EP1900245 - SECURE SESSION KEYS CONTEXT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.07.2013 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | [2008/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FORSBERG, Dan Melkonkatu 7 A 33 FI-00210 Helsinki / FI | [2008/12] | Representative(s) | Söderholm, Sampsa Petteri, et al Espatent Oy Kaivokatu 10 D 00100 Helsinki / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2012/38] | Söderholm, Sampsa Petteri, et al Espatent Oy Kaivokatu 10 D 00100 Helsinki / FI | ||
Former [2008/12] | Söderholm, Sampsa Petteri, et al Espatent Oy Kaivokatu 10 A 00100 Helsinki / FI | Application number, filing date | 06779839.7 | 06.07.2006 | [2008/12] | WO2006IB01874 | Priority number, date | US20050697270P | 06.07.2005 Original published format: US 697270 P | [2008/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007004051 | Date: | 11.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1900245 | Date: | 19.03.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.01.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1900245 | Date: | 19.09.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 11.01.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.07.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H04W4/00, H04L12/28 | [2011/39] | CPC: |
H04L9/083 (EP,US);
H04L63/061 (EP,US);
H04L9/0844 (EP,US);
H04W12/04 (EP,US);
H04L2209/80 (EP,US);
H04L2463/061 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2008/12] | H04Q7/38, H04L12/28 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/12] | Title | German: | SICHERER SITZUNGSSCHLÜSSELKONTEXT | [2008/12] | English: | SECURE SESSION KEYS CONTEXT | [2008/12] | French: | CONTEXTE DE CLES DE SESSION SECURISE | [2008/12] | Entry into regional phase | 03.01.2008 | National basic fee paid | 03.01.2008 | Search fee paid | 03.01.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.01.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.01.2008 | Examination requested [2008/12] | 17.02.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.05.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.08.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 07.08.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.05.2012 | Opposition(s) | 20.06.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.07.2006 | AT | 19.09.2012 | BE | 19.09.2012 | CY | 19.09.2012 | CZ | 19.09.2012 | DK | 19.09.2012 | EE | 19.09.2012 | FI | 19.09.2012 | IT | 19.09.2012 | LT | 19.09.2012 | LV | 19.09.2012 | MC | 19.09.2012 | NL | 19.09.2012 | PL | 19.09.2012 | RO | 19.09.2012 | SE | 19.09.2012 | SI | 19.09.2012 | SK | 19.09.2012 | TR | 19.09.2012 | BG | 19.12.2012 | GR | 20.12.2012 | ES | 30.12.2012 | IS | 19.01.2013 | PT | 21.01.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 19.09.2012 | |
BE | 19.09.2012 | ||
CY | 19.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2012 | ||
DK | 19.09.2012 | ||
EE | 19.09.2012 | ||
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
IT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
MC | 19.09.2012 | ||
NL | 19.09.2012 | ||
PL | 19.09.2012 | ||
RO | 19.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
SK | 19.09.2012 | ||
TR | 19.09.2012 | ||
BG | 19.12.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
ES | 30.12.2012 | ||
IS | 19.01.2013 | ||
PT | 21.01.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | AT | 19.09.2012 | |
BE | 19.09.2012 | ||
CY | 19.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2012 | ||
DK | 19.09.2012 | ||
EE | 19.09.2012 | ||
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
IT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
MC | 19.09.2012 | ||
NL | 19.09.2012 | ||
PL | 19.09.2012 | ||
RO | 19.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
SK | 19.09.2012 | ||
BG | 19.12.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
ES | 30.12.2012 | ||
IS | 19.01.2013 | ||
PT | 21.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 19.09.2012 | |
BE | 19.09.2012 | ||
CY | 19.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2012 | ||
DK | 19.09.2012 | ||
EE | 19.09.2012 | ||
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
IT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
NL | 19.09.2012 | ||
PL | 19.09.2012 | ||
RO | 19.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
SK | 19.09.2012 | ||
BG | 19.12.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
ES | 30.12.2012 | ||
IS | 19.01.2013 | ||
PT | 21.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 19.09.2012 | |
BE | 19.09.2012 | ||
CY | 19.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2012 | ||
DK | 19.09.2012 | ||
EE | 19.09.2012 | ||
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
NL | 19.09.2012 | ||
PL | 19.09.2012 | ||
RO | 19.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
SK | 19.09.2012 | ||
BG | 19.12.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
ES | 30.12.2012 | ||
IS | 19.01.2013 | ||
PT | 21.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/31] | AT | 19.09.2012 | |
BE | 19.09.2012 | ||
CY | 19.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2012 | ||
EE | 19.09.2012 | ||
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
NL | 19.09.2012 | ||
PL | 19.09.2012 | ||
RO | 19.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
SK | 19.09.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
ES | 30.12.2012 | ||
IS | 19.01.2013 | ||
PT | 21.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/28] | BE | 19.09.2012 | |
CY | 19.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2012 | ||
EE | 19.09.2012 | ||
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
NL | 19.09.2012 | ||
PL | 19.09.2012 | ||
RO | 19.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
SK | 19.09.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
ES | 30.12.2012 | ||
IS | 19.01.2013 | ||
PT | 21.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | BE | 19.09.2012 | |
CY | 19.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2012 | ||
EE | 19.09.2012 | ||
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
NL | 19.09.2012 | ||
PL | 19.09.2012 | ||
RO | 19.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
SK | 19.09.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
ES | 30.12.2012 | ||
IS | 19.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | BE | 19.09.2012 | |
CY | 19.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 19.09.2012 | ||
EE | 19.09.2012 | ||
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
NL | 19.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
ES | 30.12.2012 | ||
IS | 19.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/20] | BE | 19.09.2012 | |
CY | 19.09.2012 | ||
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | CY | 19.09.2012 | |
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
SE | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | CY | 19.09.2012 | |
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
LV | 19.09.2012 | ||
SI | 19.09.2012 | ||
GR | 20.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | CY | 19.09.2012 | |
FI | 19.09.2012 | ||
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | FI | 19.09.2012 | |
LT | 19.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | LT | 19.09.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0139538 (NOKIA CORP [FI], et al) [A] 1-10,21,22 * abstract * * page 15, line 4 - page 23, line 8 * * figures 2, 3,4a-4c, 5a-5c, 6, 7 *; | [A]US2004240412 (WINGET NANCY CAM [US]) [A] 1-10,21,22 * abstract * * paragraph [0042] * * figure 6 *; | [AP]WO2006044251 (MOTOROLA INC [US], et al) [AP] 1-10,21,22 * abstract * * page 5, line 8 - page 8, line 3 * * figure 2 * | International search | [A]EP1414262 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]); | [A]US2004103282 (MEIER ROBERT [US], et al); | [A]US2004240412 (WINGET NANCY CAM [US]); | [AP]WO2006044251 (MOTOROLA INC [US], et al); | [AP] - ZHEN Z. ET AL., "AAA Architecture for Mobile IP in Overlay Networks", THE IEEE CONFERENCE ON LOCAL COMPUTER NETWORKS, 2005. 30TH ANNIVERSARY. (LCN '05), SYDNEY, AUSTRALIA, (20051115), pages 772 - 775, XP010859292 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/LCN.2005.20 |