAS NANOPARTICLES, ON A SUBSTRATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.09.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.05.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 29.06.2022 [2022/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/12] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JABADO, Rene Sylter Str. 7 14199 Berlin / DE | 02 /
KRÜGER, Ursus Krampnitzer Weg 11 14089 Berlin / DE | 03 /
KÖRTVELYESSY, Daniel Grünspechtweg 19 13469 Berlin / DE | 04 /
LÜTHEN, Volkmar Beckerstr. 4 12157 Berlin / DE | 05 /
REICHE, Ralph Bulgenbachweg 15 13465 Berlin / DE | 06 /
RINDLER, Michael Waldstr. 38 15566 Schöneiche / DE | [2008/12] | Application number, filing date | 06777538.7 | 03.07.2006 | [2008/12] | WO2006EP63778 | Priority number, date | DE20051032711 | 07.07.2005 Original published format: DE102005032711 | [2008/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007006674 | Date: | 18.01.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1899499 | Date: | 19.03.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.01.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1899499 | Date: | 10.11.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.01.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C23C24/04, C23C24/00 | [2008/12] | CPC: |
C23C24/00 (EP,US);
C23C26/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/12] | Extension states | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM HERSTELLEN EINER NANOPARTIKEL AUFWEISENDEN SCHICHT AUF EINEM SUBSTRAT | [2008/12] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING A LAYER, WHICH HAS NANOPARTICLES, ON A SUBSTRATE | [2008/12] | French: | PROCEDE POUR PRODUIRE SUR UN SUBSTRAT UNE COUCHE PRESENTANT DES NANOPARTICULES | [2008/12] | Entry into regional phase | 20.12.2007 | National basic fee paid | 20.12.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.12.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.12.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.12.2007 | Examination requested [2008/12] | 02.06.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.09.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 21.09.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.08.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 10.11.2010 | EE | 10.11.2010 | FI | 10.11.2010 | HU | 10.11.2010 | IE | 10.11.2010 | IT | 10.11.2010 | LT | 10.11.2010 | LV | 10.11.2010 | NL | 10.11.2010 | PL | 10.11.2010 | RO | 10.11.2010 | SI | 10.11.2010 | SK | 10.11.2010 | TR | 10.11.2010 | BG | 10.02.2011 | GR | 11.02.2011 | IS | 10.03.2011 | PT | 10.03.2011 | LU | 03.07.2011 | MC | 31.07.2011 | [2022/26] |
Former [2013/45] | CY | 10.11.2010 | |
EE | 10.11.2010 | ||
FI | 10.11.2010 | ||
HU | 10.11.2010 | ||
IE | 10.11.2010 | ||
IT | 10.11.2010 | ||
LT | 10.11.2010 | ||
LV | 10.11.2010 | ||
NL | 10.11.2010 | ||
PL | 10.11.2010 | ||
RO | 10.11.2010 | ||
SI | 10.11.2010 | ||
SK | 10.11.2010 | ||
BG | 10.02.2011 | ||
GR | 11.02.2011 | ||
IS | 10.03.2011 | ||
PT | 10.03.2011 | ||
LU | 03.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | CY | 10.11.2010 | |
EE | 10.11.2010 | ||
FI | 10.11.2010 | ||
IE | 10.11.2010 | ||
IT | 10.11.2010 | ||
LT | 10.11.2010 | ||
LV | 10.11.2010 | ||
NL | 10.11.2010 | ||
PL | 10.11.2010 | ||
