EP1926829 - LABELLED MODIFIED GUANINE-CONTAINING NUCLEOSIDES AND NUCLEOTIDES COMPRISING A FLUOROPHORE ATTACHED TO THE BASE THROUGH A LINKING GROUP COMPRISING A POLYETHYLENE GLYCOL SPACING GROUP AND METHODS FOR THEIR USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 16.06.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.06.2017 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 19.07.2017 [2017/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Illumina Cambridge Limited Chesterford Research Park Little Chesterford Saffron Walden Essex CB10 1XL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/29] | For all designated states Illumina Cambridge Limited Chesterford Research Park Little Chesterford Saffron Walden Essex CB10 1XL / GB | ||
Former [2010/47] | For all designated states Illumina Cambridge Limited Chesterford Research Park Little Chesterford Saffron Walden Essex CB10 1XL / GB | ||
Former [2008/23] | For all designated states Solexa Ltd. Chesterford Research Park, Little Chesterford Saffron Walden Essex CB10 1XL / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIU, Xiaohai c/o SOLEXA LIMITED Chesterford Research Park Little Chesterford Saffron Walden Essex CB10 1XL / GB | 02 /
MILTON, John c/o SOLEXA LIMITED Chesterford Research Park Little Chesterford Saffron Walden Essex CB10 1XL / GB | [2014/32] |
Former [2008/23] | 01 /
LIU, Xiaohai c/o SOLEXA LIMITED Chesterford Research Park Little Chesterford Saffron Walden Essex CB10 1XL / GB | ||
02 /
MILTON, John c/o SOLEXA LIMITED Chesterford Research Park Little Chesterford Saffron Walden Essex CB10 1XL / GB | Representative(s) | Cooley (UK) LLP 22 Bishopsgate London EC2N 4BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/29] | Cooley (UK) LLP Dashwood 69 Old Broad Street London EC2M 1QS / GB | ||
Former [2014/32] | Barnes, Colin Lloyd Stratagem IPM Limited Forsters Wing, Anstey Hall Maris Lane Trumpington Cambridge CB2 9LG / GB | ||
Former [2010/47] | Barnes, Colin Lloyd Stratagem IPM Limited Forsters Wing, Anstey Hall Maris Lane Trumpington Cambridge CB2 9LG / GB | ||
Former [2008/23] | White, Nina Louise Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 06779167.3 | 18.08.2006 | [2008/23] | WO2006GB03095 | Priority number, date | GB20050017097 | 19.08.2005 Original published format: GB 0517097 | [2008/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007020457 | Date: | 22.02.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/08] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1926829 | Date: | 04.06.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.02.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1926829 | Date: | 06.08.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/32] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP1926829 | Date: | 19.07.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.10.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C07H19/16, C07H19/20, C07H21/00, C12Q1/68 | [2014/10] | CPC: |
C12Q1/686 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C12Q1/686, C12Q2525/113 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/23] | C12Q1/68 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/29] |
