11.07.2014 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 13.08.2014 [2014/33] |
03.04.2014 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
01.10.2013 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
14.08.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.08.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.04.2011 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
17.02.2011 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
08.10.2010 |
First examination report |
|
04.10.2010 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
24.08.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
20.08.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.05.2009 |
Change - applicant |
published on 17.06.2009 [2009/25] |
11.04.2008 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 14.05.2008 [2008/20] |
11.04.2008 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 14.05.2008 [2008/20] |
06.03.2008 |
Deletion: Fee payment for extension state |
|
06.03.2008 |
New entry: Fee payment for extension state |
|
01.03.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
09.02.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
09.02.2008 |
New entry: Fee payment for extension state |
|
09.02.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
07.02.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.11.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.07.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
17.05.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.03.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.02.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.10.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|