EP1913562 - METHOD FOR RECORDING DATA IN A MOTOR VEHICLE CONTROL SYSTEM MEMORY UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 03.02.2012 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.02.2012 | Refusal of application | published on 07.03.2012 [2012/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2008/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RIES-MUELLER, Klaus Asternweg 1 74906 Bad Rappenau / DE | [2008/17] | Application number, filing date | 06778099.9 | 01.08.2006 | [2008/17] | WO2006EP64894 | Priority number, date | DE20051036048 | 01.08.2005 Original published format: DE102005036048 | [2008/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007014948 | Date: | 08.02.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1913562 | Date: | 23.04.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.02.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.02.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G07C5/08, B60R16/02 | [2008/17] | CPC: |
G07C5/085 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/17] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM SPEICHERN VON DATEN IN EINEM SPEICHER EINES STEUERSYSTEMS IN EINEM FAHRZEUG | [2008/17] | English: | METHOD FOR RECORDING DATA IN A MOTOR VEHICLE CONTROL SYSTEM MEMORY UNIT | [2008/17] | French: | PROCEDE POUR ENREGISTRER DES DONNEES DANS UNE MEMOIRE D'UN SYSTEME DE COMMANDE CONTENU DANS UN VEHICULE | [2008/17] | Entry into regional phase | 03.03.2008 | National basic fee paid | 03.03.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.03.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/17] | 12.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.09.2011 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 22.09.2011 | 22.09.2011 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 13.10.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2012/10] | 23.10.2011 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2012/10] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.06.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0646713 (NIPPONDENSO CO., LTD; DENSO CORPORATION) [X] 1-9 * abstract * * column 3, line 34 - column 5, line 18 *; | [X]US2003107548 (EUN JONG-WON ET AL) [X] 1-9 * abstract * * paragraphs [0040] - [0053] *; | [X]WO0068659 (ROBERT BOSCH GMBH; FRECH, EBERHARD; WAGNER, WOLFGANG) [X] 1-9 * page 1, line 20 - page 3, line 27 *; | [XD]EP1169686 (ROBERT BOSCH GMBH) [XD] 1-9 * paragraph [0028] * |