Former [2008/23] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | MARKIERTE MODIFIZIERTE GUANIN-ENTHALTENDEN NUKLEOSIDEN UND NUKLEOTIDEN MIT KOVALENT GEBUNDENEN FLUOROPHOR AN DER BASE WOBEI DIE VERBINDENDE LINKER-KOMPONENTE POLYETHYLENGLYKOL-EINHEITEN ENTHÄLT UND METHODEN ZU DEREN ANWENDUNG | [2014/10] | English: | LABELLED MODIFIED GUANINE-CONTAINING NUCLEOSIDES AND NUCLEOTIDES COMPRISING A FLUOROPHORE ATTACHED TO THE BASE THROUGH A LINKING GROUP COMPRISING A POLYETHYLENE GLYCOL SPACING GROUP AND METHODS FOR THEIR USE | [2008/23] | French: | NUCLEOSIDES ET NUCLEOTIDES MARQUÉS CONTENANT DES GUANINES MODIFIÉES ET UN FLUOROPHORE FIXÉ À LA BASE PAR L'INTERMÉDIAIRE D'UN GROUPE DE LIAISON POLYALKYLÈNEGLYCOL | [2008/23] |
Former [2008/23] | MARKIERTE MODIFIZIERTE GUANINHALTIGE NUKLEOSIDE UND NUKLEOTIDE MIT EINEM AN DIE BASE ÜBER EINE EINE POLYETHYLENGLYKOL-ABSTANDHALTERGRUPPE ENTHALTENDE VERKNÜPFUNGSGRUPPE GEBUNDENEN FLUOROPHOR | Entry into regional phase | 05.02.2008 | National basic fee paid | 05.02.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.02.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.02.2008 | Examination requested [2008/23] | 13.05.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.06.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 04.04.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.07.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.03.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.06.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 27.06.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.06.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.04.2013 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
28.04.2015
ADMISSIBLE Kilger, Christian Wachtelstr. 4 14195 Berlin / DE Opponent's representative CH Kilger Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Fasanenstraße 29 10719 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/23] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
28.04.2015
ADMISSIBLE Kilger, Christian Wachtelstr. 4 14195 Berlin / DE Opponent's representative CH Kilger Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Fasanenstrasse 29 10719 Berlin / DE | 12.06.2015 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 28.09.2015 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 22.11.2016 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 22.11.2016 | Date of oral proceedings | 12.12.2016 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 12.12.2016 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 13.04.2017 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 08.06.2017 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Request for further processing for: | Loss of rights: Claims | 02.07.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 02.07.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 15.07.2008 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.08.2006 | AT | 06.08.2014 | BE | 06.08.2014 | CY | 06.08.2014 | CZ | 06.08.2014 | DK | 06.08.2014 | EE | 06.08.2014 | ES | 06.08.2014 | FI | 06.08.2014 | IT | 06.08.2014 | LT | 06.08.2014 | LV | 06.08.2014 | MC | 06.08.2014 | NL | 06.08.2014 | PL | 06.08.2014 | RO | 06.08.2014 | SE | 06.08.2014 | SI | 06.08.2014 | SK | 06.08.2014 | TR | 06.08.2014 | IE | 18.08.2014 | LU | 18.08.2014 | CH | 31.08.2014 | LI | 31.08.2014 | BG | 06.11.2014 | GR | 07.11.2014 | IS | 06.12.2014 | PT | 09.12.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 18.08.2006 | |
AT | 06.08.2014 | ||
BE | 06.08.2014 | ||
CY | 06.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 06.08.2014 | ||
DK | 06.08.2014 | ||
EE | 06.08.2014 | ||
ES | 06.08.2014 | ||
FI | 06.08.2014 | ||
IT | 06.08.2014 | ||
LT | 06.08.2014 | ||
LV | 06.08.2014 | ||
MC | 06.08.2014 | ||
NL | 06.08.2014 | ||
PL | 06.08.2014 | ||
RO | 06.08.2014 | ||
