EP1919900 - BICYCLIC HETEROCYCLES MEDICAMENTS COMPRISING SAID COMPOUNDS USE AND METHOD FOR PRODUCTION THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.07.2012 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.07.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.08.2012 [2012/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM INTERNATIONAL GMBH Binger Str. 173 55216 Ingelheim / DE | For:DE
Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GmbH & Co. KG Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/20] | For all designated states BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM INTERNATIONAL GMBH Binger Str. 173 D-55216 Ingelheim / DE | ||
For:DE
Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GmbH & Co. KG Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HIMMELSBACH, Frank Ahornweg 16 88441 Mittelbiberach / DE | 02 /
JUNG, Birgit Schlossaecker 9 88471 Laupheim / DE | [2008/20] | Representative(s) | Hammann, Heinz Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GmbH CD-Patents Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/20] | Hammann, Heinz Boehringer Ingelheim Pharma GmbH, CD-Patents, Binger Strasse 173 55216 Ingelheim am Rhein / DE | Application number, filing date | 06778135.1 | 03.08.2006 | [2008/20] | WO2006EP65000 | Priority number, date | EP20050107679 | 22.08.2005 Original published format: EP 05107679 | [2008/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007023073 | Date: | 01.03.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/09] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1919900 | Date: | 14.05.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.03.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.05.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C07D401/12, C07D403/12, C07D239/94, A61K31/517 | [2008/20] | CPC: |
C07D401/12 (EP,US);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/20] | Title | German: | BICYCLISCHE HETEROCYCLEN, DIESE VERBINDUNGEN ENTHALTENDE ARZNEIMITTEL, DEREN VERWENDUNG UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG | [2008/20] | English: | BICYCLIC HETEROCYCLES MEDICAMENTS COMPRISING SAID COMPOUNDS USE AND METHOD FOR PRODUCTION THEREOF | [2008/20] | French: | HETEROCYCLES BICYCLIQUES, PRODUITS PHARMACEUTIQUES CONTENANT CES COMPOSES, LEUR UTILISATION ET PROCEDE POUR LES PREPARER | [2008/20] | Entry into regional phase | 25.03.2008 | National basic fee paid | 25.03.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.03.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/20] | 01.03.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/35] | 10.04.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2011 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DY]WO03082290 (BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMA [DE], et al) [DY] 1-11 * Beispiele (32), (33), (57), (81), (111), (128), (168) * * claim - *; | [Y]WO03082831 (ASTRAZENECA AB [SE], et al) [Y] 1-11 * abstract *; | [Y]WO2005026151 (ASTRAZENECA AB [SE], et al) [Y] 1-11 * page 4, line 29 - page 5, line 20; examples 1,2,5,6,15,17,20,30-32; claims 1,38-43 *; | [Y]WO2005012290 (ASTRAZENECA AB [SE], et al) [Y] 1-11 * claim - *; | [A]DE10042058 (BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM PHARMA [DE]) [A] 1,7-11 * claims 1,8-12 * |