Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2009500259 | Global Dossier | 08.01.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2006FR01539 | 30.06.2006 | FR0507645 | 19.07.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1904396 | Global Dossier | 02.04.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006FR01539 | 30.06.2006 | FR0507645 | 19.07.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BRPI0613691 | 16.11.2016 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2006FR01539 | 30.06.2006 | FR0507645 | 19.07.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007010104 | Global Dossier | 25.01.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR0507645 | 19.07.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7478793 | Global Dossier | 20.01.2009 | B2 | US2007018126 | 25.01.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR0507645 | 19.07.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101223099 | 16.07.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | FR0507645 | 19.07.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | FR2888827 | 14.09.2007 | B1 | FR2888827 | 26.01.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR0507645 | 19.07.2005 |