EP1920474 - PIEZOELECTRIC ACTUATOR COMPRISING AN AUTOMATICALLY CENTRING PLUG-IN CONNECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.09.2010 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2008/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HEINZ, Rudolf Eltinger Weg 26 71272 Renningen / DE | 02 /
KIENZLER, Dieter Neukoellner Str. 6 71229 Leonberg / DE | 03 /
SCHAICH, Udo Keltenweg 57 70378 Stuttgart / DE | [2008/20] | Application number, filing date | 06777760.7 | 13.07.2006 | [2008/20] | WO2006EP64208 | Priority number, date | DE20051039553 | 22.08.2005 Original published format: DE102005039553 | [2008/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007023029 | Date: | 01.03.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1920474 | Date: | 14.05.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.03.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1920474 | Date: | 28.10.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.03.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H01L41/053 | [2008/20] | CPC: |
F02M51/005 (EP,US);
F02M51/0603 (EP,US);
F02M61/168 (EP,US);
H10N30/875 (EP,US);
H10N30/88 (EP,US);
F02M2200/8084 (EP,US);
F02M2200/9007 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/20] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PIEZOAKTOR MIT EINER SELBSTZENTRIERENDEN STECKVERBINDUNG | [2008/20] | English: | PIEZOELECTRIC ACTUATOR COMPRISING AN AUTOMATICALLY CENTRING PLUG-IN CONNECTION | [2008/20] | French: | ACTIONNEUR PIEZO-ELECTRIQUE COMPRENANT UNE FICHE DE RACCORDEMENT A CENTRAGE AUTOMATIQUE | [2008/20] | Entry into regional phase | 25.03.2008 | National basic fee paid | 25.03.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.03.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/20] | 21.07.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.09.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 10.09.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.07.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 28.10.2009 | CZ | 28.10.2009 | DK | 28.10.2009 | EE | 28.10.2009 | FI | 28.10.2009 | IE | 28.10.2009 | LT | 28.10.2009 | LV | 28.10.2009 | NL | 28.10.2009 | PL | 28.10.2009 | RO | 28.10.2009 | SE | 28.10.2009 | SI | 28.10.2009 | SK | 28.10.2009 | TR | 28.10.2009 | BG | 28.01.2010 | GR | 29.01.2010 | ES | 08.02.2010 | IS | 28.02.2010 | PT | 01.03.2010 | HU | 29.04.2010 | GB | 13.07.2010 | LU | 13.07.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/44] | CY | 28.10.2009 | |
CZ | 28.10.2009 | ||
DK | 28.10.2009 | ||
EE | 28.10.2009 | ||
FI | 28.10.2009 | ||
IE | 28.10.2009 | ||
LT | 28.10.2009 | ||
LV | 28.10.2009 | ||
NL | 28.10.2009 | ||
PL | 28.10.2009 | ||
RO | 28.10.2009 | ||
SE | 28.10.2009 | ||
SI | 28.10.2009 | ||
SK | 28.10.2009 | ||
BG | 28.01.2010 | ||
GR | 29.01.2010 | ||
ES | 08.02.2010 | ||
IS | 28.02.2010 | ||
PT | 01.03.2010 | ||
HU | 29.04.2010 | ||
GB | 13.07.2010 | ||
LU | 13.07.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | CY | 28.10.2009 | |
CZ | 28.10.2009 | ||
DK | 28.10.2009 | ||
EE | 28.10.2009 | ||
FI | 28.10.2009 | ||
IE | 28.10.2009 | ||
LT | 28.10.2009 | ||
LV | 28.10.2009 | ||
PL | 28.10.2009 | ||
RO | 28.10.2009 | ||
SE | 28.10.2009 | ||
SI | 28.10.2009 | ||
SK | 28.10.2009 | ||
BG | 28.01.2010 | ||
GR | 29.01.2010 | ||
ES | 08.02.2010 | ||
IS | 28.02.2010 | ||
PT | 01.03.2010 | ||
HU | 29.04.2010 | ||
GB | 13.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/35] | CY | 28.10.2009 | |
CZ | 28.10.2009 | ||
DK | 28.10.2009 | ||
EE | 28.10.2009 | ||
FI | 28.10.2009 | ||
IE | 28.10.2009 | ||
LT | 28.10.2009 | ||
LV | 28.10.2009 | ||
PL | 28.10.2009 | ||
RO | 28.10.2009 | ||
SE | 28.10.2009 | ||
SI | 28.10.2009 | ||
SK | 28.10.2009 | ||
BG | 28.01.2010 | ||
GR | 29.01.2010 | ||
ES | 08.02.2010 | ||
IS | 28.02.2010 | ||
PT | 01.03.2010 | ||
GB | 13.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/05] | CY | 28.10.2009 | |
CZ | 28.10.2009 | ||
DK | 28.10.2009 | ||
EE | 28.10.2009 | ||
FI | 28.10.2009 | ||
IE | 28.10.2009 | ||
LT | 28.10.2009 | ||
LV | 28.10.2009 | ||
PL | 28.10.2009 | ||
RO | 28.10.2009 | ||
SE | 28.10.2009 | ||
SI | 28.10.2009 | ||
SK | 28.10.2009 | ||
BG | 28.01.2010 | ||
GR | 29.01.2010 | ||
ES | 08.02.2010 | ||
IS | 28.02.2010 | ||
PT | 01.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/42] | CY | 28.10.2009 | |
CZ | 28.10.2009 | ||
DK | 28.10.2009 | ||
EE | 28.10.2009 | ||
FI | 28.10.2009 | ||
IE | 28.10.2009 | ||
LT | 28.10.2009 | ||
LV | 28.10.2009 | ||
PL | 28.10.2009 | ||
RO | 28.10.2009 | ||
SE | 28.10.2009 | ||
SI | 28.10.2009 | ||
SK | 28.10.2009 | ||
BG | 28.01.2010 | ||
ES | 08.02.2010 | ||
IS | 28.02.2010 | ||
PT | 01.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/26] | CY | 28.10.2009 | |
FI | 28.10.2009 | ||
LT | 28.10.2009 | ||
LV | 28.10.2009 | ||
PL | 28.10.2009 | ||
SE | 28.10.2009 | ||
SI | 28.10.2009 | ||
ES | 08.02.2010 | ||
IS | 28.02.2010 | ||
PT | 01.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/19] | ES | 08.02.2010 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2004088123 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al); | [A]WO2005038940 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) |