RO | 10.11.2010 | ||
SI | 10.11.2010 | ||
SK | 10.11.2010 | ||
BG | 10.02.2011 | ||
GR | 11.02.2011 | ||
IS | 10.03.2011 | ||
PT | 10.03.2011 | ||
LU | 03.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | CY | 10.11.2010 | |
EE | 10.11.2010 | ||
FI | 10.11.2010 | ||
IE | 10.11.2010 | ||
IT | 10.11.2010 | ||
LT | 10.11.2010 | ||
LV | 10.11.2010 | ||
NL | 10.11.2010 | ||
PL | 10.11.2010 | ||
RO | 10.11.2010 | ||
SI | 10.11.2010 | ||
SK | 10.11.2010 | ||
BG | 10.02.2011 | ||
GR | 11.02.2011 | ||
IS | 10.03.2011 | ||
PT | 10.03.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/03] | CY | 10.11.2010 | |
EE | 10.11.2010 | ||
FI | 10.11.2010 | ||
IE | 10.11.2010 | ||
IT | 10.11.2010 | ||
LT | 10.11.2010 | ||
LV | 10.11.2010 | ||
NL | 10.11.2010 | ||
PL | 10.11.2010 | ||
RO | 10.11.2010 | ||
SI | 10.11.2010 | ||
SK | 10.11.2010 | ||
BG | 10.02.2011 | ||
GR | 11.02.2011 | ||
IS | 10.03.2011 | ||
PT | 10.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | CY | 10.11.2010 | |
EE | 10.11.2010 | ||
FI | 10.11.2010 | ||
IE | 10.11.2010 | ||
LT | 10.11.2010 | ||
LV | 10.11.2010 | ||
NL | 10.11.2010 | ||
PL | 10.11.2010 | ||
RO | 10.11.2010 | ||
SI | 10.11.2010 | ||
SK | 10.11.2010 | ||
BG | 10.02.2011 | ||
GR | 11.02.2011 | ||
IS | 10.03.2011 | ||
PT | 10.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | CY | 10.11.2010 | |
EE | 10.11.2010 | ||
FI | 10.11.2010 | ||
IE | 10.11.2010 | ||
LT | 10.11.2010 | ||
LV | 10.11.2010 | ||
NL | 10.11.2010 | ||
PL | 10.11.2010 | ||
SI | 10.11.2010 | ||
SK | 10.11.2010 | ||
BG | 10.02.2011 | ||
GR | 11.02.2011 | ||
IS | 10.03.2011 | ||
PT | 10.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/33] | CY | 10.11.2010 | |
FI | 10.11.2010 | ||
IE | 10.11.2010 | ||
LT | 10.11.2010 | ||
LV | 10.11.2010 | ||
NL | 10.11.2010 | ||
SI | 10.11.2010 | ||
BG | 10.02.2011 | ||
GR | 11.02.2011 | ||
IS | 10.03.2011 | ||
PT | 10.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/30] | CY | 10.11.2010 | |
FI | 10.11.2010 | ||
LT | 10.11.2010 | ||
LV | 10.11.2010 | ||
NL | 10.11.2010 | ||
SI | 10.11.2010 | ||
BG | 10.02.2011 | ||
GR | 11.02.2011 | ||
IS | 10.03.2011 | ||
PT | 10.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/23] | FI | 10.11.2010 | |
LT | 10.11.2010 | ||
LV | 10.11.2010 | ||
IS | 10.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/19] | LT | 10.11.2010 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH06128728 ; | [A]US2442986 (HAROLD P. RANSBURG); | [Y]GB932923 (ARMCO STEEL CORP) [Y] 1,4,10 * page 3, line 60 - line 102; figures 1,2 *; | [A]GB2226257 (CITY ELECTRICAL FACTORS LTD [GB]); | [A]DE4000885 (PHILIPS PATENTVERWALTUNG [DE]) [A] 1,4,10 * column 7, line 26 - column 8, line 13; figures 1,2 *; | [X]EP0441300 (SONY CORP [JP]) [X] 1,4,10 * column 12, line 12 - line 14; figure 1; claims 1-6 *; | [A]DE19935053 (AGENCY IND SCIENCE TECHN [JP]) [A] 8,13; | [A]WO03006172 (INNOVATIVE TECHNOLOGY INC [US]); | [YA]US2004121084 (KITANI KOJI [JP]) [Y] 1,4,10 * page 2, paragraph 22 * * page 1, paragraph 7; figure 1 * [A] 7-9,13 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940811), vol. 018, no. 430, Database accession no. (C - 1236), & JP06128728 A 19940510 (VACUUM METALLURGICAL CO LTD) [A] 4-6 * abstract * | by applicant | US5308367 | DE19709165 | DE10027948 | EP1231294 |