EP1924279 - ADJUVANTED VACCINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.01.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.01.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.02.2014 [2014/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE SECRETARY OF STATE FOR DEFENCE DSTL Porton Down Salisbury, Wiltshire SP4 0JQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/22] | For all designated states THE SECRETARY OF STATE FOR DEFENCE DSTL Porton Down Salisbury Wiltshire SP4 0JQ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EYLES, James, Edward IPC619 Pfizer Ltd Sandwich CT13 9NJ / GB | 02 /
HARTLEY, Margaret, Gillian DSTL Porton Down Salisbury Wiltshire SP4 0JQ / GB | [2008/30] |
Former [2008/22] | 01 /
EYLES, James, Edward DSTL Porton Down Salisbury Wiltshire SP4 0JQ / GB | ||
02 /
HARTLEY, Margaret, Gillian DSTL Porton Down Salisbury Wiltshire SP4 0JQ / GB | Representative(s) | Farnsworth, Alastair Graham, et al DIPR Formalities Section Poplar 2nr. 2214 MOD Abbey Wood (South) Bristol BS34 8JH / GB | [2012/50] |
Former [2011/22] | Farnsworth, Alastair Graham, et al DIPR Formalities Section Oak 2E Nr.6228 Abbey Wood (North) Bristol BS34 8JH / GB | ||
Former [2011/20] | Farnsworth, Alastair Graham, et al DIPR Formalties Section Oak 2E Nr.6228 Abbey Wood (North) Bristol BS34 8JH / GB | ||
Former [2011/18] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2011/18] | Farnsworth, Alastair Graham, et al Defence Procurement Agency D/IPR - Poplar 2A 19 MoD Abbey Wood 2218 Bristol BS34 8JH / GB | ||
Former [2008/22] | Farnsworth, Alastair Graham, et al D/IPR Poplar 2 No. 2218 MoD Abbey Wood Bristol BS34 8JH / GB | Application number, filing date | 06779315.8 | 07.09.2006 | [2008/22] | WO2006GB03296 | Priority number, date | GB20050018203 | 07.09.2005 Original published format: GB 0518203 | GB20050018305 | 08.09.2005 Original published format: GB 0518305 | [2008/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007028985 | Date: | 15.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/11] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1924279 | Date: | 28.05.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.03.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.05.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/02, C07K16/12 | [2008/22] | CPC: |
A61K39/0208 (EP,GB,US);
A61P31/04 (EP);
C07K16/1203 (GB);
A61K2039/521 (EP,US);
A61K2039/55561 (EP,US);
A61K2039/55577 (EP,US);
Y02A50/30 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/22] | Title | German: | ADJUVANS-VAKZINE | [2008/22] | English: | ADJUVANTED VACCINE | [2008/22] | French: | VACCIN CONTENANT UN ADJUVANT | [2008/22] | Entry into regional phase | 03.03.2008 | National basic fee paid | 03.03.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.03.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/22] | 23.05.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.12.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.05.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.09.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/08] | 10.10.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/08] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.04.2009 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 28.12.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 28.12.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2013 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO0126683 (CA NAT RESEARCH COUNCIL [CA]); |