Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8443676 | Global Dossier | 21.05.2013 | B2 | US2010263452 | 21.10.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006EP65602 | 23.08.2006 | DE102006039422 | 23.08.2006 | DE102005039980 | 23.08.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1946060 | Global Dossier | 23.07.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006EP65602 | 23.08.2006 | DE102006039422 | 23.08.2006 | DE102005039980 | 23.08.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007023168 | Global Dossier | 01.03.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102006039422 | 23.08.2006 | DE102005039980 | 23.08.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102006039422 | 15.03.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102006039422 | 23.08.2006 | DE102005039980 | 23.08.2005 |