EP1907535 - CDNA CONSTRUCT OF SALMONIDAE ALPHAVIRUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.07.2013 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INSTITUT NATIONAL DE LA RECHERCHE AGRONOMIQUE (INRA) 147, Rue de l'Université 75007 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [2012/37] |
Former [2008/15] | For all designated states INSTITUT NATIONAL DE LA RECHERCHE AGRONOMIQUE (INRA) 147, Rue de l'Université 75007 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEBERRE, Monique 49, Rue de Petit Pont F-78180 Montigny-le Bretonneux / FR | 02 /
MORIETTE, Coralie 3, Avenue de Choisy, Appartement 2147 F-75013 Paris / FR | 03 /
BREMONT, Michel 24 Bis, Rue Babeuf F-94600 Choisy Le Roi / FR | [2008/15] | Representative(s) | Keus, Jacobus Albertus Ronald, et al Merck Sharp & Dohme Ltd. Hertford Road Hoddesdon, Hertfordshire EN11 9BU / GB | [2012/37] |
Former [2012/02] | Keus, Jacobus Albertus Ronald, et al Merck Sharp & Dohme Ltd. Hertford Road Hoddesdon, Hertfordshire EN11 9BU / NL | ||
Former [2010/01] | Keus, Jacobus Albertus Ronald, et al Intervet International B.V. Patent Department Wim de Korverstraat 35 5831 AN Boxmeer / NL | ||
Former [2008/15] | Vialle-Presles, Marie José, et al Cabinet ORES, 36,rue de St Pétersbourg 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 06778633.5 | 21.06.2006 | [2008/15] | WO2006FR01405 | Priority number, date | FR20050006275 | 21.06.2005 Original published format: FR 0506275 | [2008/15] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006136704 | Date: | 28.12.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/52] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1907535 | Date: | 09.04.2008 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.12.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1907535 | Date: | 12.09.2012 | Language: | FR | [2012/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.03.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C12N7/00, C12N15/86, A61K39/12, C07K14/18, C12N15/113 | [2012/10] | CPC: |
C07K14/005 (EP,NO,US);
A61K39/12 (EP,NO,US);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P31/14 (EP);
A61P31/20 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
C12N15/1131 (EP,NO,US);
C12N15/86 (EP,NO,US);
C12N7/00 (EP,NO,US);
A61K2039/53 (EP,US);
A61K2039/552 (EP,US);
C12N2310/121 (EP,US);
C12N2310/127 (EP,US);
C12N2770/36121 (EP,US);
C12N2770/36122 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2008/15] | C12N7/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/15] | Title | German: | CDNA-KONSTRUKT VON SALMONIDAE-ALPHAVIRUS | [2008/15] | English: | CDNA CONSTRUCT OF SALMONIDAE ALPHAVIRUS | [2008/15] | French: | CONSTRUCTION D'ADNC D'ALPHAVIRUS DE SALMONIDES | [2012/10] |
Former [2008/15] | CONSTRUCTION D'ADNC D'ALPHAVIRUS DE SALMONIDES. | Entry into regional phase | 08.01.2008 | National basic fee paid | 08.01.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.01.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.01.2008 | Examination requested [2008/15] | 22.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.05.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.07.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 26.07.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.03.2010 | Opposition(s) | 13.06.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.06.2006 | AT | 12.09.2012 | CY | 12.09.2012 | CZ | 12.09.2012 | DK | 12.09.2012 | EE | 12.09.2012 | FI | 12.09.2012 | LT | 12.09.2012 | LV | 12.09.2012 | MC | 12.09.2012 | NL | 12.09.2012 | PL | 12.09.2012 | RO | 12.09.2012 | SE | 12.09.2012 | SI | 12.09.2012 | SK | 12.09.2012 | TR | 12.09.2012 | BG | 12.12.2012 | GR | 13.12.2012 | ES | 23.12.2012 | IS | 12.01.2013 | PT | 14.01.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 12.09.2012 | |
CY | 12.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 12.09.2012 | ||
DK | 12.09.2012 | ||
EE | 12.09.2012 | ||
FI | 12.09.2012 | ||
LT | 12.09.2012 | ||
LV | 12.09.2012 | ||
MC | 12.09.2012 | ||
NL | 12.09.2012 | ||
PL | 12.09.2012 | ||
RO | 12.09.2012 | ||
SE | 12.09.2012 | ||
SI | 12.09.2012 | ||
SK | 12.09.2012 | ||
TR | 12.09.2012 | ||
BG | 12.12.2012 | ||
GR | 13.12.2012 | ||
ES | 23.12.2012 | ||
IS | 12.01.2013 | ||