SE | 06.08.2014 | ||
SI | 06.08.2014 | ||
SK | 06.08.2014 | ||
IE | 18.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
BG | 06.11.2014 | ||
GR | 07.11.2014 | ||
IS | 06.12.2014 | ||
PT | 09.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/50] | AT | 06.08.2014 | |
CY | 06.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 06.08.2014 | ||
DK | 06.08.2014 | ||
EE | 06.08.2014 | ||
ES | 06.08.2014 | ||
FI | 06.08.2014 | ||
IT | 06.08.2014 | ||
LT | 06.08.2014 | ||
LV | 06.08.2014 | ||
MC | 06.08.2014 | ||
NL | 06.08.2014 | ||
PL | 06.08.2014 | ||
RO | 06.08.2014 | ||
SE | 06.08.2014 | ||
SI | 06.08.2014 | ||
SK | 06.08.2014 | ||
IE | 18.08.2014 | ||
BE | 31.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
BG | 06.11.2014 | ||
GR | 07.11.2014 | ||
IS | 06.12.2014 | ||
PT | 09.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 06.08.2014 | |
CY | 06.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 06.08.2014 | ||
DK | 06.08.2014 | ||
EE | 06.08.2014 | ||
ES | 06.08.2014 | ||
FI | 06.08.2014 | ||
IT | 06.08.2014 | ||
LT | 06.08.2014 | ||
LV | 06.08.2014 | ||
MC | 06.08.2014 | ||
NL | 06.08.2014 | ||
PL | 06.08.2014 | ||
RO | 06.08.2014 | ||
SE | 06.08.2014 | ||
SK | 06.08.2014 | ||
IE | 18.08.2014 | ||
BE | 31.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
BG | 06.11.2014 | ||
GR | 07.11.2014 | ||
IS | 06.12.2014 | ||
PT | 09.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/27] | AT | 06.08.2014 | |
CY | 06.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 06.08.2014 | ||
DK | 06.08.2014 | ||
EE | 06.08.2014 | ||
ES | 06.08.2014 | ||
FI | 06.08.2014 | ||
IT | 06.08.2014 | ||
LT | 06.08.2014 | ||
LV | 06.08.2014 | ||
MC | 06.08.2014 | ||
NL | 06.08.2014 | ||
PL | 06.08.2014 | ||
RO | 06.08.2014 | ||
SE | 06.08.2014 | ||
SK | 06.08.2014 | ||
BE | 31.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
BG | 06.11.2014 | ||
GR | 07.11.2014 | ||
IS | 06.12.2014 | ||
PT | 09.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/23] | AT | 06.08.2014 | |
CY | 06.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 06.08.2014 | ||
DK | 06.08.2014 | ||
EE | 06.08.2014 | ||
ES | 06.08.2014 | ||
FI | 06.08.2014 | ||
IT | 06.08.2014 | ||
LT | 06.08.2014 | ||
LV | 06.08.2014 | ||
NL | 06.08.2014 | ||
PL | 06.08.2014 | ||
RO | 06.08.2014 | ||
SE | 06.08.2014 | ||
SK | 06.08.2014 | ||
BE | 31.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
BG | 06.11.2014 | ||
GR | 07.11.2014 | ||
IS | 06.12.2014 | ||
PT | 09.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | AT | 06.08.2014 | |
CY | 06.08.2014 | ||
DK | 06.08.2014 | ||
ES | 06.08.2014 | ||
FI | 06.08.2014 | ||
IT | 06.08.2014 | ||
LT | 06.08.2014 | ||
LV | 06.08.2014 | ||
NL | 06.08.2014 | ||
PL | 06.08.2014 | ||
RO | 06.08.2014 | ||
SE | 06.08.2014 | ||
BE | 31.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
BG | 06.11.2014 | ||
GR | 07.11.2014 | ||
IS | 06.12.2014 | ||
PT | 09.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/20] | AT | 06.08.2014 | |
CY | 06.08.2014 | ||
ES | 06.08.2014 | ||
FI | 06.08.2014 | ||
LT | 06.08.2014 | ||
LV | 06.08.2014 | ||
NL | 06.08.2014 | ||
PL | 06.08.2014 | ||
SE | 06.08.2014 | ||
BE | 31.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
BG | 06.11.2014 | ||
GR | 07.11.2014 | ||
IS | 06.12.2014 | ||
PT | 09.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/19] | AT | 06.08.2014 | |
CY | 06.08.2014 | ||
ES | 06.08.2014 | ||
FI | 06.08.2014 | ||
LT | 06.08.2014 | ||
LV | 06.08.2014 | ||
NL | 06.08.2014 | ||
