EP1945359 - SAMPLE PLATE ASSEMBLY AND METHOD OF PROCESSING BIOLOGICAL SAMPLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.04.2015 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thermo Fisher Scientific Oy Ratastie 2 01620 Vantaa / FI | [2014/02] |
Former [2008/30] | For all designated states FINNZYMES INSTRUMENTS OY Keilaranta 16 A 02150 Espoo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MORTILLARO, Michael, J. 381 Coastal View Drive Webster, NY 14580 / US | 02 /
TURNER, Bruce, R. 32 Meadowood Drive Exeter, NH 03833 / US | 03 /
COHEN, David, A. 203 High Street Dedham, MA 02026 / US | [2008/30] | Representative(s) | Laine IP Oy Porkkalankatu 24 00180 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2014/41] | Seppo Laine Oy Itämerenkatu 3 B 00180 Helsinki / FI | ||
Former [2013/45] | Luoto, Kristian Reinhold, et al Seppo Laine Oy Itämerenkatu 3 B 00180 Helsinki / FI | ||
Former [2009/09] | Arvela, Sakari Mikael, et al Seppo Laine Oy Itämerenkatu 3 B FIN-00180 Helsinki / FI | ||
Former [2008/30] | Knuth-Lehtola, Sisko Hillevi Seppo Laine Oy, Itämerenkatu 3 B 00180 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 06778562.6 | 05.09.2006 | [2008/30] | WO2006FI50379 | Priority number, date | FI20050000882 | 06.09.2005 Original published format: FI 20050882 | US20050714816P | 06.09.2005 Original published format: US 714816 P | [2008/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007028861 | Date: | 15.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1945359 | Date: | 23.07.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.03.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1945359 | Date: | 11.06.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.03.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B01L3/00, G01N35/02 | [2013/32] | CPC: |
B01L3/50855 (EP,US);
B01L2300/0829 (EP,US);
G01N35/028 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/30] | B01L3/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/30] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PROBENPLATTE UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERARBEITUNG VON BIOLOGISCHEN PROBEN | [2013/32] | English: | SAMPLE PLATE ASSEMBLY AND METHOD OF PROCESSING BIOLOGICAL SAMPLES | [2008/30] | French: | ENSEMBLE PLAQUE PORTE-ECHANTILLONS ET PROCEDE DE TRAITEMENT D'ECHANTILLONS BIOLOGIQUES | [2008/30] |
Former [2008/30] | PROBENPLATTENANORDNUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERARBEITUNG BIOLOGISCHER PROBEN | Entry into regional phase | 31.03.2008 | National basic fee paid | 31.03.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.03.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.07.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 31.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/30] | 27.05.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.08.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.11.2013 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 28.11.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 28.11.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.03.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.04.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.08.2013 | Opposition(s) | 12.03.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.09.2006 | AT | 11.06.2014 | BE | 11.06.2014 | BG | 11.06.2014 | CY | 11.06.2014 | CZ | 11.06.2014 | DK | 11.06.2014 | EE | 11.06.2014 | ES | 11.06.2014 | FI | 11.06.2014 | IT | 11.06.2014 | LT | 11.06.2014 | LV | 11.06.2014 | MC | 11.06.2014 | NL | 11.06.2014 | PL | 11.06.2014 | RO | 11.06.2014 | SE | 11.06.2014 | SI | 11.06.2014 | SK | 11.06.2014 | TR | 11.06.2014 | IE | 05.09.2014 | LU | 05.09.2014 | GR | 12.09.2014 | FR | 30.09.2014 | IS | 11.10.2014 | PT | 13.10.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 05.09.2006 | |
AT | 11.06.2014 | ||
BE | 11.06.2014 | ||
BG | 11.06.2014 | ||
CY | 11.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 11.06.2014 | ||
DK | 11.06.2014 | ||
EE | 11.06.2014 | ||
ES | 11.06.2014 | ||
FI | 11.06.2014 | ||
IT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LV | 11.06.2014 | ||
MC | 11.06.2014 | ||
NL | 11.06.2014 | ||
PL | 11.06.2014 | ||
RO | 11.06.2014 | ||
SE | 11.06.2014 | ||
SI | 11.06.2014 | ||
SK | 11.06.2014 | ||
IE | 05.09.2014 | ||
LU | 05.09.2014 | ||
GR | 12.09.2014 | ||
FR | 30.09.2014 | ||
IS | 11.10.2014 | ||
PT | 13.10.2014 | ||
Former [2016/31] | AT | 11.06.2014 | |
BG | 11.06.2014 | ||
CY | 11.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 11.06.2014 | ||
DK | 11.06.2014 | ||
EE | 11.06.2014 | ||
ES | 11.06.2014 | ||
FI | 11.06.2014 | ||
IT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LV | 11.06.2014 | ||
MC | 11.06.2014 | ||
NL | 11.06.2014 | ||
PL | 11.06.2014 | ||
RO | 11.06.2014 | ||
SE | 11.06.2014 | ||
SI | 11.06.2014 | ||
