EP1904396 - FILLING TUBE WITH OPENING AUTOMATICALLY CONTROLLED BY A MONITORING CHECK VALVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.10.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.10.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.11.2010 [2010/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SERAC GROUP Route de Mamers 72400 La Ferté-Bernard / FR | [2008/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRAFFIN, André 7 Persiaran Batai Barat, Damansara Heights Kuala Lumpur, 50490 / MY | [2008/14] | Representative(s) | Fruchard, Guy, et al Cabinet Boettcher 16, Rue Médéric 75017 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/42] | Fruchard, Guy, et al Cabinet Boettcher 22, rue du Général Foy 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2008/14] | Fruchard, Guy, et al CABINET BOETTCHER, 22, rue du Général Foy 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 06778729.1 | 30.06.2006 | [2008/14] | WO2006FR01539 | Priority number, date | FR20050007645 | 19.07.2005 Original published format: FR 0507645 | [2008/14] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007010104 | Date: | 25.01.2007 | Language: | FR | [2007/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1904396 | Date: | 02.04.2008 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.01.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.01.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B67C3/26 | [2008/14] | CPC: |
B67C3/26 (EP,US);
B67C3/2608 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/14] | Extension states | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FÜLLROHR MIT EINER DURCH EIN ÜBERWACHUNGSRÜCKSCHLAGVENTIL AUTOMATISCH GESTEUERTEN ÖFFNUNG | [2008/14] | English: | FILLING TUBE WITH OPENING AUTOMATICALLY CONTROLLED BY A MONITORING CHECK VALVE | [2008/14] | French: | BEC DE REMPLISSAGE A OUVERTURE ASSERVIE PAR UN CLAPET DE PILOTAGE | [2008/14] | Entry into regional phase | 05.12.2007 | National basic fee paid | 05.12.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.12.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.12.2007 | Examination requested [2008/14] | 29.12.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.05.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/44] | 15.06.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2010/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2010 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5878992 (EDWARDS NICHOLAS P [US], et al); | [A]FR2791033 (GUILLON PIERRE [FR]); | [DA]FR2838730 (SERAC GROUP [FR]) [DA] 1 * figures 1,2 *; | [A]WO2005003018 (STK STOCCHI PROGETTI SRL [IT], et al) |