PT | 14.01.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | AT | 12.09.2012 | |
CY | 12.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 12.09.2012 | ||
DK | 12.09.2012 | ||
EE | 12.09.2012 | ||
FI | 12.09.2012 | ||
LT | 12.09.2012 | ||
LV | 12.09.2012 | ||
MC | 12.09.2012 | ||
NL | 12.09.2012 | ||
PL | 12.09.2012 | ||
RO | 12.09.2012 | ||
SE | 12.09.2012 | ||
SI | 12.09.2012 | ||
SK | 12.09.2012 | ||
BG | 12.12.2012 | ||
GR | 13.12.2012 | ||
ES | 23.12.2012 | ||
IS | 12.01.2013 | ||
PT | 14.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 12.09.2012 | |
CY | 12.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 12.09.2012 | ||
DK | 12.09.2012 | ||
EE | 12.09.2012 | ||
FI | 12.09.2012 | ||
LT | 12.09.2012 | ||
LV | 12.09.2012 | ||
NL | 12.09.2012 | ||
PL | 12.09.2012 | ||
RO | 12.09.2012 | ||
SE | 12.09.2012 | ||
SI | 12.09.2012 | ||
SK | 12.09.2012 | ||
BG | 12.12.2012 | ||
GR | 13.12.2012 | ||
ES | 23.12.2012 | ||
IS | 12.01.2013 | ||
PT | 14.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/31] | AT | 12.09.2012 | |
CY | 12.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 12.09.2012 | ||
EE | 12.09.2012 | ||
FI | 12.09.2012 | ||
LT | 12.09.2012 | ||
LV | 12.09.2012 | ||
NL | 12.09.2012 | ||
PL | 12.09.2012 | ||
RO | 12.09.2012 | ||
SE | 12.09.2012 | ||
SI | 12.09.2012 | ||
SK | 12.09.2012 | ||
GR | 13.12.2012 | ||
ES | 23.12.2012 | ||
IS | 12.01.2013 | ||
PT | 14.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/28] | CY | 12.09.2012 | |
CZ | 12.09.2012 | ||
EE | 12.09.2012 | ||
FI | 12.09.2012 | ||
LT | 12.09.2012 | ||
LV | 12.09.2012 | ||
NL | 12.09.2012 | ||
PL | 12.09.2012 | ||
RO | 12.09.2012 | ||
SE | 12.09.2012 | ||
SI | 12.09.2012 | ||
SK | 12.09.2012 | ||
GR | 13.12.2012 | ||
ES | 23.12.2012 | ||
IS | 12.01.2013 | ||
PT | 14.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | CY | 12.09.2012 | |
CZ | 12.09.2012 | ||
EE | 12.09.2012 | ||
FI | 12.09.2012 | ||
LT | 12.09.2012 | ||
LV | 12.09.2012 | ||
NL | 12.09.2012 | ||
PL | 12.09.2012 | ||
RO | 12.09.2012 | ||
SE | 12.09.2012 | ||
SI | 12.09.2012 | ||
SK | 12.09.2012 | ||
GR | 13.12.2012 | ||
ES | 23.12.2012 | ||
IS | 12.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | CY | 12.09.2012 | |
CZ | 12.09.2012 | ||
EE | 12.09.2012 | ||
FI | 12.09.2012 | ||
LT | 12.09.2012 | ||
LV | 12.09.2012 | ||
NL | 12.09.2012 | ||
SE | 12.09.2012 | ||
SI | 12.09.2012 | ||
GR | 13.12.2012 | ||
ES | 23.12.2012 | ||
IS | 12.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/12] | CY | 12.09.2012 | |
FI | 12.09.2012 | ||
LT | 12.09.2012 | ||
LV | 12.09.2012 | ||
SE | 12.09.2012 | ||
SI | 12.09.2012 | ||
GR | 13.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | CY | 12.09.2012 | |
FI | 12.09.2012 | ||
LT | 12.09.2012 | ||
LV | 12.09.2012 | ||
SI | 12.09.2012 | ||
GR | 13.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | CY | 12.09.2012 | |
FI | 12.09.2012 | ||
LT | 12.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | FI | 12.09.2012 | |
LT | 12.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | LT | 12.09.2012 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2004258707 (WESTON JONATHAN [GB], et al) [A] 1-13 * paragraph [0047] * * claim - *; | [A] - SMERDOU C ET AL, "Non-viral amplification systems for gene transfer: vectors based on alphaviruses.", CURRENT OPINION IN MOLECULAR THERAPEUTICS. APR 1999, (199904), vol. 1, no. 2, ISSN 1464-8431, pages 244 - 251, XP009062410 [A] 1-13 * abstract * | [A] - MCCORMICK CHRISTOPHER J ET AL, "Introduction of replication-competent hepatitis C virus transcripts using a tetracycline-regulable baculovirus delivery system.", JOURNAL OF GENERAL VIROLOGY, (200402), vol. 85, no. 2, ISSN 0022-1317, pages 429 - 439, XP002369434 [A] 1-13 * abstract * * page 430, column 2, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1099/vir.0.19676-0 | [AD] - FROLOV I ET AL, "ALPHAVIRUS-BASED EXPRESSION VECTORS: STRATEGIES AND APPLICATIONS", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA, NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCE, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (1996), vol. 93, no. 21, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 11371 - 11377, XP000910193 [AD] 1-13 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.93.21.11371 | [AD] - RUFFNER D E ET AL, "Sequence requirements of the hammerhead RNA self-cleavage reaction.", BIOCHEMISTRY. 