SK | 11.06.2014 | ||
IE | 05.09.2014 | ||
LU | 05.09.2014 | ||
GR | 12.09.2014 | ||
FR | 30.09.2014 | ||
IS | 11.10.2014 | ||
PT | 13.10.2014 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 11.06.2014 | |
BG | 11.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 11.06.2014 | ||
DK | 11.06.2014 | ||
EE | 11.06.2014 | ||
ES | 11.06.2014 | ||
FI | 11.06.2014 | ||
IT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LV | 11.06.2014 | ||
MC | 11.06.2014 | ||
NL | 11.06.2014 | ||
PL | 11.06.2014 | ||
RO | 11.06.2014 | ||
SE | 11.06.2014 | ||
SI | 11.06.2014 | ||
SK | 11.06.2014 | ||
IE | 05.09.2014 | ||
LU | 05.09.2014 | ||
GR | 12.09.2014 | ||
FR | 30.09.2014 | ||
IS | 11.10.2014 | ||
PT | 13.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/38] | AT | 11.06.2014 | |
CZ | 11.06.2014 | ||
DK | 11.06.2014 | ||
EE | 11.06.2014 | ||
ES | 11.06.2014 | ||
FI | 11.06.2014 | ||
IT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LV | 11.06.2014 | ||
MC | 11.06.2014 | ||
NL | 11.06.2014 | ||
PL | 11.06.2014 | ||
RO | 11.06.2014 | ||
SE | 11.06.2014 | ||
SI | 11.06.2014 | ||
SK | 11.06.2014 | ||
IE | 05.09.2014 | ||
LU | 05.09.2014 | ||
GR | 12.09.2014 | ||
FR | 30.09.2014 | ||
IS | 11.10.2014 | ||
PT | 13.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 11.06.2014 | |
CZ | 11.06.2014 | ||
DK | 11.06.2014 | ||
EE | 11.06.2014 | ||
ES | 11.06.2014 | ||
FI | 11.06.2014 | ||
IT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LV | 11.06.2014 | ||
MC | 11.06.2014 | ||
NL | 11.06.2014 | ||
PL | 11.06.2014 | ||
RO | 11.06.2014 | ||
SE | 11.06.2014 | ||
SI | 11.06.2014 | ||
SK | 11.06.2014 | ||
IE | 05.09.2014 | ||
LU | 05.09.2014 | ||
GR | 12.09.2014 | ||
IS | 11.10.2014 | ||
PT | 13.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 11.06.2014 | |
CZ | 11.06.2014 | ||
DK | 11.06.2014 | ||
EE | 11.06.2014 | ||
ES | 11.06.2014 | ||
FI | 11.06.2014 | ||
IT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LV | 11.06.2014 | ||
MC | 11.06.2014 | ||
NL | 11.06.2014 | ||
PL | 11.06.2014 | ||
RO | 11.06.2014 | ||
SE | 11.06.2014 | ||
SI | 11.06.2014 | ||
SK | 11.06.2014 | ||
LU | 05.09.2014 | ||
GR | 12.09.2014 | ||
IS | 11.10.2014 | ||
PT | 13.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | AT | 11.06.2014 | |
CZ | 11.06.2014 | ||
DK | 11.06.2014 | ||
EE | 11.06.2014 | ||
ES | 11.06.2014 | ||
FI | 11.06.2014 | ||
IT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LV | 11.06.2014 | ||
MC | 11.06.2014 | ||
NL | 11.06.2014 | ||
PL | 11.06.2014 | ||
RO | 11.06.2014 | ||
SE | 11.06.2014 | ||
SK | 11.06.2014 | ||
LU | 05.09.2014 | ||
GR | 12.09.2014 | ||
IS | 11.10.2014 | ||
PT | 13.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/20] | AT | 11.06.2014 | |
CZ | 11.06.2014 | ||
EE | 11.06.2014 | ||
ES | 11.06.2014 | ||
FI | 11.06.2014 | ||
LT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LV | 11.06.2014 | ||
MC | 11.06.2014 | ||
NL | 11.06.2014 | ||
PL | 11.06.2014 | ||
RO | 11.06.2014 | ||
SE | 11.06.2014 | ||
SK | 11.06.2014 | ||
GR | 12.09.2014 | ||
IS | 11.10.2014 | ||
PT | 13.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | AT | 11.06.2014 | |
CZ | 11.06.2014 | ||
EE | 11.06.2014 | ||
ES | 11.06.2014 | ||
FI | 11.06.2014 | ||
LT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LV | 11.06.2014 | ||
NL | 11.06.2014 | ||
PL | 11.06.2014 | ||
RO | 11.06.2014 | ||
SE | 11.06.2014 | ||
SK | 11.06.2014 | ||
GR | 12.09.2014 | ||
IS | 11.10.2014 | ||
PT | 13.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CZ | 11.06.2014 | |
EE | 11.06.2014 | ||
ES | 11.06.2014 | ||
FI | 11.06.2014 | ||
LT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LV | 11.06.2014 | ||
PL | 11.06.2014 | ||
RO | 11.06.2014 | ||
SE | 11.06.2014 | ||
SK | 11.06.2014 | ||
GR | 12.09.2014 | ||
PT | 13.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | CZ | 11.06.2014 | |
EE | 11.06.2014 | ||
ES | 11.06.2014 | ||
FI | 11.06.2014 | ||
LT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LV | 11.06.2014 | ||
SE | 11.06.2014 | ||
SK | 11.06.2014 | ||
GR | 12.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | FI | 11.06.2014 | |
LT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LV | 11.06.2014 | ||
SE | 11.06.2014 | ||
GR | 12.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | FI | 11.06.2014 | |
LT | 11.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | LT | 11.06.2014 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO0152988 (GREINER LABORTECHNIK GMBH [DE]; KNEBEL GUENTHER [DE]) [X] 1,10,15 * page 7, lines 17-26 * * page 8, line 23 - page 9, line 28; figure 4; claims 2,7 *; | [X]EP1316360 (MJ RES INC [US] BIO RAD LABORATORIES [US]) [X] 10 * paragraphs [0001] , [0036] - [0047]; figure - *; | [AD]EP0408280 (TECHNE CAMBRIDGE LTD [GB]); | [A]US6669911 (SWANSON DAVID W [US]); | [AD]WO9961152 (MJ RESEARCH INC [US]) |