EP1893228 - CHIMERIC POLYPEPTIDES AND THE THERAPEUTIC USE THEREOF AGAINST A FLAVIVIRIDAE INFECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2008/10] | CHIMERICPOLY PEPTIDES AND THE THERAPEUTIC USE THEREOF AGAINST A FLAVIVIRIDAE INFECTION | ||
[2015/44] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.01.2017 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.07.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 08.08.2018 [2018/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INSTITUT PASTEUR 25-28, rue du Docteur Roux 75724 Paris Cedex 15 / FR | For all designated states Centre National de la Recherche Scientifique 3, rue Michel Ange 75794 Paris Cedex 16 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2016/12] | For all designated states INSTITUT PASTEUR 25-28, rue du Docteur Roux 75724 Paris Cedex 15 / FR | ||
For all designated states Centre National de la Recherche Scientifique 3, rue Michel-Ange 75794 Paris Cedex 16 / FR | |||
Former [2008/10] | For all designated states INSTITUT PASTEUR 25-28, rue du Docteur Roux 75724 Paris Cedex 15 / FR | ||
For all designated states Centre National de la Recherche Scientifique 3, rue Michel-Ange 75794 Paris Cedex 16 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TANGY, Frédéric 60, rue Garde Chasse 93260 Les Lilas / FR | 02 /
LUCAS-HOURANI, Marianne 38, rue des Epinettes 75017 Paris / FR | 03 /
NAVARRO-SANCHEZ, Erika 62, rue Joseph Gaillard 93100 Montreuil-sous-Bois / FR | 04 /
FRENKIEL, Marie-Pascale 15, rue Chaptal 92300 Levallois-Perret / FR | 05 /
BEDOUELLE, Hugues 4 rue Auguste Bartholdi 75015 Paris / FR | 06 /
COMBREDET, Chantal 124 Avenue de Villiers 75017 Paris / FR | 07 /
DESPRES, Philippe 18 Place de la Liberté 92250 La Garenne-Colombes / FR | [2016/12] |
Former [2008/10] | 01 /
TANGY, Frédéric 60, rue Garde Chasse F-93260 Les Lilas / FR | ||
02 /
LUCAS-HOURANI, Marianne 38, rue des Epinettes F-75017 Paris / FR | |||
03 /
NAVARRO-SANCHEZ, Erika 62, rue Joseph Gaillard F-93100 Montreuil-sous-Bois / FR | |||
04 /
FRENKIEL, Marie-Pascale 15, rue Chaptal F-92300 Levallois-Perret / FR | |||
05 /
BEDOUELLE, Hugues 4 rue Auguste Bartholdi F-75015 PARIS / FR | |||
06 /
COMBREDET, Chantal 124 Avenue de Villiers F-75017 Paris / FR | |||
07 /
DESPRES, Philippe 18 Place de la Liberté F-92250 La Garenne-Colombes / FR | Representative(s) | Desaix, Anne, et al Ernest Gutmann - Yves Plasseraud S.A.S. 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/10] | Desaix, Anne, et al Ernest Gutmann - Yves Plasseraud S.A.S. 3, rue Auber 75009 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 06778626.9 | 20.06.2006 | [2008/10] | WO2006FR01396 | Priority number, date | CA20052508266 | 20.06.2005 Original published format: CA 2508266 | [2008/10] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006136697 | Date: | 28.12.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/52] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1893228 | Date: | 05.03.2008 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.12.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1893228 | Date: | 23.03.2016 | Language: | FR | [2016/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.03.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/16, C07K14/18, C12N15/09, C12N15/62, C12N15/86, C07K16/10 | [2008/10] | CPC: |
C07K14/005 (EP,US);
A61K39/12 (EP,US);
A61K39/165 (US);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P31/14 (EP);
A61P37/04 (EP);
C12N15/86 (EP,US);
C12N7/00 (US);
A61K2039/5254 (EP,US);
A61K2039/5256 (EP,US);
A61K2039/53 (EP,US);
A61K2039/545 (EP,US);
A61K2039/55 (EP,US);
A61K2039/55505 (EP,US);
A61K38/00 (EP,US);
C07K2319/00 (EP,US);
C07K2319/04 (EP,US);
C12N2760/18434 (US);
C12N2760/18443 (EP,US);
C12N2770/24122 (EP,US);
C12N2770/24134 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/12] |
Former [2008/10] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | CHIMÄRISCHE POLYPEPTIDE UND IHRE THERAPEUTISCHE VERWENDUNG GEGEN FLAVIVIRIDAE-INFEKTIONEN | [2008/10] | English: | CHIMERIC POLYPEPTIDES AND THE THERAPEUTIC USE THEREOF AGAINST A FLAVIVIRIDAE INFECTION | [2015/44] | French: | POLYPEPTIDES CHIMERIQUES ET LEURS APPLICATIONS THÉRAPEUTIQUES CONTRE UNE INFECTION À FLAVIVIRIDAE | [2008/10] |
Former [2008/10] | CHIMERICPOLY PEPTIDES AND THE THERAPEUTIC USE THEREOF AGAINST A FLAVIVIRIDAE INFECTION | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 30.11.2007 | National basic fee paid | 30.11.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.11.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.11.2007 | Examination requested [2008/10] | 17.12.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.12.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.04.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.03.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.08.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.10.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.12.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 04.12.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.01.2016 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 26.01.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.12.2009 | Opposition(s) | 02.01.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 22.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.06.2006 | CY | 23.03.2016 | CZ | 23.03.2016 | EE | 23.03.2016 | FI | 23.03.2016 | LT | 23.03.2016 | LV | 23.03.2016 | MC | 23.03.2016 | PL | 23.03.2016 | RO | 23.03.2016 | SI | 23.03.2016 | SK | 23.03.2016 | IE | 20.06.2016 | LU | 20.06.2016 | BG | 23.06.2016 | GR | 24.06.2016 | IS | 23.07.2016 | PT | 25.07.2016 | [2018/29] |
