EP1960198 - PRINTING MACHINE SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 06.05.2011 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.05.2011 | Withdrawal of application | published on 08.06.2011 [2011/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koenig & Bauer AG Friedrich-Koenig-Strasse 4 97080 Würzburg / DE | [2008/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ECKERT, Günther, Oskar Riedstr. 18 97225 Zellingen / DE | 02 /
HERBERT, Burkard, Otto Ludwigkai 28 97072 Würzburg / DE | [2008/35] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann, Thomas, et al Koenig & Bauer AG Lizenzen-Patente Friedrich-Koenig-Strasse 4 97080 Würzburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Hoffmann, Thomas, et al Koenig & Bauer AG Patentabteilung Friedrich-Koenig-Strasse 4 97080 Würzburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 06778275.5 | 17.08.2006 | [2008/35] | WO2006EP65426 | Priority number, date | US20050750357P | 15.12.2005 Original published format: US 750357 P | DE20061020322 | 03.05.2006 Original published format: DE102006020322 | [2008/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007071460 | Date: | 28.06.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1960198 | Date: | 27.08.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.06.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.06.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B41F13/54 | [2008/35] | CPC: |
B41F13/54 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/35] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DRUCKMASCHINENANLAGE | [2008/35] | English: | PRINTING MACHINE SYSTEM | [2008/35] | French: | SYSTEME D'IMPRIMEUSES | [2008/35] | Entry into regional phase | 17.03.2008 | National basic fee paid | 17.03.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.03.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.03.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 17.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/35] | 23.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.06.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.04.2011 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2011/23] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.02.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DIAY]US1972506 (WISE WOOD HENRY A) [DI] 1,3-5,7-37,39-54 * the whole document * [A] 6,38 [Y] 2; | [DY]WO03031182 (KOENIG & BAUER AG [DE], et al) [DY] 2 * figure 1 *; | [A]EP0741020 (WIFAG MASCHF [CH]) [A] 1,22,23 * figures 3,4 *; | [A]US2920887 (KEIGHTLEY WILLIAM E) [A] 1 * the whole document * | by applicant | DE10238010 | WO2004024448 | WO03031182 | DE4012396 | US1972506 | DE202005010058U | EP1683634 |