27 NOV 1990, (19901127), vol. 29, no. 47, ISSN 0006-2960, pages 10695 - 10702, XP002369435 [AD] 1-13 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bi00499a018 | [A] - SHIPPY RICHARD ET AL, "The hairpin ribozyme: Discovery, mechanism, and development for gene therapy", MOLECULAR BIOTECHNOLOGY, (199908), vol. 12, no. 1, ISSN 1073-6085, pages 117 - 129, XP009062409 [A] 1-13 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1385/MB:12:1:117 | [A] - WESTON JONATHAN ET AL, "Comparison of two aquatic alphaviruses, salmon pancreas disease virus and sleeping disease virus, by using genome sequence analysis, monoclonal reactivity, and cross-infection", JOURNAL OF VIROLOGY, (200206), vol. 76, no. 12, ISSN 0022-538X, pages 6155 - 6163, XP002369436 [A] 1-13 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/JVI.76.12.6155-6163.2002 | [A] - VILLOING STEPHANE ET AL, "Rainbow trout sleeping disease virus is an atypical alphavirus", JOURNAL OF VIROLOGY, (200001), vol. 74, no. 1, ISSN 0022-538X, pages 173 - 183, XP002369437 [A] 1-13 * the whole document * | [PX] - MORIETTE CORALIE ET AL, "Recovery of a recombinant Salmonid alphavirus fully attenuated and protective for rainbow trout", JOURNAL OF VIROLOGY, (200604), vol. 80, no. 8, ISSN 0022-538X, pages 4088 - 4098, XP009076629 [PX] 1-13 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/JVI.80.8.4088-4098.2006 | Examination | US2004258707 | - SARDYKO S V, "ADAPTIVE QUANTIZATION OF TV IMAGE SEGMENTS", TEKHNIKA KINO I TELEVIDENIYA, ISKUSSTVO, MOSKVA, RU, (19881001), vol. 1, no. 10, ISSN 0040-2249, pages 24 - 26, XP009062410 | - MCCORMICK C J ET AL, "Introduction of replication-competent hepatitis C virus transcripts using a tetracycline-regulable baculovirus delivery system", JOURNAL OF GENERAL VIROLOGY, SOCIETY FOR GENERAL MICROBIOLOGY, SPENCERS WOOD, GB, (20040201), vol. 85, no. 2, ISSN 0022-1317, pages 429 - 439, XP002369434 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1099/vir.0.19676-0 | - FROLOV I ET AL, "ALPHAVIRUS-BASED EXPRESSION VECTORS: STRATEGIES AND APPLICATIONS", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA, NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCE, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (19960101), vol. 93, no. 21, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 11371 - 11377, XP000910193 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.93.21.11371 | - RUFFNER D E ET AL, "Sequence requirements of the hammerhead RNA self-cleavage reaction", BIOCHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, EASTON, PA.; US, (19901127), vol. 29, no. 47, ISSN 0006-2960, pages 10695 - 10702, XP002369435 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bi00499a018 | - SHIPPY R ET AL, "THE HAIRPIN RIBOZYME: DISCOVERY, MECHANISM, AND DEVELOPMENT FOR GENE THERAPY", MOLECULAR BIOTECHNOLOGY, HUMANA PRESS, INC, US, (19990801), vol. 12, no. 1, ISSN 1073-6085, pages 117 - 129, XP009062409 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1385/MB:12:1:117 | - WESTON J ET AL, "Comparison of two aquatic alphaviruses, salmon pancreas disease virus and sleeping disease virus, by using genome sequence analysis, monoclonal reactivity, and cross-infection", JOURNAL OF VIROLOGY, THE AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR MICROBIOLOGY, US, (20020601), vol. 76, no. 12, ISSN 0022-538X, pages 6155 - 6163, XP002369436 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/JVI.76.12.6155-6163.2002 | - VILLOING S ET AL, "Rainbow trout sleeping disease virus is an atypical alphavirus", JOURNAL OF VIROLOGY, THE AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR MICROBIOLOGY, US, (20000101), vol. 74, no. 1, ISSN 0022-538X, pages 173 - 183, XP002369437 | - MORIETTE CORALIE ET AL, "RECOVERY OF A RECOMBINANT SALMONID ALPHAVIRUS FULLY ATTENUATED AND PROTECTIVE FOR RAINBOW TROUT", JOURNAL OF VIROLOGY, THE AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR MICROBIOLOGY, US, (20060401), vol. 80, no. 8, ISSN 0022-538X, pages 4089 - 4098, XP009076629 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/JVI.80.8.4088-4098.2006 |