Former [2018/28] | HU | 20.06.2006 | |
CY | 23.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 23.03.2016 | ||
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
MC | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
SI | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
IE | 20.06.2016 | ||
BG | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | CZ | 23.03.2016 | |
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
MC | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
SI | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
IE | 20.06.2016 | ||
BG | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/20] | CZ | 23.03.2016 | |
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
MC | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
BG | 23.06.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | CZ | 23.03.2016 | |
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
MC | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | CZ | 23.03.2016 | |
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
PT | 25.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | CZ | 23.03.2016 | |
EE | 23.03.2016 | ||
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
RO | 23.03.2016 | ||
SK | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | EE | 23.03.2016 | |
FI | 23.03.2016 | ||
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
PL | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/48] | FI | 23.03.2016 | |
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
IS | 23.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | FI | 23.03.2016 | |
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
LV | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | FI | 23.03.2016 | |
LT | 23.03.2016 | ||
GR | 24.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | FI | 23.03.2016 | |
GR | 24.06.2016 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO0196376 (PASTEUR INSTITUT [FR], et al); | [X]WO2004076619 (PASTEUR INSTITUT [FR], et al) [X] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [PA]WO2005111221 (PASTEUR INSTITUT [FR], et al); | [A] - CATTEAU ADELINE ET AL, "Dengue virus M protein contains a proapoptotic sequence referred to as ApoptoM.", JOURNAL OF GENERAL VIROLOGY, (200310), vol. 84, no. 10, ISSN 0022-1317, pages 2781 - 2793, XP002405613 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1099/vir.0.19163-0 | [A] - CATTEAU ADELINE ET AL, "Expression of dengue ApoptoM sequence results in disruption of mitochondrial potential and caspase activation.", BIOCHIMIE (PARIS), (200308), vol. 85, no. 8, ISSN 0300-9084, pages 789 - 793, XP002405614 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0300-9084(03)00139-1 | [A] - COLOMBAGE G ET AL, "DNA-Based and Alphavirus-Vectored Immunisation with PrM and E Proteins Elicits Long-Lived and Protective Immunity against the Flavivirus, Murray Valley Encephalitis Virus", VIROLOGY, ACADEMIC PRESS,ORLANDO, US, (19981010), vol. 250, no. 1, ISSN 0042-6822, pages 151 - 163, XP004445627 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/viro.1998.9357 | [A] - FONSECA B A L ET AL, "RECOMBINANT VACCINIA VIRUSES CO-EXPRESSING DENGUE-1 GLYCOPROTEINS PRM AND E INDUCE NEUTRALIZING ANTIBODIES IN MICE", VACCINE, BUTTERWORTH SCIENTIFIC. GUILDFORD, GB, (1994), vol. 12, no. 3, ISSN 0264-410X, pages 279 - 285, XP009018695 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0264-410X(94)90206-2 | [A] - CRILL W D ET AL, "Monoclonal antibodies that bind to domain III of dengue virus E glycoprotein arethe most efficient blockers of virus adsorption to Vero cells", JOURNAL OF VIROLOGY, THE AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR MICROBIOLOGY, US, (200108), vol. 75, no. 16, ISSN 0022-538X, pages 7769 - 7773, XP002982315 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/JVI.75.16.7769-7773.2001 | [A] - DESPRÈS P ET AL, "Live measles vaccine expressing the secreted form of the west nile virus envelope glycoprotein protects against west nile virus encephalitis", JOURNAL OF INFECTIOUS DISEASES 15 JAN 2005 UNITED STATES, (20050115), vol. 191, no. 2, ISSN 0022-1899, pages 207 - 214, XP009074536 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1086/426824 | [A] - MOTA J ET AL, "Induction of protective antibodies against dengue virus by tetravalent DNA immunization of mice with domain III of the envelope protein", VACCINE, BUTTERWORTH SCIENTIFIC. GUILDFORD, GB, (20050516), vol. 23, no. 26, ISSN 0264-410X, pages 3469 - 3476, XP004852137 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.vaccine.2004.12.028 | [A] - WANG SONGLI ET AL, "PrM- and cell-binding domains of the dengue virus E protein", JOURNAL OF VIROLOGY, (199903), vol. 73, no. 3, ISSN 0022-538X, pages 2547 - 2551, XP002405616 | [PA] - HERMIDA ET AL, "A recombinant fusion protein containing the domain III of the dengue-2 envelope protein is immunogenic and protective in nonhuman primates", VACCINE, BUTTERWORTH SCIENTIFIC. GUILDFORD, GB, (20060412), vol. 24, no. 16, ISSN 0264-410X, pages 3165 - 3171, XP005344486 [PA] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.vaccine.2006.01.036 |