PL | 06.08.2014 | ||
SE | 06.08.2014 | ||
BE | 31.08.2014 | ||
BG | 06.11.2014 | ||
GR | 07.11.2014 | ||
IS | 06.12.2014 | ||
PT | 09.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | AT | 06.08.2014 | |
CY | 06.08.2014 | ||
ES | 06.08.2014 | ||
FI | 06.08.2014 | ||
LT | 06.08.2014 | ||
LV | 06.08.2014 | ||
NL | 06.08.2014 | ||
PL | 06.08.2014 | ||
SE | 06.08.2014 | ||
BG | 06.11.2014 | ||
GR | 07.11.2014 | ||
IS | 06.12.2014 | ||
PT | 09.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 06.08.2014 | |
ES | 06.08.2014 | ||
FI | 06.08.2014 | ||
LT | 06.08.2014 | ||
PL | 06.08.2014 | ||
SE | 06.08.2014 | ||
BG | 06.11.2014 | ||
GR | 07.11.2014 | ||
PT | 09.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | ES | 06.08.2014 | |
FI | 06.08.2014 | ||
LT | 06.08.2014 | ||
SE | 06.08.2014 | ||
BG | 06.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | FI | 06.08.2014 | |
LT | 06.08.2014 | ||
SE | 06.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | LT | 06.08.2014 | Cited in | International search | [DA]WO2004018493 (SOLEXA LTD [GB], et al) [DA] 1-17 * abstract * * page 20, line 3 - page 21, line 35 * * page 50, lines 10-14 *; | [A]US6380378 (KITAMURA AKINORI [JP], et al) [A] 1-17 * column 16, line 34 - column 17, line 27 *; | [E]WO2007015168 (DAKO DENMARK AS [DK], et al) [E] 1-17 * page 57; example 6; sequence AD * * claim 25 * * pages 2-4, paragraphs 7-10 * * pages 6-9, paragraphs 23,24; compounds I-V * * page 14, lines 16-19 * * page 28, paragraph 72 * * pages 29-30, paragraph 77 * * pages 53-54; example 4 *; | [E]WO2006097320 (GENOVOXX GMBH [DE], et al) [E] 1-17 * page 79; figures 14,28,29; example 19 * * page 80; example 21 * * pages 81-83; figures 14,31A,31B; example 23 * * pages 98-99; figures 14,42A; example 36 * * page 12, lines 30-33 * | [DA] - TORIMURA M ET AL, "FLUORESCENCE-QUENCHING PHENOMENON BY PHOTOINDUCED ELECTRON TRANSFER BETWEEN A FLUORESCENT DYE AND A NUCLEOTIDE BASE", ANALYTICAL SCIENCES, JAPAN SOCIETY FOR ANALYTICAL CHEMISTRY, TOKYO,, JP, (200101), vol. 17, no. 1, ISSN 0910-6340, pages 155 - 160, XP002953171 [DA] 1-17 * the whole document * * page 158, column LEFT, paragraph LAST; table 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.2116/analsci.17.155 | [DA] - KURATA S ET AL, "Fluorescent quenching-based quantitative detection of specific DNA/RNA using a BODIPY((R)) FL-labeled probe or primer", NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, OXFORD UNIVERSITY PRESS, SURREY, GB, (20010315), vol. 29, no. 6, ISSN 0305-1048, page E34, XP002376104 [DA] 1-17 * abstract * * page 3, column LEFT, paragraph SECOND * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/nar/29.6.e34 | by applicant | - WELCH ET AL., CHEM. EUR. J., (1999), vol. 5, no. 3, pages 951 - 960 | Opposition | WO2004048397 | WO2004031405 | WO03087302 | WO2005044836 | - RANDOLPH J.B. ET AL, "Stability, specificity and fluorescence brightness of multiply-labeled fluorescent DNA probes", NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (1997), vol. 25, no. 14, doi:doi:10.1093/nar/25.14.2923, pages 2923 - 2929, XP002074426 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/nar/25.14.2923 | - SEIDEL C.A.M. ET AL, "Nucleobase-specific quenching of fluorescent dyes. 1. Nucleobase one-electron redox potentials aqnd their correlation with static and dynamic quenching efficiencies", J. PHYS. CHEM., (1996), vol. 100, pages 5541 - 5553 | - BEHLKE M.A. ET AL, "Fluorescence quenching by proximal G-bases", IDT TECHNICAL BULLETIN, (2005), pages 1 - 3 |